Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Amicus Curiae: CARROLL GANTZ, RALPH D. CLIFFORD, JOSEPH M. BALLAY, FRANK VON HOLZHAUSEN, KOHLER COMPANY, MATHIEU TURPAULT, ROBERT IAN BLAICH, BRUCE M. THARP, MICHAEL RISCH, JESSICA SILBEY, Esq., HISPANIC LEADERSHIP FUND, DANIEL W. ASHCRAFT, BRUCE CLAXTON, GORDON PAUL BRUCE, JOHN EDSON, OAKLEY, INC., DAVID ABRAMS, PAUL SPECHT, LEA SHAVER, MICHELLE S. BERRYMAN, NATIONAL GRANGE OF THE ORDER OF THE PATRONS OF HUSBANDRY, THORNTON LOTHROP, DECKERS OUTDOOR CORPORATION, ALEX BALLY, AMY LANDERS, ANDREW SERBINSKI, DALE RAYMOND, GORDON PERRY, FACEBOOK INC., CHARLES AUSTEN ANGELL, ERIC BEYER, BRYCE G. RUTTER, SAMUEL B. PETRE, MARK DZIERSK, SOHRAB VOSSOUGHI, GEORGE RUSSELL DANIELS, HAIG KHACHATOORIAN, REBECCA TUSHNET, JASON MICHAEL SCHULTZ, BRIAN J. LOVE, MARK A. LEMLEY, RYAN VACCA, THE NATIONAL BLACK CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, DESIGN IDEAS, LTD., COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, LOUIS NELSON, TYLER T. OCHOA, CROCS, INC., STEVEN CARL VISSER, THOMAS COTTER, KATHERINE J. STRANDBURG, ALLAN HASTINGS, KERSTIN NELSEN STROM, JAMES J. LESKO, ZHENYU CHERYL QIAN, GOOGLE INC., WILLIAM BULLOCK, JIM AGUTTER, JAMES KAUFMAN, BRIAN RODERMAN, JORGE CONTRERAS, MARK DAVID JANIS, PATRICIA MOORE, LIMELIGHT NETWORKS, INC., BETSY GOODRICH, GERARD FURBERSHAW, STEPHEN MCJOHN, GARY VAN DEURSEN, WILLIAM GALLAGHER, LORRAINE JUSTICE, NEWEGG INC., OSKAR LIIVAK, EBAY INC., PRASAD BORADKAR, JAMES DOUGLAS ALSUP, JR., BUDD STEINHILBER, JAMES MORLEY READ, ROBERT WELSH, ANGELA YEH, GREGORY THOMAS, ARNOLD WASSERMAN, JAMES G. BUDD, TOM MATANO, LUTRON ELECTRONICS, INC., RITASUE SIEGEL, MARK P. MCKENNA, GEORGE L. MCCAIN, BERNARD CHAO, RAYMOND W. RILEY, KEVIN REEDER, NANCY PERKINS, GREGORY BRYANT DARBY, ANDREW CHIN, STEPHEN B. WILCOX, SAS INSTITUTE INC., JONATHAN MASUR, CHARLES L. MAURO, ROBERT BRUNNER, SCOTT DAVID MASON, JASON J. DU MONT, JINSEUP SHIN, aka Ted Shin, RAMA CHORPASH, NOVO NORDISK INC., ALLAN E. WEAVER, TOM GATTIS, CHRISTOPHER J. PARKE, SARAH BURSTEIN, MICHAEL GARTEN, DELL INC., MICHAEL MCCOY, JOHN V. STRAM, ROBERT J. COHN, NUVASIVE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD CO., DONALD M. GENARO, LANCE G. RAKE, STEPHEN G. HAUSER, ROBIN FELDMAN, EDMUND A. WEAVER, CAROL JOAN LASCH, SHUBHA GHOSH, RICHARD WILFRED YELLE, JAMES COUCH, DEL COATES, BROOK KENNEDY, ED DORSA, MICHAEL A. CARRIER, JOHN LEAVITT GARD, METHOD PRODUCTS, PBC and JON M. GARON
Defendant / Appellant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., a New York corporation, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., a Korean corporation and SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Plaintiff / Appellee: APPLE INC., a California Corporation
Case Number: 14-1335
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Filing 233 Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [418066] [14-1335, 15-1029] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/22/2017 04:18 PM]
February 7, 2017 Filing 232 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Remanded. (Nonprecedential Per Curiam Opinion). (For the Court: Prost,Chief Judge; O'Malley,Circuit Judge and Chen,Circuit Judge). [405123] [SMJ] [Entered: 02/07/2017 10:01 AM]
January 23, 2017 Filing 231 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account of Mr. Howard S. Hogan for Michael McCoy, Steven Carl Visser, Lorraine Justice, Jim Agutter, Prasad Boradkar, James G. Budd, Rama Chorpash, Gregory Bryant Darby, Ed Dorsa, Tom Gattis, Allan Hastings, James Kaufman, Brook Kennedy, Haig Khachatoorian, Carol Joan Lasch, Thornton Lothrop, Tom Matano, George L. McCain, Zhenyu Cheryl Qian, Lance G. Rake, James Morley Read, Kevin Reeder, Jinseup Shin, Bruce M. Tharp, Gregory Thomas and Richard Wilfred Yelle. The e-mail address, (ppmurphy@gibsondunn.com), associated with your CM/ECF account has generated a delivery failure notice. Counsel should promptly report a change in contact information with the Pacer Service Center (see Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(1). [400754] [PMM] [Entered: 01/23/2017 12:50 PM]
January 23, 2017 Filing 230 Reply Statement in Support of Remand for New Trial for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 01/23/2017 by email. [400726] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/23/2017 11:44 AM]
January 18, 2017 Filing 229 Reply Statement in Support of Continued Panel Review for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 01/18/2017 by email. [399868] [William Lee] [Entered: 01/18/2017 11:11 AM]
January 12, 2017 Filing 228 Clerk's Note to the File: The court's order filed 1/12/17 is transmitted herewith to the Clerk, U.S. District Court, N.D. Calif.. (Ref: ORDER FILED, [ # 227 ] ) [398145] [AT] [Entered: 01/12/2017 10:45 AM]
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER - Upon consideration of the judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States in Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Apple Inc., No. 15-777, reversing and remanding to this court for further proceedings consistent with the opinion of the Supreme Court, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The mandate of this court issued on August 25, 2015, is recalled, the appeals are reinstated, and this court's May 18, 2015, judgment [ # 158 ] is vacated. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [398100] [14-1335, 15-1029] [AT] [Entered: 01/12/2017 09:26 AM]
January 12, 2017 Filing 226 Statement in Support of Remand for New Trial for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 01/12/2017 by email. [398070] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/12/2017 08:17 AM]
January 9, 2017 Filing 225 Certified judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States issued on 12/06/2016 for 15-777. [397171] [AT] [Entered: 01/09/2017 02:45 PM]
December 27, 2016 Filing 224 Statement in Support of Continued Panel Review for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 12/27/2016 by email. [394651] [William Lee] [Entered: 12/27/2016 04:07 PM]
December 27, 2016 Filing 223 Entry of appearance for Seth P. Waxman as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 12/27/2016 by email. [394643] [Seth Waxman] [Entered: 12/27/2016 04:03 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 222 SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES opinion filed on 12/06/2016 in case 15-777. Ruling of the Supreme Court: Reversed/Remanded. [391792] [14-1335, 15-1029] [JCA] [Entered: 12/16/2016 12:04 PM]
July 22, 2016 Filing 221 Record transmitted to the Supreme Court on 07/22/2016. [SMJ] [Entered: 07/22/2016 02:02 PM]
July 22, 2016 Filing 220 Letter from the Supreme Court of the United States requesting the entire record and briefs. [352950] [SMJ] [Entered: 07/22/2016 01:35 PM]
March 21, 2016 Filing 219 The petition for writ of certiorari, [15-777], filed on 12/14/2015, was Granted limited to Question 2 presented by the petition on 03/21/2016. [320459] [JCA] [Entered: 03/21/2016 03:32 PM]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER filed granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 215 ] filed by Amici Curiae Limelight Networks, Inc., Dell Inc., Google Inc., Newegg Inc., SAS Institute Inc., Facebook Inc., eBay Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Co. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [309411] [JW] [Entered: 02/08/2016 04:25 PM]
February 8, 2016 Filing 217 This entry was made in error and has been removed from the docket. [JW] [Entered: 02/08/2016 04:22 PM]
February 3, 2016 Filing 215 MOTION of Amici Curiae Dell Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks, Inc., Newegg Inc., SAS Institute Inc. and eBay Inc. to withdraw counsel Christopher A. Suarez. Response/Opposition is due 02/19/2016 [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 02/03/2016 by email. [308348] [Christopher Suarez] [Entered: 02/03/2016 06:33 PM]
December 16, 2015 Filing 214 Petition for writ of Certiorari filed on 12/14/2015 in the Supreme Court of the United States. Supreme Court #: 15-777, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Co. v. Apple Inc.. [297212] [FMS] [Entered: 12/17/2015 03:55 PM]
October 20, 2015 Filing 213 Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States: The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari has been granted - to and including 12/14/15. [283393] [SMJ] [Entered: 10/26/2015 12:54 PM]
August 25, 2015 Filing 212 Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [266656] [14-1335, 15-1029] THE MANDATE HAS BEEN RECALLED. SEE DOC. NO. [ # 227 ] [FMS] [Entered: 08/25/2015 12:03 PM]
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER filed denying [ # 208 ] motion to stay mandate filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [266651] [FMS] [Entered: 08/25/2015 11:51 AM]
August 21, 2015 Filing 210 REPLY of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to response filed by Appellee in 14-1335 , Doc. No [ # 209 ]. Service: 08/20/2015 by email. [265884] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 08/21/2015 01:39 AM]
August 20, 2015 Filing 209 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to stay mandate [ # 208 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 14-1335. Service: 08/20/2015 by email. [265646] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/20/2015 09:20 AM]
August 19, 2015 Filing 208 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to stay execution of the mandate until the filing and disposition of Samsung's petition for a writ of certiorari and, if the petition is granted, until the Supreme Court's final disposition. Response/Opposition is due 09/03/2015 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 08/19/2015 by email. [265512] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 08/19/2015 02:53 PM]
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER filed denying [ # 159 ] petition for en banc rehearing filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [263976] [FMS] [Entered: 08/13/2015 03:35 PM]
July 22, 2015 Filing 206 16 paper copies of the response [ # 205 ] received from Appellee Apple Inc.. [258876] [FMS] [Entered: 07/23/2015 02:35 PM]
