Jacquelyn N'jai v. EDUC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Education, Miguel A. Cardona, In his official capacity of Secretary of the U.S. Department of Education, Diane Spadoni, Regional Director of Borrower's Services. In both personal and professional capacities., New York University, Long Island University, Campus Products and Services, Conduent Education Services, Immediate Credit Recovery, Inc., New York State Higher Education Services Corporation, Van Ru Credit Corporation and FMS Investment Corporation
Case Number: 22-5243
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Recvry of Defaulted Student Loans
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1972938] to motion to extend time [ # 1972496-2 ], motion to extend time [ # 1972398-2 ], motion to extend time [ # 1972172-2 ], motion to extend time [ # 1971672-2 ] combined with a MOTION for other relief filed by Ms. Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 11/09/2022 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: This Motion consists of 14-point Times Roman font. The Motion has 470 words, and is 4 pages long. [22-5243]--[Edited 11/09/2022 by SHA - Event/Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office] (N'jai, Jacquelyn) [Entered: 11/09/2022 12:18 PM]
November 7, 2022 MOTION [1972398] to extend time to file motion to 01/20/2023 filed by New York State Higher Education Services Corporation (Service Date: 11/07/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 174 words. [22-5243] (Mastro, Frank) [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:14 AM]
November 7, 2022 MOTION [1972496] to extend time to file motion to 01/20/2023 filed by Immediate Credit Recovery, Inc. (Service Date: 11/07/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 551. [22-5243] (Perr, Richard) [Entered: 11/07/2022 03:38 PM]
November 4, 2022 MOTION [1972172] to extend time to file motion to 01/20/2023 filed by Long Island University and New York University (Service Date: 11/04/2022 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 789 words. [22-5243] (Maloney, Kenneth) [Entered: 11/04/2022 11:18 AM]
November 4, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1972251] for motion to extend time [ # 1972172-2 ] filed by Long Island University and New York University. [22-5243] (Maloney, Kenneth) [Entered: 11/04/2022 02:49 PM]
November 1, 2022 MOTION [1971672] to extend time to file motion to 01/20/2023 filed by Miguel A. Cardona, Diane Spadoni and EDUC (Service Date: 11/01/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 802 words. [22-5243] (Duffey, Thomas) [Entered: 11/01/2022 06:40 PM]
October 25, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1970519] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1968637-2 ] [22-5243] [Entered: 10/25/2022 03:14 PM]
October 21, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1970080] filed by Immediate Credit Recovery, Inc. [Service Date: 10/21/2022 ] [22-5243] (Perr, Richard) [Entered: 10/21/2022 12:52 PM]
October 21, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1970078] filed by New York University and Long Island University [Service Date: 10/21/2022 ] [22-5243] (Maloney, Kenneth) [Entered: 10/21/2022 12:49 PM]
October 21, 2022 STATEMENT [1970081] with Disclosure Listing filed by Long Island University [Service Date: 10/21/2022 ] [22-5243] (Maloney, Kenneth) [Entered: 10/21/2022 12:53 PM]
October 21, 2022 STATEMENT [1970082] with Disclosure Listing filed by New York University [Service Date: 10/21/2022 ] [22-5243] (Maloney, Kenneth) [Entered: 10/21/2022 12:54 PM]
October 21, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1970146] filed by Thomas W. Duffey and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellees Miguel A. Cardona, Diane Spadoni and United States Department of Education. [22-5243]--[Edited 10/24/2022 by AH] (Duffey, Thomas) [Entered: 10/21/2022 05:13 PM]
October 21, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1970143] filed by Miguel A. Cardona, Diane Spadoni and United States Department of Education [Service Date: 10/21/2022 ] [22-5243]--[Edited 10/24/2022 by AH] (Duffey, Thomas) [Entered: 10/21/2022 05:06 PM]
October 21, 2022 STATEMENT [1970089] with Disclosure Listing filed by Immediate Credit Recovery, Inc. [Service Date: 10/21/2022 ] [22-5243] (Perr, Richard) [Entered: 10/21/2022 01:46 PM]
October 18, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1969886] miscellaneous documents, cover letter and certificate of service submitted by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 10/12/2022 ] [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:43 AM]
October 18, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1969885] filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 10/13/2022 ] [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:39 AM]
October 18, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1969880] filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 10/12/2022 ] [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:30 AM]
October 18, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1969875] filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 10/12/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:23 AM]
October 18, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1969877] filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 10/12/2022 ] [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:28 AM]
October 18, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1969878] filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [Service Date: 10/03/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:29 AM]
October 18, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1969879] filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai. [22-5243] [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:30 AM]
October 12, 2022 STATEMENT [1968617] with Disclosure Listing filed by New York State Higher Education Services Corporation [Service Date: 10/12/2022 ] [22-5243] (Mastro, Frank) [Entered: 10/12/2022 03:28 PM]
October 11, 2022 MOTION [1968637] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai (Service Date: 10/12/2022 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4 pages. [22-5243] [Entered: 10/12/2022 04:04 PM]
October 11, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1968226] filed by New York State Higher Education Services Corporation [Service Date: 10/11/2022 ] [22-5243] (Mastro, Frank) [Entered: 10/11/2022 09:44 AM]
October 6, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1967799] filed by Frank J Mastro on behalf of Appellee New York State Higher Education Services Corporation. [22-5243] (Mastro, Frank) [Entered: 10/06/2022 10:41 AM]
September 30, 2022 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1967152] received from jacquelyn N'Jai [signed for on 09/27/2022] for order [1965463-2] sent to Appellant Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai [22-5243] [Entered: 10/03/2022 11:52 AM]
September 29, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1966706] filed by Richard J. Perr and Monica M. Littman on behalf of Appellee Immediate Credit Recovery, Inc.. [22-5243] (Perr, Richard) [Entered: 09/29/2022 12:56 PM]
September 28, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1966553] filed by Kenneth T. Maloney and co-counsel Jennifer McLaughlin on behalf of Appellees Long Island University and New York University. [22-5243] (Maloney, Kenneth) [Entered: 09/28/2022 04:16 PM]
September 22, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1965463] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70210350000186797392] of order [ # 1965396-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 10/24/2022 from Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai. [22-5243] [Entered: 09/22/2022 09:13 AM]
September 21, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1965393] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02712-DLF filed by Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5243. [22-5243] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:29 PM]
September 21, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1965396] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/21/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/07/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/21/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/21/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/21/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/07/2022; directing party to file appointment of counsel motion: APPELLANT motion for appointment of counsel due 10/21/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-5243] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:33 PM]
September 21, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5243] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacquelyn N'jai v. EDUC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai
Represented By: Jacquelyn Brenea N'jai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Education
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Miguel A. Cardona, In his official capacity of Secretary of the U.S. Department of Education
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diane Spadoni, Regional Director of Borrower's Services. In both personal and professional capacities.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York University
Represented By: Hayley Brooke Dryer
Represented By: Kenneth T. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Long Island University
Represented By: Hayley Brooke Dryer
Represented By: Kenneth T. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Campus Products and Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Conduent Education Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Immediate Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Monica M. Littman
Represented By: Ronald S. Canter Esquire
Represented By: Richard J. Perr Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Higher Education Services Corporation
Represented By: Frank J. Mastro Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Van Ru Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FMS Investment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?