L'association Des Americains Accidentels, et al v. DOS, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Sofiane Thoulon, Lilian Pam, Christopher Bousigues, Anne Misslin, Philip Boeffard, Mark Lewis, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, Stephen Collins and Kristopher Lazarz
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of State, Antony J. Blinken, In his official capacity as Secretary of State and Rena Bitter, In her official capacity as Assistant Secretary of State for Consular Affairs
Case Number: 22-5262
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1974049] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 12/27/2022. APPENDIX due 12/27/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 01/26/2023. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 02/16/2023 [22-5262] [Entered: 11/17/2022 10:15 AM]
October 28, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1970965] filed by Philip Boeffard, Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon [Service Date: 10/28/2022 ] [22-5262] (Schreiber, Noam) [Entered: 10/28/2022 07:26 AM]
October 28, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1970966] filed by Marc Zell and co-counsel Noam Schreiber on behalf of Appellants Philip Boeffard, Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon. [22-5262] (Schreiber, Noam) [Entered: 10/28/2022 07:27 AM]
October 28, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1970968] submitted by Philip Boeffard, Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon [Service Date: 10/28/2022 ] [22-5262] (Schreiber, Noam) [Entered: 10/28/2022 07:31 AM]
October 28, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1970964] filed by Philip Boeffard, Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon [Service Date: 10/28/2022 ] [22-5262] (Schreiber, Noam) [Entered: 10/28/2022 07:25 AM]
October 28, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1970967] filed by Philip Boeffard, Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon [Service Date: 10/28/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5262] (Schreiber, Noam) [Entered: 10/28/2022 07:29 AM]
October 28, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1970963] filed by Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Philip Boeffard, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon [Service Date: 10/28/2022 ] [22-5262] (Schreiber, Noam) [Entered: 10/28/2022 07:24 AM]
October 27, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1970949] filed by Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken and DOS [Service Date: 10/27/2022 ] [22-5262] (Stapleton, Anna) [Entered: 10/27/2022 05:53 PM]
October 27, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1970948] filed by Anna M. Stapleton and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellees Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken and DOS. [22-5262] (Stapleton, Anna) [Entered: 10/27/2022 05:48 PM]
September 30, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1966997] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-02933-TNM filed by Philip Boeffard, Christopher Bousigues, Stephen Collins, Joshua Grant, Martin Kracklauer, L'association Des Americains Accidentels, Kristopher Lazarz, Mark Lewis, Anne Misslin, Lilian Pam and Sofiane Thoulon. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5262. [22-5262] [Entered: 09/30/2022 02:02 PM]
September 30, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1966999] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/31/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/14/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/31/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/31/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/31/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/14/2022 [22-5262] [Entered: 09/30/2022 02:03 PM]
September 30, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5262] [Entered: 09/30/2022 02:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: L'association Des Americains Accidentels, et al v. DOS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: L'association Des Americains Accidentels
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sofiane Thoulon
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lilian Pam
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Bousigues
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anne Misslin
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Philip Boeffard
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark Lewis
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joshua Grant
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martin Kracklauer
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stephen Collins
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kristopher Lazarz
Represented By: Lawrence Marc Zell Esquire
Represented By: Noam Binyamin Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of State
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Anna Manchester Stapleton
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Antony J. Blinken, In his official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Anna Manchester Stapleton
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rena Bitter, In her official capacity as Assistant Secretary of State for Consular Affairs
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Anna Manchester Stapleton
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?