Kurt Kanam, et al v. Debra Haaland, et al
Plaintiff: Kurt Kanam, in his capacity as Chairman of the Pilchuck Nation and Pilchuck Nation
Defendant: Debra A. Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, Bryan Newland, in his official capacity as Principal Deputy Assistant Secretary of Indian Affairs, Darryl LaCounte, in his official capacity as Director, Bureau of Indian Affairs and Bureau of Indian Affairs
Case Number: 24-5003
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes APA/Review Agency
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [2044235] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 2041784-2 ] filed by BIA, Debra A. Haaland, Darryl LaCounte and Bryan Newland [Service Date: 03/08/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: I hereby certify, on this 8th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 4, 913 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:42 PM]
March 8, 2024 APPELLANT MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND FACT [2044234] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 03/08/2024 ] Length Certification: I hereby certify, on this 8th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 4, 913 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:39 PM]
March 8, 2024 APPELLANT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [2044232] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 03/08/2024 ] Length of Brief: I hereby certify, on this 7th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 276 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:32 PM]
March 8, 2024 APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [2044237] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 03/08/2024 ] Length of Brief: 4,907. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:50 PM]
March 8, 2024 REPLY [2044236] filed by BIA, Debra A. Haaland, Darryl LaCounte and Bryan Newland to response [ # 2043039-2 ] [Service Date: 03/08/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: I hereby certify, on this 8th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 2,366 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:45 PM]
March 8, 2024 REPLY [2044240] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation to response [ # 2043039-2 ] [Service Date: 03/08/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: I hereby certify, on this 8th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 2,366 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:55 PM]
March 8, 2024 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [2044244] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 2041784-2 ] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 03/08/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: I hereby certify, on this 8th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 4, 913 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 06:15 PM]
March 8, 2024 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [2044238] to motion [ # 2041784-2 ] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 03/08/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: I hereby certify, on this 8th day of March 2024, that: 1. This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. 32(f), this document contains 4, 913 words.. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 03/08/2024 05:51 PM]
March 6, 2024 NOTICE [2043827] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 24-5003: Fee Paid] [24-5003] [Entered: 03/07/2024 09:03 AM]
March 1, 2024 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [2043039] to motion [ # 2041246-2 ], motion for summary reversal [ # 2041246-3 ] filed by BIA, Debra A. Haaland, Darryl LaCounte and Bryan Newland [Service Date: 03/01/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 4,571 words. [24-5003] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 03/01/2024 10:33 AM]
February 22, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2041834] filed to show cause regarding payment of docketing fee. Response to Order due 03/07/2024. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [24-5003] [Entered: 02/22/2024 01:57 PM]
February 22, 2024 MOTION [2041784] for summary affirmance filed by BIA, Darryl LaCounte, Bryan Newland and Debra A. Haaland (Service Date: 02/22/2024 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,089 words. [24-5003] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 02/22/2024 11:24 AM]
February 20, 2024 MOTION [2041246] for summary reversal and vactur filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation (Service Date: 02/20/2024 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3,432 words. [24-5003]--[Edited 02/20/2024 by HNG] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/20/2024 12:14 PM]
February 12, 2024 DOCKETING STATEMENT [2040044] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 02/12/2024 ] [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/12/2024 08:57 PM]
February 9, 2024 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2039791] filed by Margaret Farid on behalf of Appellants Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation. [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/09/2024 07:06 PM]
February 9, 2024 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [2039793] submitted by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/09/2024 07:07 PM]
February 9, 2024 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [2039792] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 02/09/2024 ] [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/09/2024 07:06 PM]
February 9, 2024 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [2039794] filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation [Service Date: 02/09/2024 ] [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/09/2024 07:08 PM]
February 9, 2024 DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY---UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [2039795] submitted by Pilchuck Nation and Kurt Kanam [Service Date: 02/09/2024 ] [24-5003]--[Edited 02/12/2024 by HNG] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/09/2024 07:09 PM]
February 8, 2024 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [2039514] filed by BIA, Debra A. Haaland, Darryl LaCounte and Bryan Newland [Service Date: 02/08/2024 ] [24-5003] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 02/08/2024 05:17 PM]
February 8, 2024 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [2039517] filed by Pilchuck Nation and Kurt Kanam [Service Date: 02/08/2024 ] [24-5003] (Farid, Margaret) [Entered: 02/08/2024 08:57 PM]
January 25, 2024 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2037389] filed by Andrew M. Bernie on behalf of Appellees BIA, Debra A. Haaland, Darryl LaCounte and Bryan Newland. [24-5003] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 01/25/2024 03:04 PM]
January 9, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2034995] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-01690-RJL filed by Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5003. [24-5003] [Entered: 01/09/2024 01:59 PM]
January 9, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2034999] filed directing party to file payment of docketing fee APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 02/08/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/08/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/23/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/08/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/08/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/08/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/23/2024 [24-5003] [Entered: 01/09/2024 02:05 PM]
January 9, 2024 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [24-5003] [Entered: 01/09/2024 01:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kurt Kanam, et al v. Debra Haaland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Kanam, in his capacity as Chairman of the Pilchuck Nation
Represented By: Margaret Magdy Farid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilchuck Nation
Represented By: Margaret Magdy Farid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Newland, in his official capacity as Principal Deputy Assistant Secretary of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl LaCounte, in his official capacity as Director, Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?