Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Amicus Curiae: THE FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, THE REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWS EDITORS, BLOOMBERG L.P. and THE WASHINGTON POST
Defendant / Cross Appellant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. and SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: APPLE INC.
Case Number: 12-1600
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2013 Filing 106 Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service: 10/01/2013 by clerk. [107472] [12-1600, 12-1606, 13-1146] [JXB] [Entered: 10/01/2013 04:31 PM]
August 23, 2013 Filing 105 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Reversed and Remanded. (Precedential Opinion). (For the Court: Prost,Circuit Judge; Bryson,Circuit Judge and O'Malley,Circuit Judge). [99850] [JXB] [Entered: 08/23/2013 11:33 AM]
March 26, 2013 Filing 104 Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by Mr. Gregg Paul Leslie for Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists, Mr. Eric S. Parnes for The First Amendment Coalition, William F. Lee for Apple Inc. and Mrs. Victoria Fishman Maroulis, Esq. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Panel: Prost, Bryson and O'Malley. [61667] [KSH] [Entered: 03/26/2013 09:39 AM]
March 21, 2013 Filing 103 Letter from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Clarification of which materials Samsung seeks to seal in its cross-appeal.. Service: 03/21/2013 by email. [60627] [Victoria Maroulis] [Entered: 03/21/2013 11:31 AM]
March 20, 2013 Filing 102 Entry of appearance for Gregg P. Leslie as of counsel for Amici Curiae American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post. Service: 03/20/2013 by email, US mail. [60194] [Gregg Leslie] [Entered: 03/20/2013 10:40 AM]
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting motion to file Entry of Appearance of new counsel [ # 100 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists. Service: 03/20/2013 by clerk. [60166] [KSH] [Entered: 03/20/2013 09:57 AM]
March 19, 2013 Filing 100 MOTION of Amici Curiae American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post to file Entry of Appearance of Gregg P. Leslie. Response/Opposition is due 04/01/2013 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/19/2013 by email. [60074] [Bruce Brown] [Entered: 03/19/2013 04:20 PM]
March 18, 2013 Filing 99 Letter from Appellant Apple Inc. Clarifying Which Materials from the District Court Record Apple Seeks to Seal. Service: 03/18/2013 by clerk. [59660] [William Lee] [Entered: 03/18/2013 03:22 PM]
March 15, 2013 Filing 98 Response to oral argument order from the Amici Curiae American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post designating Eric S. Parnes as arguing attorney. Service: 03/15/2013 by email, US mail. [59219] [William Stein] [Entered: 03/15/2013 04:42 PM]
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting motion to allow argument [ # 95 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists; granting motion to expedite decision/ruling [ # 95 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists; denying as moot motion to allow argument [ # 74 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists. 15 minutes are allotted to amici curiae to be shared as they deem appropriate, without reducing either party's allotment.. Service: 03/14/2013 by clerk. [58844] [KSH] [Entered: 03/14/2013 04:58 PM]
March 14, 2013 Filing 96 RESPONSE of Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to the motion to allow argument [ # 95 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists in 12-1600 , motion to expedite decision/ruling [ # 95 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists in 12-1600. Service: 03/14/2013 by email. [58724] [William Adams] [Entered: 03/14/2013 02:41 PM]
March 13, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION of Amici Curiae American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post to allow argument. Response/Opposition is due 03/28/2013, to expedite the decision/ruling in. Response/Opposition is due 03/28/2013 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/13/2013 by email, US mail. [58478] [William Stein] [Entered: 03/13/2013 06:37 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 94 Response to oral argument order from the Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC designating Victoria F. Maroulis as arguing attorney. Service: 02/15/2013 by email. [51335] [Victoria Maroulis] [Entered: 02/15/2013 01:50 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 93 Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Apple Inc. designating William F. Lee as arguing attorney. Service: 02/15/2013 by clerk. [51215] [Andrew Danford] [Entered: 02/15/2013 10:37 AM]
February 13, 2013 Filing 92 6 paper copies of the supplemental appendix Brief [ # 91 ] received from Appellant Apple Inc.. [50689] [VDW] [Entered: 02/13/2013 01:21 PM]
