Jack Groenendal v. EOUSA, et al
Plaintiff: Jack Alan Groenendal
Defendant: Executive Office for United States Attorneys, Office of Information Policy, of U.S. Department of Justice, I.C.E. Office of Information, Governance, and Privacy, of the Department of Homeland Security and Privacy Office of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 24-5086
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 MOTION [2057216] for summary affirmance filed by EOUSA, I.C.E. Office of Information, Governance, and Privacy, Office of Information Policy and Privacy Office of the United States Department of Homeland Security (Service Date: 05/31/2024 by US Mail) Length Certification: 4,478 words. [24-5086] (Walker, Johnny) [Entered: 05/31/2024 11:39 AM]
May 28, 2024 SUPPLEMENT [2057054] to motion to appoint counsel [2056047-2], motion to appoint counsel [ # 2056049-2 ] filed by Jack Alan Groenendal [Service Date: 05/30/2024 ] [24-5086] [Entered: 05/30/2024 01:55 PM]
May 21, 2024 MOTION [2056049] to appoint counsel filed by Jack Alan Groenendal (Service Date: 05/15/2024 by US Mail) Length Certification: 12 pages. [24-5086] [Entered: 05/23/2024 02:59 PM]
May 21, 2024 MOTION [2056047] to appoint counsel filed by Jack Alan Groenendal (Service Date: 05/15/2024 by US Mail) Length Certification: 50 pages. [24-5086] [Entered: 05/23/2024 02:54 PM]
May 21, 2024 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [2056051] filed by Jack Alan Groenendal [Service Date: 05/15/2024 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [24-5086] [Entered: 05/23/2024 03:04 PM]
May 21, 2024 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [2056072] filed by Jack Alan Groenendal [24-5086] [Entered: 05/23/2024 03:30 PM]
May 21, 2024 DOCKETING STATEMENT [2056045] filed by Jack Alan Groenendal [Service Date: 05/15/2024 ] [24-5086] [Entered: 05/23/2024 02:50 PM]
May 21, 2024 PRISONER CONSENT TO COLLECTION [2056068] filed by Jack Alan Groenendal [24-5086] [Entered: 05/23/2024 03:22 PM]
May 16, 2024 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [2054898] filed by EOUSA, I.C.E. Office of Information, Governance, and Privacy, Office of Information Policy and Privacy Office of the United States Department of Homeland Security [Service Date: 05/16/2024 ] [24-5086] (Walker, Johnny) [Entered: 05/16/2024 02:33 PM]
May 16, 2024 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2054897] filed by Johnny H. Walker and co-counsel Jane M. Lyons on behalf of Appellees EOUSA, I.C.E. Office of Information, Governance, and Privacy, Office of Information Policy and Privacy Office of the United States Department of Homeland Security. [24-5086] (Walker, Johnny) [Entered: 05/16/2024 02:33 PM]
April 16, 2024 NOTICE [2049697] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 24-5086: IFP] [24-5086] [Entered: 04/16/2024 08:49 AM]
April 16, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2049703] filed removing case from abeyance. The Clerk is directed to issue an appropriate scheduling order; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/31/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/16/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/16/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/16/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/31/2024, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [24-5086] [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:18 AM]
April 16, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2049707] filed directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 05/16/2024. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 05/16/2024, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [24-5086] [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:37 AM]
April 16, 2024 LETTER [2049719] sent to warden sending Clerk order by warden letter [ # 2049707-4 ], sending Clerk order by warden letter [ # 2049703-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 05/16/2024. [24-5086] [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:49 AM]
April 15, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2049479] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01030-DLF filed by Jack Alan Groenendal. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5086. [24-5086] [Entered: 04/15/2024 07:39 AM]
April 15, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2049481] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 24-5086 held in abeyance pending decision in 20-cv-1030 from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [24-5086] [Entered: 04/15/2024 07:41 AM]
April 15, 2024 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [24-5086] [Entered: 04/15/2024 07:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jack Groenendal v. EOUSA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Alan Groenendal
Represented By: Jack Alan Groenendal
Represented By: Warden (Seagoville)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Information Policy, of U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.E. Office of Information, Governance, and Privacy, of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privacy Office of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?