Franklin Perkins v. Air Force

Case Number: 13-3074
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
March 22, 2013 PERKINS V. AIR FORCE
June 10, 2013 FRANKLIN PERKINS v. MSPB
July 29, 2013 FRANKLIN PERKINS v. MSPB
August 14, 2013 FRANKLIN PERKINS v. MSPB
October 11, 2013 PERKINS v. MSPB
Search for this case: Franklin Perkins v. Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.