February 6, 2013 Filing 91 APPENDIX FILED (SUPPLEMENTAL) for Apple Inc. [ # 90 ], [89]. Title: Supplemental Appendix, [Confidential and Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 78. Service: 02/06/2013 by US mail.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/14/2013. [49629] [VDW] [Entered: 02/09/2013 08:58 AM]
February 6, 2013 Filing 90 APPENDIX TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Supplemental Appendix (Non-Confidential). Service: 02/06/2013 by US mail. [48731] [Andrew Danford] [Entered: 02/06/2013 02:37 PM]
February 6, 2013 Filing 89 CONFIDENTIAL APPENDIX TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Supplemental Appendix (Confidential). Service: 02/06/2013 by US mail. [48728] [Andrew Danford] [Entered: 02/06/2013 02:35 PM]
January 31, 2013 Filing 88 Letter from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC regarding intent not to submit supplemental response brief. Service: 01/31/2013 by email. [46968] [William Adams] [Entered: 01/31/2013 02:08 PM]
January 30, 2013 Filing 87 Entry of appearance for Victoria F. Maroulis as of counsel for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 01/30/2013 by email. [46802] [Victoria Maroulis] [Entered: 01/30/2013 06:44 PM]
January 29, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE OF CALENDARING issued. Panel: 1303P. Calendar date/location: Tuesday, 03/26/2013 Washington, D.C. Courtroom 201. Response to oral argument order due: 02/15/2013 [46170] [KSH] [Entered: 01/29/2013 11:30 AM]
January 29, 2013 Filing 85 6 paper copies of the supplemental Brief [ # 84 ] received from Appellant Apple Inc.. [46147] [EO] [Entered: 01/29/2013 10:58 AM]
January 25, 2013 Filing 84 BRIEF FILED (SUPPLEMENTAL) for Apple Inc. [ # 83 ]. Title: Supplemental Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant Apple, Inc., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 15. Service: 01/25/2013 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/04/2013. [45743] [VDW] [Entered: 01/28/2013 06:40 AM]
January 25, 2013 Filing 83 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Supplemental Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 01/25/2013 by email. [45681] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/25/2013 06:00 PM]
January 18, 2013 Filing 82 Official caption revised pursuant to court order of 1/18/13. Service: 01/18/2013 by clerk. [44219] [SJ] [Entered: 01/18/2013 09:47 AM]
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting appellant's motion [ # 80 ] to the extent that 13-1146 is severed from 13-1129, and consolidated with 12-1600, -1606. Apple's supplemental brief is due 7 days from the date of this order. Samsung's supplemental brief is due 7 days from filing of Apple's supplemental brief. Revised official caption reflected in the order. Service: 01/18/2013 by clerk. [44214] [SJ] [Entered: 01/18/2013 09:15 AM]
January 11, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION of Appellant Apple Inc. to designate Appeal No. 13-1146 as a companion case. Response/Opposition is due 01/25/2013, to consolidate appeals (Nos. 12-1600, 12-1606, 13-1146). Response/Opposition is due 01/25/2013, to deconsolidate appeals. Response/Opposition is due 01/25/2013. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/11/2013 by email. [42831] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/11/2013 11:38 AM]
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER deferring motion to allow argument [ # 74 ] to the merits panel assigned to hear the case. A copy of this order and the motions papers shall be transmitted to the merits panel. Service: 01/03/2013 by clerk. [41160] [LMS] [Entered: 01/03/2013 11:55 AM]
January 2, 2013 Filing 77 RESPONSE of Appellant Apple Inc. to the motion to allow argument [ # 74 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists in 12-1600. Service: 01/02/2013 by email. [40989] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/02/2013 04:23 PM]
December 17, 2012 Filing 76 RESPONSE of Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to the motion to allow argument [ # 74 ] filed by Amici Curiae Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists in 12-1600. Service: 12/17/2012 by email. [39229] [William Adams] [Entered: 12/17/2012 10:32 PM]
December 14, 2012 Filing 79 6 paper copies of the four volume appendix Brief [ # 70 ] received from Appellant Apple Inc.. [41207] [VDW] [Entered: 01/03/2013 01:56 PM]
December 14, 2012 Filing 75 6 paper copies of the 2nd brief Brief [ # 72 ] received from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [38775] [VDW] [Entered: 12/14/2012 11:10 AM]
December 13, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION of Amici Curiae American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., The First Amendment Coalition, Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post to allow argument. Response/Opposition due 01/02/2013. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 12/13/2012 by email, US mail. [38715] [William Stein] [Entered: 12/13/2012 07:28 PM]
December 12, 2012 Filing 73 The previously filed brief filed by Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1600 [46], filed by Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1600 [45] is withdrawn. [38340] [SJ] [Entered: 12/12/2012 11:48 AM]
