Kurt Kanam, et al v. Debra Haaland, et al
Petitioner: Kurt Kanam and Pilchuck Nation
Respondent: Debra A. Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, or his successor, U.S. Department of the Interior and Bryan Newland, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary-Indian Affairs, or her successor, U.S. Department of the Interior
Case Number: 24-5121
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes APA/Review Agency
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2024 REPLY [2061484] filed by Debra A. Haaland and Bryan Newland to response and RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION filed to Cross Motion [ # 2060716-2 ] [Service Date: 06/25/2024 by US Mail] Length Certification: 455 words. [24-5121] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 06/25/2024 11:33 AM]
June 18, 2024 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [2060716] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 2059878-2 ] combined with a MOTION for summary reversal and vacatur filed by Kurt Kanam [Service Date: 06/20/2024 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,505 words. [24-5121] [Entered: 06/20/2024 11:28 AM]
June 14, 2024 MOTION [2059878] for summary affirmance filed by Debra A. Haaland and Bryan Newland (Service Date: 06/14/2024 by US Mail) Length Certification: 3,857 words. [24-5121] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 06/14/2024 11:56 AM]
June 10, 2024 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL [2058712] with attachements, seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-03183-RBW filed by Kurt Kanam. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5121. [24-5121] [Entered: 06/10/2024 12:35 PM]
June 4, 2024 LETTER [2057805] sent regarding attorney membership to Eric Chibueze Nwaubani for Pilchuck Nation. Application for Admission due 07/05/2024. [24-5121] [Entered: 06/04/2024 11:34 AM]
May 30, 2024 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [2056864] filed by Debra A. Haaland and Bryan Newland [Service Date: 05/30/2024 ] [24-5121] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 05/30/2024 07:41 AM]
May 29, 2024 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2056687] filed by Andrew M. Bernie on behalf of Appellees Debra A. Haaland and Bryan Newland. [24-5121] (Bernie, Andrew) [Entered: 05/29/2024 09:25 AM]
May 24, 2024 MOTION [2056777] to extend time to file brief filed by Kurt Kanam (Service Date: 05/23/2024 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,322 words. [24-5121] [Entered: 05/29/2024 03:03 PM]
May 22, 2024 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL [2055694] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-03183-RBW filed by Kurt Kanam. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5121. [24-5121] [Entered: 05/22/2024 11:20 AM]
May 20, 2024 RECEIPT [2055931] received from N/A for document [ # 2052250-5 ] sent to Appellant Kurt Kanam [24-5121] [Entered: 05/23/2024 10:20 AM]
May 1, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2052246] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-03183-RBW filed by Kurt Kanam. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5121. [24-5121] [Entered: 05/01/2024 11:17 AM]
May 1, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2052250] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/31/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/17/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/31/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/31/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/31/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/17/2024, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [24-5121] [Entered: 05/01/2024 11:22 AM]
May 1, 2024 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2052253] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 8683 2338] of order [ # 2052250-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/31/2024 from Kurt Kanam. [24-5121] [Entered: 05/01/2024 11:27 AM]
May 1, 2024 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [24-5121] [Entered: 05/01/2024 11:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kurt Kanam, et al v. Debra Haaland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kurt Kanam
Represented By: Kurt Kanam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pilchuck Nation
Represented By: Margaret Magdy Farid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debra A. Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, or his successor, U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Newland, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary-Indian Affairs, or her successor, U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?