David Lettieri v. Federal Marshals
Plaintiff: David Carmine Lettieri
Defendant: Federal Marshals
Case Number: 24-5088
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 RECEIPT [2053537] received from David Lettieri [signed for on 04/25/2024] for documents [ # 2050368-2 ] sent to Appellant David Carmine Lettieri [24-5088] [Entered: 05/09/2024 08:39 AM]
May 2, 2024 RECEIPT [2052621] received from David Carmine Lettieri [signed for on 04/23/2024] for documents [ # 2050053-2 ] sent to Appellant David Carmine Lettieri [24-5088] [Entered: 05/02/2024 03:49 PM]
April 19, 2024 LETTER [2050368] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 2050354-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 05/20/2024. [24-5088] [Entered: 04/19/2024 09:52 AM]
April 19, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2050354] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/20/2024. Directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 05/20/2024. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 05/20/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [24-5088] [Entered: 04/19/2024 09:24 AM]
April 17, 2024 LETTER [2050053] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 2050049-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 05/17/2024. [24-5088] [Entered: 04/17/2024 03:36 PM]
April 17, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2050049] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 05/17/2024. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [24-5088] [Entered: 04/17/2024 03:34 PM]
April 16, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2049826] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-03438-UNA filed by David Carmine Lettieri. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5088. [24-5088] [Entered: 04/16/2024 12:48 PM]
April 16, 2024 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [24-5088] [Entered: 04/16/2024 12:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Lettieri v. Federal Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carmine Lettieri
Represented By: David Carmine Lettieri
Represented By: Warden (Lockport)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Marshals
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?