Oracle America, Inc. v. Google LLC
Amicus Curiae: STEVE WOZNIAK, AMERICAN PHOTOGRAPHIC ARTISTS, JOSEPH SCOTT MILLER, JOSHUA DAVID SARNOFF, ZHI DING, ROGER ALLAN FORD, DAVE SNIGIER, YVETTE JOY LIEBESMAN, BEN DEPOORTER, JESSICA SILBEY, Esq., JOHN HENNESSY, MARY SHAW, RONALD L. RIVEST, GUIDO VAN ROSSUM, KEN CASTLEMAN, BJARNE STROUSTRUP, JON A. BAUMGARTEN, MIGUEL DE ICAZA, DOUG LEA, LEA SHAVER, KIN LANE, FREDERICK BROOKS, RICK CATTELL, PAUL MENCHINI, BOB LEE, JAN VITEK, JEFFREY ULLMAN, SEAN M. O'CONNOR, TOM JENNINGS, MICHAEL W. CARROLL, GILAD BRACHA, JOSHUA BLOCH, PHILIP WADLER, PACA, DIGITAL MEDIA LICENSING ASSOCIATION, INC., KEN THOMPSON, DAVID PATTERSON, MARTIN ODERSKY, ANDRIES VAN DAM, MATTHEW BISHOP, DAWSON ENGLER, BSA I THE SOFTWARE ALLIANCE, RAYMOND T. NIMMER, SCREEN ACTORS GUILD - AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS, DAVID L. DILL, NEW YORK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW ASSOCIATION, ALAN KAY, STEPHEN CARLISLE, REBECCA TUSHNET, BRIAN BEHLENDORF, BRIAN J. LOVE, RALPH OMAN, THE APP DEVELOPERS ALLIANCE, ALEX PAYNE, JENNIFER M. URBAN, Esq., ERIC BREWER, COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, SHYAMKRISHNA BALGANESH, TYLER T. OCHOA, VICTORIA F. PHILLIPS, MOZILLA CORPORATION, HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY, TOM BALL, KATHERINE J. STRANDBURG, ANNEMARIE BRIDY, JAMES GRIMMELMANN, PAMELA SAMUELSON, SCOTT MCNEALY, NEAL GAFTER, ARTI K. RAI, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, KEVIN COLLINS, MICHAEL TIEMANN, MARK F. SCHULTZ, ADAM MOSSOFF, JEROME H. REICHMAN, MICHAEL J. MADISON, BARBARA SIMONS, HAROLD ABELSON, MARTIN FOWLER, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, JIARUI LIU, HUGH HANSEN, WILLIAM COOK, OREN BRACHA, SHENG LIANG, AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, RED HAT, INC., DEVLIN HARTLINE, L. PETER DEUTSCH, JESSICA LITMAN, GERALD JAY SUSSMAN, LESTER EARNEST, MARK DAVIS, R STREET INSTITUTE, TIM PATERSON, SANDRA AISTARS, MATTHEW BARBLAN, BRIAN SUTPHIN, TIMOTHY K. ARMSTRONG, PROFESSIONAL PHOTOGRAPHERS OF AMERICA, FRANK YELLIN, ERIC PRIEST, PETER NORVIG, RECORDING INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, MICHAEL RUSTAD, ANN BARTOW, MARK P. MCKENNA, BRENDAN EICH, PETER J. WEINBERGER, EUGENE H. SPAFFORD, CLARK D. ASAY, ED LAZOWSKA, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MEDIA PHOTOGRAPHERS, INC., JAMES H. WALDO, ANDREW CHIN, JULIE E. COHEN, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., NORTH AMERICAN NATURE PHOTOGRAPHY ASSOCIATION, ROBERT SEDGEWICK, VINTON G. CERF, ADAM PORTER, JIM GIBSON, CURTIS SCHROEDER, GITHUB, INC., ANDREW TANENBAUM, TIM PEIERLS, BRIAN KERNIGHAN, GRAPHIC ARTISTS GUILD, ANDREW W. MOORE, JEFFREY DEAN, JAMES H. MORRIS, BRAD TEMPLETON, MICHAEL A. CARRIER, DANIEL S. WALLACH, WHITFIELD DIFFIE, BARBARA LISKOV, DAVID KLAUSNER, ENGINE ADVOCACY, AARON PERZANOWSKI, JOHN VILLASENOR, DAN BONEH, RAY KURZWEIL, CHRISTOPHER JON SPRIGMAN, DAN L. BURK, MATTHEW SAG, BRIAN L. FRYE, THE COPYRIGHT ALLIANCE, PETER JASZI, ALFRED Z. SPECTOR, COMPETITIVE CARRIERS ASSOCIATION, ANDREW TRIDGELL, INDEPENDENT FILM & TELEVISION ALLIANCE, ROBERT HARPER, IVAN E. SUTHERLAND, REBECCA CURTIN, LINUS TORVALDS, JON BENTLEY, DEIRDRE K. MULLIGAN, MICROSOFT CORP., SIMON PHIPPS, GORDON BELL, ERIC GOLDMAN, JON M. GARON and BILL PUGH
Defendant / Cross Appellant: GOOGLE LLC and GOOGLE INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 17-1118
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 313 Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States: The parties are directed to file supplemental letter briefs addressing the appropriate standard of review for the second question presented, including but not limited to the implications of the Seventh Amendment, if any, on that standard. The briefs, not to exceed 10 pages, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, August 7, 2020. [692041] [JAB] [Entered: 05/04/2020 03:35 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 312 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney Matthew Bush [ # 311 ] filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [677552] [JAB] [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:18 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 311 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to withdraw counsel Matthew Bush [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/09/2020 by email. [677381] [17-1118] [Matthew Bush] [Entered: 03/09/2020 08:06 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 310 Record transmitted to the Supreme Court on 02/26/2020. [674375] [JCP] [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:42 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 309 Letter from the Supreme Court of the United States requesting the entire record and briefs. [673711] [JCP] [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:09 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 308 The petition for writ of certiorari, [18-956], filed on 01/24/2019, was Granted on 11/15/2019. [650218] [JAB] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:06 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 307 Petition for writ of Certiorari filed on 01/24/2019, and placed on the docket 01/25/2019, in the Supreme Court of the United States. Supreme Court #: 18-956, Google LLC v. Oracle America, Inc. [581484] [JAB] [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:29 PM]