July 20, 2015 Filing 205 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 14-1335. Service: 07/20/2015 by email. [257820] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/20/2015 04:39 PM]
July 16, 2015 Filing 204 The court invites a response from Appellee Apple Inc. to the petition for en banc rehearing filed by Appellants in 14-1335.. [256893] [FMS] [Entered: 07/16/2015 03:26 PM]
July 13, 2015 Filing 203 16 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 197 ] received from Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce. [255904] [FMS] [Entered: 07/14/2015 02:59 PM]
July 10, 2015 Filing 201 16 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 198 ] received from Amicus Curiae National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. [255311] [FMS] [Entered: 07/10/2015 01:50 PM]
July 9, 2015 Filing 202 16 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 196 ] received from Amici Curiae Dell Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks, Inc., Newegg Inc., SAS Institute Inc. and eBay Inc.. [255316] [FMS] [Entered: 07/10/2015 01:58 PM]
July 9, 2015 Filing 200 16 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 194 ] received from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. [255061] [FMS] [Entered: 07/09/2015 04:05 PM]
July 8, 2015 Filing 199 16 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 195 ] received from Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund. [254717] [FMS] [Entered: 07/08/2015 03:54 PM]
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 177 ] filed by Amicus Curiae National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. By: Court (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [254357] [FMS] [Entered: 07/07/2015 03:41 PM]
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 175 ] filed by Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce. By: Court (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [254342] [FMS] [Entered: 07/07/2015 03:32 PM]
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 174 ]. By: Court (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [254327] [FMS] [Entered: 07/07/2015 03:16 PM]
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [ # 170 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund. By: Court (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [254304] [FMS] [Entered: 07/07/2015 02:47 PM]
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [ # 164 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. By: Court (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [254286] [FMS] [Entered: 07/07/2015 02:17 PM]
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 161 ]. By: Court. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [253761] [FMS] [Entered: 07/06/2015 12:12 PM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 194 CORRECTED AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Computer & Communications Industry Association [ # 183 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 07/02/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file sixteen copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/13/2015. [254527] [FMS] [Entered: 07/08/2015 10:31 AM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 185 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 174 ] , motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 171 ]. Service: 07/02/2015 by email. [253557] [Nathaniel Sabri] [Entered: 07/02/2015 04:47 PM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 184 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account(s) of Sarah Sladic. One or more e-mail addresses (e-mail for cases of interest) associated with your CM/ECF account (ssladic@gibsondunn.com), is invalid and has been returned as undeliverable. Pursuant to ECF-2(E) of the Administrative Order Regarding Electronic Case Filing, an ECF filer must update all contact information with the Pacer Service Center. [253244] [IW] [Entered: 07/02/2015 10:50 AM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 183 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Title: CORRECTED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 07/02/2015 by email. [253228] [Matthew Levy] [Entered: 07/02/2015 10:42 AM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 182 Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [ # 165 ] for Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 07/02/2015 by email. [253227] [Matthew Levy] [Entered: 07/02/2015 10:40 AM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 181 Corrected Entry of appearance for Matthew Levy as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 07/02/2015 by email. [253223] [Matthew Levy] [Entered: 07/02/2015 10:33 AM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 180 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association [ # 165 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [253205] [FMS] [Entered: 07/02/2015 10:08 AM]
July 2, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance Document No. [163] filed by Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association in 14-1335 is without a proper/complete proof of service and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [253175] [FMS] [Entered: 07/02/2015 09:42 AM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 198 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry [ # 178 ]. Number of Pages: 9. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file sixteen copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/13/2015. [254597] [FMS] [Entered: 07/08/2015 12:22 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 197 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for The National Black Chamber of Commerce [ # 176 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file sixteen copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/13/2015. [254586] [FMS] [Entered: 07/08/2015 12:05 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 196 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Dell Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks, Inc., Newegg Inc., SAS Institute Inc. and eBay Inc. [ # 173 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file sixteen copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/13/2015. [254551] [FMS] [Entered: 07/08/2015 11:15 AM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 195 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Hispanic Leadership Fund [ # 172 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file sixteen copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/13/2015. [254538] [FMS] [Entered: 07/08/2015 10:43 AM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 188 16 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 187 ] received from Amici Curiae David Abrams, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Ralph D. Clifford, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Mark A. Lemley, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca. [253801] [FMS] [Entered: 07/06/2015 01:18 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 178 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253097] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 07/01/2015 09:19 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 177 MOTION of Amicus Curiae National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendants-Appellants on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ]. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253096] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 07/01/2015 09:16 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 176 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253095] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 07/01/2015 08:24 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 175 MOTION of Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendants-Appellants on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ]. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253094] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 07/01/2015 08:22 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 174 MOTION of Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc. for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendants-Appellants on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ]. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015 [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253088] [Kannon Shanmugam] [Entered: 07/01/2015 06:21 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 173 TENDERED from Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253058] [Kannon Shanmugam] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:25 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 172 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253056] [Erik Jaffe] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:24 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 171 MOTION of Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc. for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendants-Appellants on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ]. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015 [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253055] [Kannon Shanmugam] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:23 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 170 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253054] [Erik Jaffe] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:22 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 169 Entry of appearance for Christopher A. Suarez as of counsel for Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc.. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253051] [Christopher Suarez] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:14 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 168 Entry of appearance for Allison B. Jones as of counsel for Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc.. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253049] [Allison Rushing] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:11 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 167 Entry of appearance for David M. Krinsky as of counsel for Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc.. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253047] [David Krinsky] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:09 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 166 Entry of appearance for Kannon K. Shanmugam as principal counsel for Dell Inc., eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Limelight Networks Inc., Newegg Inc., and SAS Institute Inc.. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [253046] [Kannon Shanmugam] [Entered: 07/01/2015 05:06 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 165 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [252929] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [ # 180 ] [Matthew Levy] [Entered: 07/01/2015 01:39 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 164 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association for leave to file amicus brief in support of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ]. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015, for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition is due 07/16/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [252927] [Matthew Levy] [Entered: 07/01/2015 01:36 PM]