December 11, 2012 Filing 72 BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [ # 69 ]. Title: Corrected Brief for Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 12/11/2012 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. [38331] [SJ] [Entered: 12/12/2012 11:38 AM]
December 11, 2012 Filing 69 BRIEF TENDERED from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Corrected Brief For Defendants-Cross Appellants. Service: 12/11/2012 by email. [38168] [William Adams] [Entered: 12/11/2012 03:46 PM]
December 11, 2012 Filing 68 Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [45] for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 12/11/2012 by email. [38164] [William Adams] [Entered: 12/11/2012 03:39 PM]
December 10, 2012 Filing 70 APPENDIX FILED for Apple Inc. [ # 67 ], [66]. Title: Joint Appendix, [Confidential and Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 631. Service: 12/10/2012 by US mail. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/17/2012. [38255] [VDW] [Entered: 12/12/2012 08:51 AM]
December 10, 2012 Filing 67 APPENDIX TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Joint Appendix (Non-Confidential). Service: 12/10/2012 by US mail. [37876] [William Lee] [Entered: 12/10/2012 04:41 PM]
December 10, 2012 Filing 66 CONFIDENTIAL APPENDIX TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Joint Appendix (Confidential). Service: 12/10/2012 by US mail. [37872] [William Lee] [Entered: 12/10/2012 04:33 PM]
December 7, 2012 Filing 71 6 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 63 ] received from Amici Curiae American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post. [38262] [CC] [Entered: 12/12/2012 09:17 AM]
December 4, 2012 Filing 65 6 paper copies of the 4th brief Brief [ # 64 ] received from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [36815] [CC] [Entered: 12/04/2012 12:42 PM]
November 30, 2012 Filing 64 BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [ # 62 ]. Title: Reply Brief for Defendants-Cross Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 11/30/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/10/2012. Appendix due 12/10/2012. [36481] [CC] [Entered: 12/03/2012 09:46 AM]
November 30, 2012 Filing 62 BRIEF TENDERED from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Reply Brief for Defendants-Cross Appellants. Service: 11/30/2012 by email. [36418] [William Adams] [Entered: 11/30/2012 04:48 PM]
November 19, 2012 Filing 61 6 paper copies of the 3rd brief Brief [ # 60 ] received from Appellant Apple Inc.. [35636] [CC] [Entered: 11/27/2012 11:17 AM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 60 BRIEF FILED for Appellant Apple Inc. [ # 59 ]. Title: Reply Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant Apple Inc., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 11/16/2012 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 11/21/2012. Cross-Appellant's reply brief due 12/03/2012. [34624] [VDW] [Entered: 11/16/2012 03:48 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 59 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Reply Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 11/16/2012 by email. [34580] [William Lee] [Entered: 11/16/2012 01:50 PM]
November 8, 2012 Filing 58 6 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 57 ] received from Amicus Curiae The First Amendment Coalition. [33746] [CC] [Entered: 11/09/2012 02:49 PM]
November 6, 2012 Filing 63 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Society of Professional Journalists and The Washington Post [ # 51 ]. Title: Brief for The Reporters Committee for Freedom of The Press, et. al. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 19. Service: 10/15/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/10/2012. [36480] [CC] [Entered: 12/03/2012 09:43 AM]
November 6, 2012 Filing 57 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for The First Amendment Coalition [ # 55 ]. Title: Brief for the First Amendment Coalition as Amicus Curiae in Support of Affirmance, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 10/15/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 11/13/2012. [33293] [CC] [Entered: 11/07/2012 03:36 PM]
November 6, 2012 Filing 56 This entry was made in error and has been removed from the docket. NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amicus Curiae The First Amendment Coalition, Brief for the First Amendment Coalition as Amicus Curiae in Support of Affirmance. [ # 55 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. amicus brief due 11/20/2012. [33242] This brief was rejected in error. The brief is compliant to file. --[Edited 11/07/2012 by CC] [CC] [Entered: 11/07/2012 02:07 PM]
November 6, 2012 Filing 55 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae The First Amendment Coalition. Title: Brief for the First Amendment Coalition as Amicus Curia in Support of Affirmance. [33238] [CC] [Entered: 11/07/2012 02:02 PM]