November 1, 2018 Filing 306 Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States: The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to The Chief Justice, who on October 23, 2018, extended the time to and including January 25, 2019. [562016] [JAB] [Entered: 11/01/2018 03:46 PM]
September 4, 2018 Filing 305 Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [546915] [17-1118, 17-1202] [SJ] [Entered: 09/04/2018 01:09 PM]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER filed denying [ # 249 ] petition for en banc rehearing filed by Google LLC. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [545797] [SJ] [Entered: 08/28/2018 10:42 AM]
August 3, 2018 Filing 303 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 302 ] Ruchika Agrawal filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [540653] [SJ] [Entered: 08/03/2018 11:38 AM]
August 2, 2018 Filing 302 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to withdraw counsel Ruchika Agrawal [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 08/02/2018 by email. [540533] [17-1118] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/02/2018 05:20 PM]
July 31, 2018 Filing 301 18 paper copies of the response [ # 300 ] received from Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [539652] [SJ] [Entered: 07/31/2018 10:46 AM]
July 27, 2018 Filing 300 RESPONSE of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to the petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Service: 07/27/2018 by email. [539065] [17-1118] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 07/27/2018 01:42 PM]
July 19, 2018 Filing 299 Amended Entry of appearance for Michael S. Kwun as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Service: 07/19/2018 by email. [537045] [17-1118] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 07/19/2018 02:28 PM]
June 20, 2018 Filing 297 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 296 ] Robert Walker filed by Amici Curiae Professor Pamela Samuelson and Clark D. Asay. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [530885] [SJ] [Entered: 06/20/2018 01:06 PM]
June 20, 2018 Filing 296 MOTION of Amici Curiae Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson to withdraw counsel Robert K. Walker [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/20/2018 by email. [530862] [17-1118] [Catherine Crump] [Entered: 06/20/2018 12:06 PM]
June 20, 2018 Filing 295 Notice of Rejection to Amici Curiae Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson, the following document(s): motion to withdraw attorney [ # 294 ] is REJECTED for filing. Reason(s): see attached. Service: 06/20/2018 by clerk. [530761] [SJ] [Entered: 06/20/2018 08:45 AM]
June 19, 2018 Filing 298 18 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 283 ] received from Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. [530930] [SJ] [Entered: 06/20/2018 03:18 PM]
June 19, 2018 Filing 294 MOTION of Amici Curiae Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson to withdraw counsel Robert K. Walker [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/19/2018 by email. [530733] [17-1118] [Catherine Crump] [Entered: 06/19/2018 08:43 PM]
June 18, 2018 Filing 293 18 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 282 ] received from Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [530161] [JAB] [Entered: 06/18/2018 10:14 AM]
June 18, 2018 Filing 292 18 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 285 ] received from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. [530160] [JAB] [Entered: 06/18/2018 10:13 AM]
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file response to rehearing/en banc petition [ # 280 ] filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc. By: (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [529847] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 01:11 PM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 290 18 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 286 ] received from Amicus Curiae Tom Ball, et al. [529768] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:17 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 289 18 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 287 ] received from Amici Curiae Public Knowledge and R Street Institute. [529766] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:16 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 288 18 paper copies of the amicus brief [ # 284 ] received from Amici Curiae Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson. [529765] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:15 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 287 AMICUS BRIEF FILED on Petition for Public Knowledge and R Street Institute[ # 271 ]. Pages: 13. The filer is directed to submit the approriate number of copies within two days, see Fed. Cir. R. 25(c). [529760] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:08 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 286 AMICUS BRIEF FILED on Petition for Tom Ball, Brian Behlendorf, Jon Bentley, Matthew Bishop, Joshua Bloch, Dan Boneh, Gilad Bracha, Eric Brewer, Frederick Brooks, Rick Cattell, Vinton G. Cerf, William Cook, Mark Davis, Jeffrey Dean, L. Peter Deutsch, David L. Dill, Lester Earnest, Dawson Engler, Martin Fowler, Neal Gafter, Robert Harper, John Hennessy, Alan Kay, Brian Kernighan, David Klausner, Kin Lane, Ed Lazowska, Doug Lea, Bob Lee, Paul Menchini, James H. Morris, Peter Norvig, Martin Odersky, Tim