July 1, 2015 Filing 163 Entry of appearance for Matthew Levy as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 07/01/2015 by email. [252913] [Matthew Levy] [Entered: 07/01/2015 01:25 PM]
June 30, 2015 Filing 187 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for David Abrams, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Ralph D. Clifford, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Mark A. Lemley, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca [ # 162 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 06/30/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/13/2015. [253799] [FMS] [Entered: 07/06/2015 01:14 PM]
June 30, 2015 Filing 162 TENDERED from Amici Curiae David Abrams, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Ralph D. Clifford, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Mark A. Lemley, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/30/2015 by email. [252532] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 06/30/2015 01:11 PM]
June 30, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION of Law Professors for leave to file amicus brief in support of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., a Korean corporation, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., a New York corporation, SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ]. Response/Opposition is due 07/13/2015 [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 06/30/2015 by email. [252530] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 06/30/2015 01:07 PM]
June 19, 2015 Filing 160 16 paper copies of the petition for en banc rehearing [ # 159 ] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [249915] [FMS] [Entered: 06/19/2015 12:04 PM]
June 17, 2015 Filing 159 Petition for en banc rehearing filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 06/17/2015 by email. The paper copies of the petition must be filed within two business days (see ECF-10(d)).The required paper copies should be received by the court on or before 06/19/2015 [249497] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 06/17/2015 05:00 PM]
May 26, 2015 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account(s) of Christopher Robinson for Apple Inc. One or more e-mail addresses associated with your CM/ECF account, (clementine@mofo.com), is invalid and has been returned as undeliverable. Pursuant to ECF-2(E) of the Administrative Order Regarding Electronic Case Filing, an ECF filer must update all contact information with the Pacer Service Center. [243428] [IW] [Entered: 05/26/2015 01:16 PM]
May 18, 2015 Filing 158 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Affirmed-in-part, Reversed-in-part, Vacated-in-part and Remanded. (Precedential Opinion). (For the Court: Prost,Chief Judge; O'Malley,Circuit Judge and Chen,Circuit Judge). [241438] THE JUDGMENT IS VACATED, pursuant to the court's order filed 1/12/17. See Doc. No. [ # 227 ] [FMS] [Entered: 05/18/2015 09:13 AM]
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER filed granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 156 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc., granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 155 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc.. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [233473] [FMS] [Entered: 04/16/2015 02:36 PM]
April 15, 2015 Filing 156 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc. to withdraw counsel Benjamin S. Fernandez. Response/Opposition is due 04/30/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/15/2015 by email. [233120] [Joel Sayres] [Entered: 04/15/2015 03:40 PM]
April 15, 2015 Filing 155 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc. to withdraw counsel Natalie Hanlon-Leh. Response/Opposition is due 04/30/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/15/2015 by email. [233117] [Joel Sayres] [Entered: 04/15/2015 03:37 PM]
January 7, 2015 Filing 154 Amended Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 01/07/2015 by email. [207745] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 01/07/2015 10:11 AM]
December 22, 2014 Filing 153 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the supplemental authority [ # 152 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 14-1335. Service: 12/22/2014 by email. [205582] [William Lee] [Entered: 12/22/2014 08:49 AM]
December 16, 2014 Filing 152 Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 12/16/2014 by email. [204560] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 12/16/2014 10:54 PM]
December 4, 2014 Filing 151 Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by Ms. Kathleen M. Sullivan for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and William F. Lee for Apple Inc.. Panel: Judge: Prost , Judge: O'Malley , Judge: Chen. [201682] [KSH] [Entered: 12/04/2014 09:56 AM]
November 14, 2014 Filing 150 Response to oral argument order from the Appellee Apple Inc.. designating William F. Lee as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 30 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [197736] [William Lee] [Entered: 11/14/2014 12:17 PM]
November 14, 2014 Filing 149 Response to oral argument order from the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. designating Kathleen M. Sullivan as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 25 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 5 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [197714] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 11/14/2014 11:46 AM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 148 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the supplemental authority [ # 145 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 14-1335. Service: 10/29/2014 by email. [193744] [William Lee] [Entered: 10/29/2014 04:24 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 147 Note to file: The following cases are associated:14-1335 (lead) with 15-1029 (consolidated). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [193650] [14-1335, 15-1029] [SMJ] [Entered: 10/29/2014 01:48 PM]
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting motion to consolidate appeal nos. 2014-1335 and 2015-1029 [ # 191585-2 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Service: 10/29/2014 by clerk. [193632] [14-1335, 15-1029] [LS] [Entered: 10/29/2014 01:14 PM]
October 27, 2014 Filing 145 Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 10/27/2014 by email. [192988] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 10/27/2014 09:35 PM]
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER filed granting motion to seek more time for argument [ # 143 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [192945] [KSH] [Entered: 10/27/2014 04:14 PM]
October 24, 2014 Filing 143 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for additional time at oral argument. Response/Opposition is due 11/06/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/24/2014 by email. [192549] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 10/24/2014 05:07 PM]
October 21, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE OF CALENDARING. Panel: 1412J. Case scheduled Dec 04, 2014 10:00 a.m. at the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20439), Courtroom 201. Response to oral argument order due: 11/14/2014. Counsel should check-in 30 minutes prior to the opening of the session. Please review the # Oral Argument Order. [191439] THIS NOTICE APPLIES TO CASE(S): [14-5037, 14-1151, 14-7072, 14-1335] [KSH] [Entered: 10/21/2014 04:26 PM]
September 22, 2014 Filing 141 Notice from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC regarding conflicts with oral argument (November 6; December 5). Service: 09/22/2014 by email. [184256] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/22/2014 11:56 AM]
