Armour Jolley v. Unknown Named BOP Directors, et al
Plaintiff: Armour Lyle Jolley
Defendant: Unknown Named BOP Directors, FBOP Director from 2017 to present, Individually and in official capacity, Unknowned Named BOP Employees, FBOP Gang Unit on August 5, 2020 Classification Officer, Individually and in official capacity, Antonelli, Warden, individually and in official capacity, A. Ballesteros, Dr.; Individually and in official capacity, Unknown Named BOP Employee, Administrative Remedy Coordinator on November 4, 2021, Individually and in official capacity, Nylen, Lt.; Individually and in official capacity and Blanko, Lt.; Individually and in official capacity
Case Number: 24-5111
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [2058789] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/10/2024 ] [24-5111] [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:40 PM]
June 7, 2024 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [2058790] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/10/2024 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [24-5111] [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:41 PM]
June 7, 2024 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [2058791] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/10/2024 ] [24-5111] [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:43 PM]
June 3, 2024 MOTION [2057572] to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis [Case Number 24-5111: IFP Pending USCA] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley (Service Date: 06/03/2024 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 8 pages. [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 02:19 PM]
May 29, 2024 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [2056725] filed by Antonelli, A. Ballesteros, Blanko, Nylen, Unknown Named BOP Directors, Unknown Named BOP Employee and Unknowned Named BOP Employees [Service Date: 05/29/2024 ] [24-5111] (Robertson, Lshauntee) [Entered: 05/29/2024 12:30 PM]
May 29, 2024 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2056726] filed by L'Shauntee J. Robertson and co-counsel Jane Lyons on behalf of Appellees Antonelli, A. Ballesteros, Blanko, Nylen, Unknown Named BOP Directors, Unknown Named BOP Employee and Unknowned Named BOP Employees. [24-5111] (Robertson, Lshauntee) [Entered: 05/29/2024 12:32 PM]
May 28, 2024 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [2057506] submitted by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/03/2024 ] [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:55 AM]
May 28, 2024 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [2057505] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/03/2024 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:55 AM]
May 28, 2024 PRISONER CONSENT TO COLLECTION [2057508] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:57 AM]
May 28, 2024 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [2057512] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:58 AM]
May 28, 2024 MOTION [2057571] to permit appellant to forego providing copies to court and appellees filed by Armour Lyle Jolley (Service Date: 06/03/2024 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 02:18 PM]
May 28, 2024 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2057504] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley. [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:52 AM]
May 28, 2024 LETTER [2057502] requesting copy of docket filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/03/2024 ] [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:51 AM]
May 28, 2024 NOTICE [2057495] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/03/2024 ] [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:44 AM]
May 28, 2024 DOCKETING STATEMENT [2057500] filed by Armour Lyle Jolley [Service Date: 06/03/2024 ] [24-5111] [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:48 AM]
May 20, 2024 MOTION [2055914] to appoint counsel filed by Armour Lyle Jolley (Service Date: 05/23/2024 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [24-5111] [Entered: 05/23/2024 09:40 AM]
May 17, 2024 RECEIPT [2055776] received from Armour Jolley [signed for on 05/07/2024] for documents [ # 2051631-2 ] sent to Appellant Armour Lyle Jolley [24-5111] [Entered: 05/22/2024 01:35 PM]
May 10, 2024 RECEIPT [2054483] received from Armour Jolley [signed for on 05/01/2024] for documents [ # 2051320-2 ] sent to Appellant Armour Lyle Jolley [24-5111] [Entered: 05/15/2024 08:17 AM]
April 29, 2024 LETTER [2051631] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 2051630-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 05/29/2024. [24-5111] [Entered: 04/29/2024 07:56 AM]
April 29, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2051630] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/29/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/13/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/29/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/29/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/29/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/13/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [24-5111] [Entered: 04/29/2024 07:54 AM]
April 26, 2024 NOTICE [2051511] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 24-5111: IFP] [24-5111] [Entered: 04/26/2024 09:41 AM]
April 25, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2051314] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-02580-CKK filed by Armour Lyle Jolley. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5111. [24-5111] [Entered: 04/25/2024 10:01 AM]
April 25, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2051317] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/28/2024; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 05/28/2024. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 05/28/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [24-5111] [Entered: 04/25/2024 10:04 AM]
April 25, 2024 LETTER [2051320] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 2051317-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 05/28/2024. [24-5111] [Entered: 04/25/2024 10:20 AM]
April 25, 2024 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [24-5111] [Entered: 04/25/2024 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Armour Jolley v. Unknown Named BOP Directors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armour Lyle Jolley
Represented By: Armour Lyle Jolley
Represented By: Warden (Florence USP Ad Max)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named BOP Directors, FBOP Director from 2017 to present, Individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknowned Named BOP Employees, FBOP Gang Unit on August 5, 2020 Classification Officer, Individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonelli, Warden, individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ballesteros, Dr.; Individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named BOP Employee, Administrative Remedy Coordinator on November 4, 2021, Individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nylen, Lt.; Individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanko, Lt.; Individually and in official capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Lshauntee J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?