Apple Inc. v. Motorola, Inc.

Case Number: 12-1548
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
September 25, 2012 APPLE INC. V. MOTOROLA, INC.
December 6, 2012 APPLE V. MOTOROLA
December 27, 2012 APPLE INC. V. MOTOROLA, INC.
April 25, 2014 Summary Apple Inc. v. Motorola, Inc.
Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Motorola, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.