September 17, 2014 Filing 140 6 paper copies of the appendix Brief [ # 139 ], appendix Brief [138] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [183309] [SW] [Entered: 09/17/2014 11:00 AM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 139 APPENDIX FILED for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [ # 134 ], [ # 133 ]. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Number of Pages: 4471. Service: 09/15/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 09/22/2014. [182895] [SW] [Entered: 09/16/2014 09:37 AM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 138 CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX FILED for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [137], [136]. Title: CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX. Number of Pages: 4471. Service: 09/15/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10 six paper copies should be filed of the confidential version only. [182889] [SW] [Entered: 09/16/2014 09:22 AM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 137 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Appellee Apple Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX Service: 09/15/2014 by email. [182749] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/15/2014 04:51 PM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 136 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Appellee Apple Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX Service: 09/15/2014 by email. [182731] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/15/2014 04:36 PM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 135 Notice from Appellee Apple Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (November 3-7; December 2). Service: 09/15/2014 by email. [182725] [William Lee] [Entered: 09/15/2014 04:30 PM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 134 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Appellee Apple Inc.. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 09/15/2014 by email. [182708] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/15/2014 04:18 PM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 133 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Appellee Apple Inc.. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 09/15/2014 by email. [182693] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/15/2014 04:04 PM]
September 15, 2014 Filing 132 Statement of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 33 for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 09/15/2014 by email. [182462] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/15/2014 10:40 AM]
September 10, 2014 Filing 131 6 paper copies of the 3rd brief (corrected) [ # 129 ] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [181418] [SMJ] [Entered: 09/10/2014 02:44 PM]
September 8, 2014 Filing 130 Pursuant to notification from counsel, the previously submitted brief filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 14-1335 [126] is replaced. [180777] [SMJ] [Entered: 09/08/2014 03:30 PM]
September 5, 2014 Filing 129 BRIEF FILED for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [ # 128 ]. Title: CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF. Number of Pages: 60. Service: 09/05/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 09/15/2014. Appendix is due 09/15/2014. [180776] [SMJ] [Entered: 09/08/2014 03:28 PM]
September 5, 2014 Filing 128 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF. Service: 09/05/2014 by email. [180508] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/05/2014 06:33 PM]
September 5, 2014 Filing 127 Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [126] for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 09/05/2014 by email. [180507] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/05/2014 06:31 PM]
September 4, 2014 Filing 126 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 09/04/2014 by email. [180140] This brief has been replaced. [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 09/04/2014 11:29 PM]
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER filed granting motion to waive requirements of brief or appendix [ # 84 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Samsungs reply brief, not to exceed 8,500 words, is due no later than September 4, 2014. Service: 08/20/2014 by clerk. [176400] [NEL] [Entered: 08/20/2014 09:48 AM]
August 15, 2014 Filing 124 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 121 ] received from Amici Curiae Jason J. Du Mont and Mark David Janis. [175408] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/15/2014 10:46 AM]
August 13, 2014 Filing 123 Corrected Entry of appearance for Benjamin S. Fernandez as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2014 by email. [174878] [Benjamin Fernandez] [Entered: 08/13/2014 01:32 PM]
August 13, 2014 Filing 122 Entry of appearance for Benjamin S. Fernandez as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2014 by email. [174877] [Benjamin Fernandez] [Entered: 08/13/2014 01:22 PM]
August 12, 2014 Filing 121 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Jason J. Du Mont and Mark David Janis [ # 120 ]. Title: CORRECTED AMICUS BRIEF. Number of Pages: 39. Service: 08/12/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/18/2014. [174727] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/13/2014 09:17 AM]
August 12, 2014 Filing 120 TENDERED from Amici Curiae Jason J. Du Mont and Mark David Janis. Title: CORRECTED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 08/12/2014 by email. [174608] [Mark Janis] [Entered: 08/12/2014 03:47 PM]
August 11, 2014 Filing 119 REPLY of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to response filed by Appellee in 14-1335 , Doc. No [ # 114 ]. Service: 08/11/2014 by email. [174365] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 08/11/2014 10:07 PM]
August 11, 2014 Filing 118 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 112 ] received from Amici Curiae Jim Agutter, Prasad Boradkar, James G. Budd, Rama Chorpash, Gregory Bryant Darby, Ed Dorsa, Tom Gattis, Allan Hastings, Lorraine Justice, James Kaufman, Brook Kennedy, Haig Khachatoorian, Carol Joan Lasch, Thornton Lothrop, Tom Matano, George L. McCain, Michael McCoy, Zhenyu Cheryl Qian, Lance G. Rake, James Morley Read, Kevin Reeder, Jinseup Shin, Bruce M. Tharp, Gregory Thomas, Steven Carl Visser and Richard Wilfred Yelle. [174293] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/11/2014 04:09 PM]
August 11, 2014 Filing 117 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 107 ] received from Amici Curiae Deckers Outdoor Corporation, Design Ideas, Ltd., Kohler Company, Lutron Electronics, Inc., Method Products, PBC, Novo Nordisk Inc., NuVasive, Inc. and Oakley, Inc. [174283] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/11/2014 03:59 PM]
August 11, 2014 Filing 116 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 113 ] received from Amici Curiae James Douglas Alsup, Jr., Charles Austen Angell, Daniel W. Ashcraft, Joseph M. Ballay, Alex Bally, Michelle S. Berryman, Eric Beyer, Robert Ian Blaich, Gordon Paul Bruce, Robert Brunner, William Bullock, Bruce Claxton, Del Coates, Robert J. Cohn, James Couch, George Russell Daniels, Mark Dziersk, John Edson, Gerard Furbershaw, Carroll Gantz, John Leavitt Gard, Michael Garten, Donald M. Genaro, Betsy Goodrich, Stephen G. Hauser, James J. Lesko, Scott David Mason, Charles L. Mauro, Patricia Moore, Louis Nelson, Christopher J. Parke, Nancy Perkins, Gordon Perry, Samuel B. Petre, Dale Raymond, Raymond W. Riley, Brian Roderman, Bryce G. Rutter, Andrew Serbinski, RitaSue Siegel, Paul Specht, Budd Steinhilber, John V. Stram, Kerstin Nelsen Strom, Mathieu Turpault, Sohrab Vossoughi, Arnold Wasserman, Allan E. Weaver, Edmund A. Weaver, Robert Welsh, Stephen B. Wilcox, Angela Yeh, Gary van Deursen and Frank von Holzhausen. [174280] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/11/2014 03:57 PM]
August 11, 2014 Filing 114 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to waive requirements of brief or appendix [ # 84 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 14-1335. Service: 08/11/2014 by email. [174227] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/11/2014 02:22 PM]
August 8, 2014 Filing 115 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 108 ] received from Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc. [174274] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/11/2014 03:51 PM]
August 7, 2014 Filing 111 Corrected Entry of appearance for Joel D. Sayres as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2014 by email. [173615] [Natalie Hanlon-Leh] [Entered: 08/07/2014 03:12 PM]
August 7, 2014 Filing 110 Corrected Entry of appearance for Natalie Hanlon-Leh as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2014 by email. [173614] [Natalie Hanlon-Leh] [Entered: 08/07/2014 03:09 PM]
August 7, 2014 Filing 109 Notice of Rejection to Amicus Curiae Crocs, Inc., the following document(s) cannot be filed: [97] attorney entry of appearance , [98] attorney entry of appearance. Reason(s): documents are not text-searchable. Corrected document due on or before 08/14/2014. [173607] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/07/2014 02:46 PM]
August 7, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amici Curiae Jason J. Du Mont and Mark David Janis, Brief of Amici Curiae Jason J. Du Mont and Mark D. Janis in Support of Appellee Apple Inc. [ # 93 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected amicus brief due 08/21/2014. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [173554] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/07/2014 01:08 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 113 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for James Douglas Alsup, Jr., Charles Austen Angell, Daniel W. Ashcraft, Joseph M. Ballay, Alex Bally, Michelle S. Berryman, Eric Beyer, Robert Ian Blaich, Gordon Paul Bruce, Robert Brunner, William Bullock, Bruce Claxton, Del Coates, Robert J. Cohn, James Couch, George Russell Daniels, Mark Dziersk, John Edson, Gerard Furbershaw, Carroll Gantz, John Leavitt Gard, Michael Garten, Donald M. Genaro, Betsy Goodrich, Stephen G. Hauser, James J. Lesko, Scott David Mason, Charles L. Mauro, Patricia Moore, Louis Nelson, Christopher J. Parke, Nancy Perkins, Gordon Perry, Samuel B. Petre, Dale Raymond, Raymond W. Riley, Brian Roderman, Bryce G. Rutter, Andrew Serbinski, RitaSue Siegel, Paul Specht, Budd Steinhilber, John V. Stram, Kerstin Nelsen Strom, Mathieu Turpault, Sohrab Vossoughi, Arnold Wasserman, Allan E. Weaver, Edmund A. Weaver, Robert Welsh, Stephen B. Wilcox, Angela Yeh, Gary van Deursen and Frank von Holzhausen [ # 105 ]. Title: AMICUS BRIEF. Number of Pages: 53. