Fred Gonzales v. Rashida Jones, et al
Plaintiff: Fred Gonzales
Defendant: Rashida Jones, Owner and CEO of MSNBC, Mark Thompson, Owner and CEO of CNN, Suzanne Scott, CEO of Fox and Friends News Network, Rupert Murdock, Owner of Fox and Friends News Network, Ainsley Earhardt, Fox and Friends News Network, Meridith Kopit Levian, Owner and CEO of New York Times, Jeff Bezos, Owner of Washington Post, Will Lewis, CEO of Washington Post and Nexstar Broadcasting Group, Owners of KTAB
Case Number: 24-7049
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2055631] filed referring motion ifp in district court [ # 2055629-2 ] to the district court for consideration. Holding case in abeyance. Case 24-7049 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:24cv349-ACR from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [24-7049] [Entered: 05/22/2024 08:52 AM]
May 20, 2024 MOTION [2055628] to appoint counsel filed by Fred Gonzales [Service Date: 05/22/2024 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [24-7049] [Entered: 05/22/2024 08:38 AM]
May 20, 2024 MOTION [2055629] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by Fred Gonzales [Service Date: 05/22/2024 ] Length Certification: 8 pages. [24-7049] [Entered: 05/22/2024 08:43 AM]
April 29, 2024 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [2052163] received from Jamie Wallace [signed for on 04/24/2024] for order [2050028-2] sent to Appellant Fred Gonzales [24-7049] [Entered: 05/01/2024 08:43 AM]
April 17, 2024 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2050028] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 9948 1462] of orders [ # 2050021-6 ], [ # 2050024-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/17/2024 from Fred Gonzales. [24-7049] [Entered: 04/17/2024 02:29 PM]
April 17, 2024 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2049990] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-cv-00349-ACR filed by Fred Gonzales. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-7049. [24-7049] [Entered: 04/17/2024 11:32 AM]
April 17, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2050021] filed directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 05/17/2024. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 05/17/2024. Directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/17/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [24-7049] [Entered: 04/17/2024 02:00 PM]
April 17, 2024 CLERK'S ORDER [2050024] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/17/2024. APPENDIX due 06/17/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [24-7049] [Entered: 04/17/2024 02:18 PM]
April 17, 2024 PRIVATE PRISONER CASE docketed. [24-7049] [Entered: 04/17/2024 11:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fred Gonzales v. Rashida Jones, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Gonzales
Represented By: Fred Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashida Jones, Owner and CEO of MSNBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thompson, Owner and CEO of CNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Scott, CEO of Fox and Friends News Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupert Murdock, Owner of Fox and Friends News Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ainsley Earhardt, Fox and Friends News Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridith Kopit Levian, Owner and CEO of New York Times
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bezos, Owner of Washington Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Lewis, CEO of Washington Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexstar Broadcasting Group, Owners of KTAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?