California Communities Against Toxics, et al v. EPA, et al
Petitioner: California Communities Against Toxics, Clean Power Lake County, Comite Dialogo Ambiental, Rio Grande International Study Center, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency and Michael S. Regan, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 24-1178
Filed: June 3, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2057977] filed consolidating case 24-1180 (Consolidation started 06/05/2024) with 24-1178; directing party to file in 24-1180 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/05/2024 [24-1178, 24-1180] [Entered: 06/05/2024 11:12 AM]
June 4, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2057844] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER underlying decision due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER procedural motions due 07/05/2024. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 07/19/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 07/05/2024. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 07/05/2024. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 07/19/2024. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 07/19/2024 [24-1178] [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:55 PM]
June 4, 2024 CERTIFIED COPY [2057842] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 2057841-2 ] [24-1178] [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:50 PM]
June 3, 2024 PETITION FOR REVIEW [2057841] of a decision by federal agency filed by California Communities Against Toxics, Clean Power Lake County, Comite Dialogo Ambiental, Rio Grande International Study Center, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 06/03/2024 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [24-1178] [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:49 PM]
June 3, 2024 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [24-1178] [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: California Communities Against Toxics, et al v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Communities Against Toxics
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Lillian Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clean Power Lake County
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Lillian Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Comite Dialogo Ambiental
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Lillian Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rio Grande International Study Center
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Lillian Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Lillian Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Union of Concerned Scientists
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Lillian Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael S. Regan, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?