Eugene Nyambal v. Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Eugene Nyambal
Defendant / Appellee: Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Case Number: 22-7037
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 NOTICE [1945798] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement the notice of appeal [22-7037] [Entered: 05/06/2022 02:46 PM]
May 2, 2022 NOTICE [1945795] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement the notice of appeal [22-7037] [Entered: 05/06/2022 02:45 PM]
May 1, 2022 MOTION [1945116] request to consolidate Nos. 22-7003 and 22-7037 and cancel appeal No. 22-7037 filed by Eugene Nyambal in 22-7003 (Service Date: 05/01/2022 by Email) Length Certification: 4 pages. [22-7003, 22-7037] [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:22 PM]
May 1, 2022 RESPONSE [1945159] to orders [ # 1941552-5 ], [ # 1941550-5 ] filed by Eugene Nyambal. (Service Date: 05/01/2022 by Email) Length Certification: 4 pages. [22-7003, 22-7037] [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:44 PM]
April 11, 2022 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1942919] received from E.N. [signed for on 04/06/2022] for order [1941554-2] sent to Appellant Eugene Nyambal in 22-7037 [22-7003, 22-7037] [Entered: 04/13/2022 12:13 PM]
April 8, 2022 NOTICE [1942405] of district court filings filed by Eugene Nyambal in 22-7003, 22-7037 [Service Date: 04/08/2022 ] [22-7003, 22-7037] [Entered: 04/08/2022 01:55 PM]
April 1, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1941550] filed directing appellant to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee in district court due by 05/02/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-7037] [Entered: 04/01/2022 12:07 PM]
April 1, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1941552] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 05/02/2022. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-7037] [Entered: 04/01/2022 12:11 PM]
April 1, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1941554] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 8679 6104] of orders [ # 1941552-2 ] [ # 1941550-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/02/2022 from Eugene Nyambal. [22-7037] [Entered: 04/01/2022 12:13 PM]
March 31, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1941547] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01904-EGS-ZMF filed by Eugene Nyambal. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7037. [22-7037] [Entered: 04/01/2022 12:05 PM]
March 31, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7037] [Entered: 04/01/2022 12:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eugene Nyambal v. Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eugene Nyambal
Represented By: Eugene Nyambal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Allied Barton Security Services, LLC
Represented By: Edward C. Bacon
Represented By: Richard Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?