Jack Jordan v. DOJ
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jack Jordan
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 22-5289
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1977773] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1977263-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1972124-2 ] APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/17/2023; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1972124-3 ] APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/17/2023; considering response [ # 1977281-2 ] [22-5289] [Entered: 12/15/2022 12:21 PM]
December 12, 2022 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1977281] to motion to extend time [ # 1977263-2 ] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 494 words. [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:27 PM]
December 12, 2022 MOTION [1977263] to extend time to file motion to 02/17/2023 filed by DOJ (Service Date: 12/12/2022 by Email, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 355. [22-5289] (Jones, Sian) [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:12 PM]
December 5, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1976374] submitted by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 12/05/2022 ] [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 12/05/2022 10:44 PM]
December 5, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1976375] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 12/05/2022 ] [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 12/05/2022 10:45 PM]
December 5, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1976376] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 12/05/2022 ] [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 12/05/2022 10:46 PM]
December 5, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1976369] filed by DOJ [Service Date: 12/05/2022 ] [22-5289] (Jones, Sian) [Entered: 12/05/2022 08:55 PM]
December 5, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1976368] filed by Sian Jones and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee DOJ. [22-5289] (Jones, Sian) [Entered: 12/05/2022 08:54 PM]
November 16, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1973917] filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Appellant Jack Jordan. [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 11/16/2022 12:24 PM]
November 16, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1973921] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 11/16/2022 ] [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 11/16/2022 01:03 PM]
November 16, 2022 MOTION [1974001] to supplement record filed by Jack Jordan (Service Date: 11/16/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,199 words. [22-5289] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 11/16/2022 07:00 PM]
November 4, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1972121] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02702-RC filed by Jack Jordan. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5289. [22-5289] [Entered: 11/04/2022 08:49 AM]
November 4, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1972124] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/05/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/19/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/05/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/05/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/05/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/19/2022, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [22-5289] [Entered: 11/04/2022 08:55 AM]
November 4, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5289] [Entered: 11/04/2022 08:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jack Jordan v. DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jack Jordan
Represented By: Jack Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Sian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?