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/13/2014. [173891] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/08/2014 02:17 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 112 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Jim Agutter, Prasad Boradkar, James G. Budd, Rama Chorpash, Gregory Bryant Darby, Ed Dorsa, Tom Gattis, Allan Hastings, Lorraine Justice, James Kaufman, Brook Kennedy, Haig Khachatoorian, Carol Joan Lasch, Thornton Lothrop, Tom Matano, George L. McCain, Michael McCoy, Zhenyu Cheryl Qian, Lance G. Rake, James Morley Read, Kevin Reeder, Jinseup Shin, Bruce M. Tharp, Gregory Thomas, Steven Carl Visser and Richard Wilfred Yelle [ # 99 ]. Title: AMICUS BRIEF. Number of Pages: 48. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/12/2014. [173640] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/07/2014 03:49 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 108 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Crocs, Inc. [ # 100 ]. Title: AMICUS BRIEF. Number of Pages: 31. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/12/2014. [173604] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/07/2014 02:43 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 107 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Deckers Outdoor Corporation, Design Ideas, Ltd., Kohler Company, Lutron Electronics, Inc., Method Products, PBC, Novo Nordisk Inc., NuVasive, Inc. and Oakley, Inc. [ # 96 ]. Title: AMICUS BRIEF. Number of Pages: 45. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/12/2014. [173576] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/07/2014 01:46 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 105 TENDERED from 54 Distinguished Industrial Design Professionals Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172699] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 08/04/2014 09:43 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 104 Entry of appearance for Will Melehani as of counsel for 54 Distinguished Industrial Design Professionals. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172697] [Will Melehani] [Entered: 08/04/2014 09:31 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 103 Entry of appearance for Katherine M. Kopp as of counsel for 54 Distinguished Industrial Design Professionals. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172695] [Katherine Kopp] [Entered: 08/04/2014 09:21 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 102 Entry of appearance for Rachel Wainer Apter as of counsel for 54 Distinguished Industrial Design Professionals. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172689] [Rachel Apter] [Entered: 08/04/2014 09:09 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 101 Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies as principal counsel for 54 Distinguished Industrial Design Professionals. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172688] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 08/04/2014 09:01 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 100 TENDERED from Crocs, Inc. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172682] [Natalie Hanlon-Leh] [Entered: 08/04/2014 07:05 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 99 TENDERED from Amici Curiae Design Educators Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172679] [Brian Buroker] [Entered: 08/04/2014 06:14 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 98 Entry of appearance for Joel D. Sayres as of counsel for Crocs, Inc.. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172665] This document has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 109 ] [Natalie Hanlon-Leh] [Entered: 08/04/2014 05:35 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 97 Entry of appearance for Natalie Hanlon-Leh as principal counsel for Crocs, Inc.. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172664] This document has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 109 ] [Natalie Hanlon-Leh] [Entered: 08/04/2014 05:34 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 96 TENDERED from DESIGN IDEAS, LTD., NOVO NORDISK, INC., LUTRON ELECTRONICS, INC., NUVASIVE, INC., METHOD PRODUCTS, PBC, OAKLEY, INC., DECKERS OUTDOOR CORPORATION AND KOHLER CO. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172625] [Perry Saidman] [Entered: 08/04/2014 04:04 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 95 Entry of appearance for Perry J. Saidman as principal counsel for DESIGN IDEAS, LTD., NOVO NORDISK, INC., LUTRON ELECTRONICS, INC., NUVASIVE, INC., METHOD PRODUCTS, PBC, OAKLEY, INC., DECKERS OUTDOOR CORPORATION AND KOHLER CO.. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172624] [Perry Saidman] [Entered: 08/04/2014 04:03 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 94 Entry of appearance for Mark D. Janis as principal counsel for Jason J. Du Mont and Mark D. Janis. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172613] [Mark Janis] [Entered: 08/04/2014 03:41 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 93 TENDERED Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172609] This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 106 ] [Mark Janis] [Entered: 08/04/2014 03:38 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 92 Entry of appearance for Howard S. Hogan as of counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172582] [Howard Hogan] [Entered: 08/04/2014 02:44 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 91 Entry of appearance for Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. as of counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172577] [Theodore Boutrous] [Entered: 08/04/2014 02:41 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 90 Entry of appearance for Lucas C. Townsend as of counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172531] [Lucas Townsend] [Entered: 08/04/2014 01:05 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 89 Entry of appearance for Robert J. Becher as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172529] [Robert Becher] [Entered: 08/04/2014 01:01 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 88 Entry of appearance for Sarah J. Sladic as of counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172528] [Brian Buroker] [Entered: 08/04/2014 01:01 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 87 Entry of appearance for H. Mark Lyon as of counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172508] [Hervey Lyon] [Entered: 08/04/2014 12:38 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 86 Entry of appearance for Mark A. Perry as of counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172504] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 08/04/2014 12:34 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 85 Entry of appearance for Brian M. Buroker as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Design Educators. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172500] [Brian Buroker] [Entered: 08/04/2014 12:29 PM]
August 4, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to waive the requirements regarding the brief (Defendants-Appellants respectfully move for leave to file a reply brief of up to 8,500 words). Response/Opposition is due 08/18/2014 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 08/04/2014 by email. [172407] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 08/04/2014 10:24 AM]
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief [ # 81 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Reply brief is due 09/04/2014. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [172125] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/01/2014 09:25 AM]
July 31, 2014 Filing 83 6 paper copies of the 2nd brief [ # 80 ] received from Appellee Apple Inc. [172132] [SMJ] [Entered: 08/01/2014 09:54 AM]
July 31, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to extend the time to 09/04/2014 at 11:59 pm to file the reply brief. Response/Opposition is due 08/14/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/31/2014 by email. [172070] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 07/31/2014 05:56 PM]
July 30, 2014 Filing 79 Official caption revised pursuant to 7/30/14 court order dismissing cross-appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [171512] [SMJ] [Entered: 07/30/2014 08:57 AM]
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting motion to terminate cross-appeal [ # 76 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.; granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 76 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Apple Inc. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [171506] [SMJ] [Entered: 07/30/2014 08:31 AM]
July 28, 2014 Filing 80 BRIEF FILED for Appellee Apple Inc. [ # 77 ]. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Number of Pages: 108. Service: 07/28/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/04/2014. Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC reply brief is due 08/14/2014. [171572] [SMJ] [Entered: 07/30/2014 11:49 AM]
July 28, 2014 Filing 77 TENDERED from Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/28/2014 by email. [171220] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/28/2014 09:11 PM]
July 28, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Apple Inc. to terminate cross/consolidated appeal. Response/Opposition is due 08/11/2014, to modify the official caption. Response/Opposition is due 08/11/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/28/2014 by email. [170809] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/28/2014 09:48 AM]
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file cross-appellant's principal brief [ # 74 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Apple Inc. Cross-Appellant Apple Inc. brief due 07/28/2014. Service: 06/23/2014 by clerk. [162961] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/23/2014 09:31 AM]
June 20, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Apple Inc. to extend the time to 07/28/2014 at 11:59 pm to file the appellee/respondent/cross-appellant's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 07/03/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/20/2014 by email. [162933] [William Lee] [Entered: 06/20/2014 06:36 PM]
June 9, 2014 Filing 73 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 63 ] received from Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce. [160103] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:04 PM]
