Green Edge Enterprises v. Rubber Mulch ETC.

Case Number: 12-1539
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
September 14, 2012 GREEN EDGE ENTERPRISES, LLC. V. RUBBER MULCH ETC., LLC.
April 11, 2013 GREEN EDGE ENTERPRISES, LLC. V. RUBBER MULCH ETC., LLC.
December 12, 2012 GREEN EDGE ENTERPRISES, LLC. V. RUBBER MULCH ETC., LLC.
January 10, 2013 GREEN EDGE ENTERPRISES V. RUBBER MULTCH ETC.
Search for this case: Green Edge Enterprises v. Rubber Mulch ETC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.