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [ # 50 ] Amici Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post and Society of Professional Journalists added to the case. Service: 11/06/2012 by clerk. [32973] [LMS] [Entered: 11/06/2012 02:35 PM]
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [ # 48 ]. Amicus Curiae The First Amendment Coalition added to the case. Service: 11/06/2012 by clerk. [32966] [LMS] [Entered: 11/06/2012 01:59 PM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 52 The brief submitted by pending Amici, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. [ # 51 ] cannot be filed at this time and is placed on the pending shelf; reason: Pending motion to file. [30218] [CC] [Entered: 10/17/2012 10:50 AM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 51 BRIEF TENDERED from The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al. Title: Brief of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al. as Amici Curiae. Service: 10/15/2012 by email. [29958] [Bruce Brown] [Entered: 10/15/2012 09:56 PM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al. for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition due 10/29/2012. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 10/15/2012 by email. [29957] [Bruce Brown] [Entered: 10/15/2012 09:53 PM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 49 Entry of appearance for Bruce D. Brown as principal counsel for The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al.. Service: 10/15/2012 by email. [29956] [Bruce Brown] [Entered: 10/15/2012 09:45 PM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION of First Amendment Coalition for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition due 10/29/2012. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/15/2012 by email. [29952] [William Stein] [Entered: 10/15/2012 08:23 PM]
October 9, 2012 Filing 47 6 paper copies of the 2nd brief Brief [46] received from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [28828] [CC] [Entered: 10/09/2012 02:44 PM]
October 2, 2012 Filing 46 BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [45]. Title: Corrected Brief for Defendants-Cross Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 10/02/2012 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 10/09/2012. [28227] This brief has been withdrawn. See doc. no. [73] [CC] [Entered: 10/04/2012 10:41 AM]
October 2, 2012 Filing 45 BRIEF TENDERED from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Corrected Brief for Defendants-Cross Appellants. Service: 10/02/2012 by email. [28008] This brief has been withdrawn. See doc. no. [73] [William Adams] [Entered: 10/02/2012 06:00 PM]
October 2, 2012 Filing 44 6 paper copies of the 1st brief Brief [ # 42 ] received from Appellant Apple Inc.. [27977] [CC] [Entered: 10/02/2012 03:39 PM]
October 1, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Brief of Defendant-Appellees-Cross Appellants [ # 41 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC brief due 10/16/2012.. Appellant's reply brief due 11/16/2012. [27891] [CC] [Entered: 10/02/2012 11:42 AM]
October 1, 2012 Filing 41 BRIEF TENDERED from Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Brief of Defendants-Appellees-Cross-Appellants. Service: 10/01/2012 by email. [27781] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [ # 43 ] [William Adams] [Entered: 10/01/2012 10:12 PM]
September 24, 2012 Filing 42 BRIEF FILED for Appellant Apple Inc. [ # 34 ]. Title: Corrected Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant Apple, Inc. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 38. Service: 09/24/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 10/09/2012. [27876] [CC] [Entered: 10/02/2012 11:21 AM]
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting motion to file a corrected brief [ # 35 ] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. Service: 09/24/2012 by clerk. [26532] [LMS] [Entered: 09/24/2012 02:07 PM]
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER filed granting motions for emergency stay pending appeal [ # 6 ] filed by Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, [ # 18 ] filed by Appellant Apple Inc.; denying [ # 26 ] motion for leave to intervene; denying [ # 27 ] motion to set briefing schedule; denying [ # 28 ] motion to modify the official caption filed by First Amendment Coalition. FAC may move for leave to file a brief amicus curiae with the brief attached no later than 14 days after Samsung's brief is filed. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 09/18/2012 by clerk. [25701] [LMS] [Entered: 09/18/2012 12:00 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 38 REPLY of First Amendment Coalition in support of motion to amend caption [entry 28] and motion to amend briefing schedule [entry 27]. Response/Opposition due 09/27/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 09/14/2012 by email. [25384]--[ENTRY EDITED 09/17/2012 by the clerk to modify the event used] [William Stein] [Entered: 09/14/2012 09:15 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 37 REPLY of First Amendment Coalition in support of motion for leave to intervene [entry 26]. Service: 09/14/2012 by email. [25383]--[ENTRY EDITED 09/17/2012 by the clerk to modify the event used] [William Stein] [Entered: 09/14/2012 09:13 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 36 The brief submitted by Appellant Apple Inc. [ # 34 ] cannot be filed at this time and is placed on the pending shelf; reason: Pending Motion to file corrected brief. [25355] [CC] [Entered: 09/14/2012 04:21 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION of Appellant Apple Inc. to file a corrected Brief of Plaintiff-Appellant Apple Inc. brief. Response/Opposition due 09/27/2012. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/14/2012 by email. [25299] [William Lee] [Entered: 09/14/2012 01:31 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 34 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Corrected Brief. Service: 09/14/2012 by email. [25295] [William Lee] [Entered: 09/14/2012 01:26 PM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE of Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to the motion for leave to intervene [ # 26 ] , motion to set briefing schedule [ # 27 ] , motion to modify the official caption [ # 28 ]. Service: 09/12/2012 by email. [24986] [William Adams] [Entered: 09/12/2012 04:53 PM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 32 RESPONSE of Appellant Apple Inc. to the motion to modify the official caption [ # 28 ] , motion to set briefing schedule [ # 27 ] , motion for leave to intervene [ # 26 ]. Service: 09/12/2012 by email. [24981] [William Lee] [Entered: 09/12/2012 04:34 PM]
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER requesting a response to [ # 28 ] the motion to reform the official caption, [ # 27 ] the motion to set an expedited briefing schedule, and [ # 26 ] the motion for leave to intervene. Apple Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al. are directed to submit any responses to these motions no later than 5:00 p.m., September 12, 2012. Service: 09/06/2012 by clerk. [24090] [LMS] [Entered: 09/06/2012 03:01 PM]
September 5, 2012 Filing 30 Letter from Reuters America LLC Notice that Reuters America will not file a brief as Appellee (Noted by Clerk: no action required). Service: 09/05/2012 by clerk. [23891] [CC] [Entered: 09/05/2012 11:51 AM]
September 4, 2012 Filing 29 Entry of appearance for Eric S. Parnes as of counsel for First Amendment Coalition. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23779] [Eric Parnes] [Entered: 09/04/2012 11:10 PM]
September 4, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION of First Amendment Coalition to modify the official caption. Response/Opposition due 09/17/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23778] [William Stein] [Entered: 09/04/2012 11:04 PM]
September 4, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION of First Amendment Coalition to set briefing schedule. Response/Opposition due 09/17/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23777] [William Stein] [Entered: 09/04/2012 11:03 PM]
September 4, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION of First Amendment Coalition for leave to intervene. Response/Opposition due 09/17/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23776] [William Stein] [Entered: 09/04/2012 11:02 PM]
September 4, 2012 Filing 25 Entry of appearance for William R. Stein as principal counsel for First Amendment Coalition. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23775] [William Stein] [Entered: 09/04/2012 10:59 PM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 24 Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/30/2012 by email. [23468] [William Adams] [Entered: 08/30/2012 08:35 PM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 23 Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/30/2012 by email. [23467] [William Adams] [Entered: 08/30/2012 08:33 PM]
August 27, 2012 Filing 22 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 08/27/2012 by email. [22978] [William Adams] [Entered: 08/27/2012 05:05 PM]
August 22, 2012 Filing 21 6 paper copies of the 1st brief Brief [ # 20 ] received from Appellant Apple Inc.. [22718] [CC] [Entered: 08/24/2012 09:49 AM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 20 BRIEF FILED for Appellant Apple Inc. [ # 19 ]. Title: Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant Apple Inc., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 44. Service: 08/17/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/27/2012. Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC brief due 10/01/2012. [21965] [CC] [Entered: 08/20/2012 01:08 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 19 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: Brief of Appellant. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21887] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 07:59 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION of Appellant Apple Inc. for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8.. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21885] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 06:30 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 17 Sealed or confidential document received [Motion for Stay of Orders Denying Sealing Pending Appeal - Confidential Version] (corresponding to Doc No. [ # 6 ]) for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21851] [William Adams] [Entered: 08/17/2012 04:10 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for Rachel L. Weiner as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21839] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:56 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Louis W. Tompros as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21837] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:55 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Mark D. Selwyn as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21836] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:53 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Harold J. McElhinny as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21834] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:52 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Michael A. Jacobs as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21833] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:50 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Mark C. Fleming as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21832] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:49 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Andrew J. Danford as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21831] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:48 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21830] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:45 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21827] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:40 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for William F. Lee as principal counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21825] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:38 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION of Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8.. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21795] [William Adams] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:20 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for William B. Adams as of counsel for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21793] [William Adams] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:16 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Kathleen M. Sullivan as principal counsel for Cross-Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/17/2012 by email. [21790] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 08/17/2012 03:13 PM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 3 Official caption revised to add cross appeal by Samsung parties. Service: 08/17/2012 by clerk. [21729] [SJ] [Entered: 08/17/2012 11:43 AM]
August 17, 2012 Filing 2 Note to file: 12-1606 (Cross-appeal started 08/17/2012) is consolidated with 12-1600. [21728] [SJ] [Entered: 08/17/2012 11:42 AM]
August 16, 2012 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/16/2012. [21578] Entry of Appearance due 08/30/2012. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/30/2012. Docketing Statement due 08/30/2012. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due 10/15/2012. [SJ] [Entered: 08/16/2012 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION
Represented By: William Stein
Represented By: Eric S. Parnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Represented By: Jason Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GANNETT CO., INC.
Represented By: Barbara W. Wall
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS
Represented By: Bruce W. Sanford
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Represented By: David McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWS EDITORS
Represented By: Kevin M. Goldberg
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BLOOMBERG L.P.
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Represented By: Charles J. Glasser Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE WASHINGTON POST
Represented By: Gregg Paul Leslie
Represented By: Eric N. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / cross appellant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: William Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / cross appellant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: William Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / cross appellant: SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: William Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Louis W. Tompros
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Represented By: Michael Allen Jacobs
Represented By: Harold J. McElhinny
Represented By: Rachel Weiner Cohen
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?