June 9, 2014 Filing 71 Corrected Entry of appearance for Thomas Sprankling as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/09/2014 by email. [159971] [Thomas Sprankling] [Entered: 06/09/2014 12:15 PM]
June 9, 2014 Filing 70 Entry of appearance for Thomas Sprankling as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/09/2014 by email. [159968] [Thomas Sprankling] [Entered: 06/09/2014 12:08 PM]
June 6, 2014 Filing 67 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 50 ] received from Amicus Curiae National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. [159739] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/06/2014 03:38 PM]
June 5, 2014 Filing 72 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 64 ] received from Amici Curiae David Abrams, Sarah Burstein, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Andrew Chin, Ralph D. Clifford, Jorge Contreras, Thomas Cotter, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Jon M. Garon, Shubha Ghosh, Amy Landers, Mark A. Lemley, Oskar Liivak, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Mr. Jason Michael Schultz, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Katherine J. Strandburg, Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca. [160102] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:03 PM]
June 5, 2014 Filing 69 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 52 ] received from Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund. [159744] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/06/2014 03:43 PM]
June 5, 2014 Filing 66 Entry of appearance for Eric Fletcher as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/05/2014 by email. [159405] [Eric Fletcher] [Entered: 06/05/2014 03:59 PM]
June 5, 2014 Filing 65 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:correction notice Docket No. [ # 58 ], ERROR: Incorrect event used. CORRECTION: Proper event is 'brief tendered'. No further action required, as party has made appropriate correction - see entry 61. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [159260] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/05/2014 11:42 AM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 68 6 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 59 ] received from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. [159742] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/06/2014 03:41 PM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 64 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for David Abrams, Sarah Burstein, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Andrew Chin, Ralph D. Clifford, Jorge Contreras, Thomas Cotter, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Jon M. Garon, Shubha Ghosh, Amy Landers, Mark A. Lemley, Oskar Liivak, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Mr. Jason Michael Schultz, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Katherine J. Strandburg, Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca [ # 62 ]. Title: Corrected Brief Amici Curiae of 27 Law Professors in Support of Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/10/2014. [159256] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/05/2014 11:39 AM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 63 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for The National Black Chamber of Commerce [ # 61 ]. Title: Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce in Support of Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 44. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/10/2014. [159247] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/05/2014 11:29 AM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 62 TENDERED from Amici Curiae David Abrams, Sarah Burstein, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Andrew Chin, Ralph D. Clifford, Jorge Contreras, Thomas Cotter, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Jon M. Garon, Shubha Ghosh, Amy Landers, Mark A. Lemley, Oskar Liivak, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Mr. Jason Michael Schultz, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Katherine J. Strandburg, Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca. Title: CORRECTED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. [159113] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 06/04/2014 05:07 PM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 61 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce. Title: CORRECTED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. [159059] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 06/04/2014 03:08 PM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 60 Entry of appearance for Kevin S. Prussia as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. [158904] [Kevin Prussia] [Entered: 06/04/2014 11:31 AM]
June 3, 2014 Filing 59 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Computer & Communications Industry Association [ # 54 ]. Title: Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association in Support of Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 16. Service: 06/03/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/09/2014. [158747] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/03/2014 05:19 PM]
June 3, 2014 Filing 58 Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [ # 46 ] for Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce. Service: 06/03/2014 by email. [158696] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 06/03/2014 03:31 PM]
June 3, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce, Brief of Amicus Curiae The National Black Chamber of Commerce in Support of Defendants-Appellants [ # 46 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. [158692] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/03/2014 03:14 PM]
June 3, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amici Curiae David Abrams, Sarah Burstein, Michael A. Carrier, Bernard Chao, Andrew Chin, Ralph D. Clifford, Jorge Contreras, Thomas Cotter, Robin Feldman, William Gallagher, Jon M. Garon, Shubha Ghosh, Amy Landers, Mark A. Lemley, Oskar Liivak, Brian J. Love, Jonathan Masur, Stephen McJohn, Mark P. McKenna, Tyler T. Ochoa, Michael Risch, Mr. Jason Michael Schultz, Lea Shaver, Jessica Silbey, Esq., Katherine J. Strandburg, Rebecca Tushnet and Ryan Vacca, Brief Amici Curiae of 27 Law Professors in Support of Appellant [ # 44 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Amici brief due 06/17/2014. [158660] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:17 PM]
June 3, 2014 Filing 55 Corrected Entry of appearance for J. Carl Cecere, Cecere PC as principal counsel for the National Black Chamber of Commerce, Amicus Curiae. Service: 06/03/2014 by email. [158522] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 06/03/2014 10:10 AM]
June 3, 2014 Filing 54 TENDERED from Computer & Communications Industry Association Title: CORRECTED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/03/2014 by email. [158498] [Matthew Schruers] [Entered: 06/03/2014 09:40 AM]
June 2, 2014 Filing 53 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. Service: 06/02/2014 by email. [158409] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 06/02/2014 05:55 PM]
June 2, 2014 Filing 51 Corrected Entry of appearance for Erik S. Jaffe as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund. Service: 06/02/2014 by email. [158401] [Erik Jaffe] [Entered: 06/02/2014 05:24 PM]
June 2, 2014 Filing 49 Notice of Rejection to Amicus Curiae Hispanic Leadership Fund, the following document(s) cannot be filed: [38] attorney entry of appearance. Reason(s): no certificate of service. [158389] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/02/2014 05:06 PM]
June 2, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association, Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants-Appellants [ # 37 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. [158384] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/02/2014 04:53 PM]
June 2, 2014 Filing 47 Corrected Entry of appearance for Laura A. Lydigsen as of counsel for The National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. Service: 06/02/2014 by email. [158226] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 06/02/2014 01:09 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 52 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Hispanic Leadership Fund [ # 41 ]. Title: Brief of Hispanic Leadership Fund as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 23. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/09/2014. [158406] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/02/2014 05:33 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 50 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry [ # 42 ]. Title: National Grange's Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 17. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/09/2014. [158398] [SMJ] [Entered: 06/02/2014 05:19 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 46 TENDERED from The National Black Chamber of Commerce, amicus curiae Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158085] This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 57 ] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 05/30/2014 10:01 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 45 Entry of appearance for J. Carl Cecere as principal counsel for The National Black Chamber of Commerce, amicus curiae. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158084] [Joseph Cecere] [Entered: 05/30/2014 09:49 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 44 TENDERED from 27 Law Professors (in support of Appellant Samsung) Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158083] This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 56 ] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 05/30/2014 08:04 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 43 Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley as principal counsel for 27 Law Professors (in support of Appellant Samsung). Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158081] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 05/30/2014 08:00 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 42 TENDERED from The National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158080] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 05/30/2014 07:41 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 41 TENDERED from Hispanic Leadership Fund Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158078] [Erik Jaffe] [Entered: 05/30/2014 07:18 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 40 Entry of appearance for Timothy Q. Delaney as principal counsel for The National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158077] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 05/30/2014 07:16 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 39 Entry of appearance for Laura A. Lydigsen as of counsel for The National Grange of the Order of the Patrons of Husbandry. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158076] [Laura Lydigsen] [Entered: 05/30/2014 07:15 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 38 Entry of appearance for Erik S. Jaffe as principal counsel for Hispanic Leadership Fund. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158075] This document has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 49 ] [Erik Jaffe] [Entered: 05/30/2014 07:09 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 37 TENDERED from Computer & Communications Industry Association Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158015] This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 48 ] [Matthew Schruers] [Entered: 05/30/2014 03:08 PM]
May 30, 2014 Filing 36 Entry of appearance for Matthew Schruers as principal counsel for Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 05/30/2014 by email. [158011] [Matthew Schruers] [Entered: 05/30/2014 02:59 PM]
May 29, 2014 Filing 35 6 paper copies of the 1st brief [ # 34 ] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [157640] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/29/2014 01:02 PM]
May 23, 2014 Filing 34 BRIEF FILED for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [ # 33 ]. Title: Opening Brief for Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 250. Service: 05/23/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/02/2014. Cross-Appellant Apple Inc. brief is due 07/07/2014. [157135] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/27/2014 05:17 PM]
May 23, 2014 Filing 33 TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 05/23/2014 by email. [156838] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 05/23/2014 11:51 PM]
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER filed granting motion to file an extended opening brief [ # 31 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Samsung's opening brief, not to exceed 17,000 words, is due no later than May 23, 2014. Service: 05/19/2014 by clerk. [155308] [LS] [Entered: 05/19/2014 11:43 AM]
April 25, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to waive the requirements regarding the brief (Defendants-Appellants-Cross-Appellees respectfully move for leave to file an opening brief of up to 17,000 words. See Fed. R. App. P. 28.1(e)(2)(A)(i); Fed. Cir. R. 28(c).). Response/Opposition is due 05/08/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/25/2014 by email. [150533] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 04/25/2014 01:36 PM]
April 24, 2014 Filing 30 Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 04/24/2014 by email. [150415] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 04/24/2014 06:48 PM]
April 24, 2014 Filing 29 Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 04/24/2014 by clerk. [150274] [William Lee] [Entered: 04/24/2014 01:00 PM]
April 1, 2014 Filing 28 Entry of appearance for Nathan B. Sabri as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 04/01/2014 by email. [145290] [Nathaniel Sabri] [Entered: 04/01/2014 03:42 PM]
March 27, 2014 Filing 27 Official caption revised to reflect addition of Apple's cross-appeal. Service: 03/27/2014 by clerk. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. [144225] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/27/2014 08:54 AM]
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellants' principal brief [ # 25 ] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Brief due 05/23/2014. Service: 03/27/2014 by clerk. [144222] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/27/2014 08:41 AM]
March 26, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to extend the time to 05/23/2014 at 11:59 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 04/10/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/26/2014 by email. [144215] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 03/26/2014 08:52 PM]
March 26, 2014 Filing 24 Entry of appearance for Christopher Robinson as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/26/2014 by email. [144205] [Christopher Robinson] [Entered: 03/26/2014 05:52 PM]
March 26, 2014 Filing 23 Entry of appearance for Ruth N. Borenstein as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/26/2014 by email. [144203] [Ruth Borenstein] [Entered: 03/26/2014 05:47 PM]
March 26, 2014 Filing 22 Entry of appearance for Rachel Krevans as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/26/2014 by email. [144202] [Rachel Krevans] [Entered: 03/26/2014 05:44 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 21 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143596] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 03/24/2014 08:12 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 20 Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143595] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 03/24/2014 08:10 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 19 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143586] [William Lee] [Entered: 03/24/2014 06:22 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 18 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143585] [William Lee] [Entered: 03/24/2014 06:22 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Mark D. Selwyn as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143573] [Mark Selwyn] [Entered: 03/24/2014 06:00 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for William F. Lee as principal counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143569] [William Lee] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:48 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Mark C. Fleming as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143566] [Mark Fleming] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:43 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Andrew J. Danford as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143564] [Andrew Danford] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:40 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Sarah R. Frazier as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143563] [Sarah Frazier] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:38 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for James L. Quarles III as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143562] [James Quarles] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:37 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Lauren B. Fletcher as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/24/2014 by email. [143560] [Lauren Fletcher] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:34 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 10 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 03/20/2014 by email. [142960] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 03/20/2014 07:26 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 9 Note to file: The following cases are associated:14-1335 Lead with 14-1368 Cross Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [142785] [CC] [Entered: 03/20/2014 10:52 AM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for B. Dylan Proctor as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141980] [B. Dylan Proctor] [Entered: 03/14/2014 08:26 PM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Susan R. Estrich as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141979] [Susan Estrich] [Entered: 03/14/2014 08:20 PM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Michael T. Zeller as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141740] [Michael Zeller] [Entered: 03/14/2014 09:45 AM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Victoria F. Maroulis as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141737] [Victoria Maroulis] [Entered: 03/14/2014 09:40 AM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Kevin A. Smith as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141735] [Kevin Smith] [Entered: 03/14/2014 09:38 AM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for William B. Adams as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141733] [William Adams] [Entered: 03/14/2014 09:36 AM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Kathleen M. Sullivan as principal counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141731] [Kathleen Sullivan] [Entered: 03/14/2014 09:34 AM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/07/2014. [140638] Entry of Appearance due 03/24/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/24/2014. Docketing Statement due 03/24/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 05/09/2014. [SMJ] [Entered: 03/10/2014 11:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CARROLL GANTZ
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RALPH D. CLIFFORD
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSEPH M. BALLAY
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRANK VON HOLZHAUSEN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KOHLER COMPANY
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATHIEU TURPAULT
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT IAN BLAICH
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRUCE M. THARP
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL RISCH
