Eugene Nyambal v. Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Eugene Nyambal
Defendant / Appellee: Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Case Number: 22-7003
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 NOTICE [1938035] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 22-7003: Fee Paid] [22-7003] [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:53 PM]
March 7, 2022 RESPONSE [1938358] to motion to strike document [ # 1937119-2 ] filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 03/07/2022 by Email] Length Certification: 14 pages. [22-7003] [Entered: 03/09/2022 11:02 AM]
March 1, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1937203] filed considering Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1930350-2 ], dismissing case for lack of prosecution, withholding issuance of the mandate. [22-7003] [Entered: 03/01/2022 02:31 PM]
March 1, 2022 MOTION [1937119] to strike the brief filed by Allied Barton Security Services, LLC (Service Date: 03/01/2022 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 503 words in Times New Roman 14 font.. [22-7003] (Schrager, Richard) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:17 AM]
February 26, 2022 APPELLANT BRIEF [1936927] filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/25/2022 ] Length of Brief: 10,274 words. [22-7003] [Entered: 02/28/2022 12:08 PM]
February 14, 2022 NOTICE [1935059] of district court filings filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/14/2022 ] [22-7003] [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:17 PM]
February 11, 2022 MOTION [1935004] styled as a request to docket pleading on district court docket filed by Eugene Nyambal (Service Date: 02/11/2022 by Email) Length Certification: 2 pages. [22-7003] [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:06 AM]
February 11, 2022 NOTICE [1935009] of district court filings filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/14/2022 ] [22-7003] [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:26 AM]
February 11, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1935088] filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/14/2022 ] [22-7003] [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:16 PM]
February 9, 2022 NOTICE [1934605] of district court filings filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/10/2022 ] [22-7003] [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:51 AM]
February 4, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1933820] filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/04/2022 ] [22-7003] [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:29 PM]
February 4, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1933818] filed by Eugene Nyambal [Service Date: 02/04/2022 ] [22-7003] [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:28 PM]
February 4, 2022 MOTION [1933693] to dismiss case filed by Allied Barton Security Services, LLC (Service Date: 02/04/2022 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 1115 words. [22-7003] (Schrager, Richard) [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:52 AM]
February 4, 2022 MOTION [1933720] to dismiss case filed by Allied Barton Security Services, LLC (Service Date: 02/04/2022 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 1115 words. [22-7003] (Schrager, Richard) [Entered: 02/04/2022 10:54 AM]
February 1, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1933240] filed by Allied Barton Security Services, LLC [Service Date: 02/01/2022 ] [22-7003] (Schrager, Richard) [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:34 PM]
February 1, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1933239] filed by Edward C. Bacon and co-counsel Richard S. Schrager on behalf of Appellee Allied Barton Security Services, LLC. [22-7003] (Schrager, Richard) [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:32 PM]
January 20, 2022 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1931960] received from Covid -19 Ein [signed for on 01/15/2022] for order [1930356-2] sent to Appellant Eugene Nyambal [22-7003] [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:06 PM]
January 12, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1930346] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01904-EGS-ZMF filed by Eugene Nyambal. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7003. [22-7003] [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:26 PM]
January 12, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1930350] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 02/11/2022, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-7003] [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:33 PM]
January 12, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1930356] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70210350000186795824] of order [ # 1930353-2 ], [ # 1930350-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 02/11/2022 from Eugene Nyambal. [22-7003] [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:42 PM]
January 12, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7003] [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:25 PM]
January 12, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1930353] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/11/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/28/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/11/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/11/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/11/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/28/2022, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-7003] [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eugene Nyambal v. Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eugene Nyambal
Represented By: Eugene Nyambal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Represented By: Edward C. Bacon
Represented By: Richard Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?