Insider Inc. v. GSA
Plaintiff / Appellant: Insider Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: General Services Administration
Case Number: 22-5330
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 16, 2024 Summary Insider Inc. v. GSA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1984388] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 03/14/2023. APPENDIX due 03/14/2023. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/13/2023. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/04/2023 [22-5330] [Entered: 02/02/2023 03:36 PM]
January 31, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1983992] filed by Laura E. Myron and co-counsel Daniel Tenny on behalf of Appellee GSA. [22-5330] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 01/31/2023 02:31 PM]
January 31, 2023 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1983994] filed by GSA [Service Date: 01/31/2023 ] [22-5330] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 01/31/2023 02:32 PM]
January 13, 2023 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1981522] filed by Insider Inc. [Service Date: 01/13/2023 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:22 PM]
January 13, 2023 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1981523] submitted by Insider Inc. [Service Date: 01/13/2023 ] [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:23 PM]
January 13, 2023 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1981521] filed by Insider Inc. [Service Date: 01/13/2023 ] [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:21 PM]
January 13, 2023 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1981520] filed by Insider Inc. [Service Date: 01/13/2023 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:20 PM]
January 13, 2023 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1981517] filed by Insider Inc. [Service Date: 01/13/2023 ] [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:16 PM]
January 13, 2023 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1981518] filed by Insider Inc. [Service Date: 01/13/2023 ] [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:17 PM]
January 13, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1981519] filed by Matthew Topic on behalf of Appellant Insider Inc.. [22-5330] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:18 PM]
December 14, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1977621] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-02653-TNM filed by Insider Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5330. [22-5330] [Entered: 12/14/2022 01:33 PM]
December 14, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1977625] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/13/2023. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/30/2023; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/13/2023. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/13/2023. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/13/2023. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/30/2023 [22-5330] [Entered: 12/14/2022 01:37 PM]
December 14, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5330] [Entered: 12/14/2022 01:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Insider Inc. v. GSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Insider Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: General Services Administration
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?