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JESSICA SILBEY, Esq.
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HISPANIC LEADERSHIP FUND
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DANIEL W. ASHCRAFT
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRUCE CLAXTON
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GORDON PAUL BRUCE
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN EDSON
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OAKLEY, INC.
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID ABRAMS
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAUL SPECHT
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEA SHAVER
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHELLE S. BERRYMAN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL GRANGE OF THE ORDER OF THE PATRONS OF HUSBANDRY
Represented By: Tim Delaney
Represented By: Laura A. Lydigsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THORNTON LOTHROP
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DECKERS OUTDOOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALEX BALLY
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMY LANDERS
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW SERBINSKI
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DALE RAYMOND
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GORDON PERRY
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FACEBOOK INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHARLES AUSTEN ANGELL
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ERIC BEYER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRYCE G. RUTTER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAMUEL B. PETRE
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK DZIERSK
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOHRAB VOSSOUGHI
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE RUSSELL DANIELS
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HAIG KHACHATOORIAN
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REBECCA TUSHNET
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JASON MICHAEL SCHULTZ
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN J. LOVE
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK A. LEMLEY
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RYAN VACCA
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE NATIONAL BLACK CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Joseph Carl Cecere Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DESIGN IDEAS, LTD.
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Matthew A. Levy
Represented By: Matthew Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOUIS NELSON
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TYLER T. OCHOA
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CROCS, INC.
Represented By: Joel Sayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEVEN CARL VISSER
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THOMAS COTTER
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHERINE J. STRANDBURG
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALLAN HASTINGS
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KERSTIN NELSEN STROM
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES J. LESKO
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ZHENYU CHERYL QIAN
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAM BULLOCK
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JIM AGUTTER
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES KAUFMAN
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN RODERMAN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JORGE CONTRERAS
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK DAVID JANIS
Represented By: Mark David Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PATRICIA MOORE
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LIMELIGHT NETWORKS, INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BETSY GOODRICH
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GERARD FURBERSHAW
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEPHEN MCJOHN
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GARY VAN DEURSEN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAM GALLAGHER
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LORRAINE JUSTICE
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEWEGG INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OSKAR LIIVAK
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EBAY INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PRASAD BORADKAR
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES DOUGLAS ALSUP, JR.
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BUDD STEINHILBER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES MORLEY READ
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT WELSH
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANGELA YEH
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREGORY THOMAS
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARNOLD WASSERMAN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES G. BUDD
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM MATANO
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LUTRON ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RITASUE SIEGEL
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK P. MCKENNA
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE L. MCCAIN
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BERNARD CHAO
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAYMOND W. RILEY
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEVIN REEDER
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY PERKINS
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREGORY BRYANT DARBY
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW CHIN
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEPHEN B. WILCOX
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAS INSTITUTE INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JONATHAN MASUR
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHARLES L. MAURO
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT BRUNNER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCOTT DAVID MASON
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JASON J. DU MONT
Represented By: Mark David Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JINSEUP SHIN, aka Ted Shin
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAMA CHORPASH
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALLAN E. WEAVER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM GATTIS
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTOPHER J. PARKE
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SARAH BURSTEIN
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL GARTEN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DELL INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL MCCOY
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN V. STRAM
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT J. COHN
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NUVASIVE, INC.
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEWLETT-PACKARD CO.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Represented By: Allison Jones Rushing
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DONALD M. GENARO
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LANCE G. RAKE
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEPHEN G. HAUSER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBIN FELDMAN
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDMUND A. WEAVER
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAROL JOAN LASCH
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHUBHA GHOSH
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD WILFRED YELLE
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES COUCH
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEL COATES
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROOK KENNEDY
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ED DORSA
Represented By: Brian Buroker
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Sarah Sladic
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Howard S. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL A. CARRIER
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN LEAVITT GARD
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Will Melehani
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: METHOD PRODUCTS, PBC
Represented By: Perry J. Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JON M. GARON
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., a New York corporation
Represented By: Robert Jason Becher
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Represented By: William Adams
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zeller
Represented By: B. Dylan Proctor
Represented By: Susan Rachel Estrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., a Korean corporation
Represented By: Robert Jason Becher
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Represented By: William Adams
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zeller
Represented By: B. Dylan Proctor
Represented By: Susan Rachel Estrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: Robert Jason Becher
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Represented By: William Adams
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zeller
Represented By: B. Dylan Proctor
Represented By: Susan Rachel Estrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: APPLE INC., a California Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Sprankling
Represented By: Lauren B. Fletcher
Represented By: James Quarles III
Represented By: Sarah R. Frazier Esq.
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Represented By: Nathaniel Bryan Sabri
Represented By: Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Eric Fletcher
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Represented By: Kevin Scott Prussia
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming
Represented By: Ruth N. Borenstein
Represented By: Rachel Krevans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?