Michael Bullock v. Hana Security Services, et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bullock
Defendant: Hana Security Services, Sam Estes, Regional Manager, Ronald Best, Contract Manager - IRS/DC, Michael Radford, DHS- Division Director and Security, Police, and Fire Professionals of America, SPFPA
Case Number: 24-5055
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [2052184] marked "RTS Unable to forward". Certified Mail [2045675-2] had been sent to Party Michael Bullock. [24-5055] [Entered: 05/01/2024 09:17 AM]
March 29, 2024 MOTION [2047685] to withdraw case and refund fee filed by Michael Bullock (Service Date: 03/28/2024 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [24-5055] [Entered: 04/01/2024 11:00 AM]
March 19, 2024 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2045675] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7020 2450 0000 9475 3583] of order [ # 2045667-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 04/18/2024 from Michael Bullock. [24-5055] [Entered: 03/19/2024 02:08 PM]
March 19, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2045667] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 04/18/2024. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [24-5055] [Entered: 03/19/2024 01:59 PM]
March 19, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2045632] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-02608-DLF filed by Michael Bullock. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5055. [24-5055] [Entered: 03/19/2024 11:26 AM]
March 19, 2024 LETTER [2045636] sent regarding attorney membership to Brad S. Miller for Hana Security Services, Sam Estes and Ronald Best. Application for Admission due 04/18/2024. [24-5055] [Entered: 03/19/2024 11:35 AM]
March 19, 2024 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [24-5055] [Entered: 03/19/2024 11:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Bullock v. Hana Security Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bullock
Represented By: Michael Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hana Security Services
Represented By: Michael Wayne Beasley
Represented By: Brad S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Estes, Regional Manager
Represented By: Brad S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Best, Contract Manager - IRS/DC
Represented By: Brad S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Radford, DHS- Division Director
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security, Police, and Fire Professionals of America, SPFPA
Represented By: Mark James Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?