Paterson, David Patterson, Alex Payne, Tim Peierls, Simon Phipps, Ronald L. Rivest, Curtis Schroeder, Robert Sedgewick, Mary Shaw, Dave Snigier, Alfred Z. Spector, Bjarne Stroustrup, Ivan E. Sutherland, Brad Templeton, Ken Thompson, Andrew Tridgell, Jeffrey Ullman, John Villasenor, Jan Vitek, Philip Wadler, James H. Waldo, Daniel S. Wallach, Peter J. Weinberger, Steve Wozniak, Frank Yellin, Andries van Dam and Guido van Rossum[ # 269 ]. Pages: 10. The filer is directed to submit the approriate number of copies within two days, see Fed. Cir. R. 25(c). [529759] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:07 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 285 AMICUS BRIEF FILED on Petition for Computer & Communications Industry Association[ # 261 ]. Pages: 10. The filer is directed to submit the approriate number of copies within two days, see Fed. Cir. R. 25(c). [529754] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:00 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 284 AMICUS BRIEF FILED on Petition for Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson[ # 259 ]. Pages: 11. The filer is directed to submit the approriate number of copies within two days, see Fed. Cir. R. 25(c). [529753] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 10:59 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 283 AMICUS BRIEF FILED on Petition for American Antitrust Institute[ # 255 ]. Pages: 14. The filer is directed to submit the approriate number of copies within two days, see Fed. Cir. R. 25(c). [529751] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 10:57 AM]
June 15, 2018 Filing 282 AMICUS BRIEF FILED on Petition for Electronic Frontier Foundation[ # 253 ]. Pages: 10. The filer is directed to submit the approriate number of copies within two days, see Fed. Cir. R. 25(c). [529749] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 10:55 AM]
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER filed granting motions for leave to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 273 ], [ # 268 ], [ # 267 ], [ # 260 ], [ # 254 ], [ # 252 ]. By: (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [529747] [SJ] [Entered: 06/15/2018 10:50 AM]
June 14, 2018 Filing 280 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to extend the time to file a response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc until 07/27/2018 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/14/2018 by email. [529600] [17-1118] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 06/14/2018 05:33 PM]
June 14, 2018 Filing 279 REPLY of Amici Curiae Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson to response filed by Appellant, Doc. No [ # 278 ]. Service: 06/14/2018 by email. [529540] [17-1118] [Catherine Crump] [Entered: 06/14/2018 03:49 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 278 RESPONSE of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to the motion leave to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 273 ]. Service: 06/13/2018 by email. [529251] [17-1118] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 06/13/2018 09:15 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 277 The court invites a response from Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to the petition for en banc rehearing filed by Cross-Appellant in 17-1118. [529181] [SJ] [Entered: 06/13/2018 03:52 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 276 Entry of appearance for Meredith Rose as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge R Street Institute. Service: 06/13/2018 by email. [529134] [17-1118] [Meredith Rose] [Entered: 06/13/2018 02:04 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 275 Amended Entry of appearance for Michael Barclay as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. Service: 06/13/2018 by email. [529105] [17-1118] [Michael Barclay] [Entered: 06/13/2018 12:53 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 274 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance Document No. [ # 265 ], attorney entry of appearance Document No. [ # 264 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge and R Street in 17-1118 is without a proper/complete proof of service, and indicates more than one attorney serving as lead, and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [529005]--[Edited 06/13/2018 by SMJ to correct docket text] [SJ] [Entered: 06/13/2018 10:16 AM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 273 MOTION of Copyright Professors Pamela Samuelson & Clark Asay for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendant-Cross Appellant Google LLC on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 06/13/2018 by email. [528978] [17-1118] [Robert Walker] [Entered: 06/13/2018 09:34 AM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 272 Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert Walker as of counsel for Copyright Professors Pamela Samuelson & Clark Asay. Service: 06/13/2018 by email. [528974] [17-1118] [Robert Walker] [Entered: 06/13/2018 09:31 AM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 271 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge.from R Street Institute (EOA pending) Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528942] [17-1118] [Meredith Rose] [Entered: 06/13/2018 08:56 AM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 270 Amended Entry of appearance for Jeffrey T. Pearlman as of counsel for Amici Curiae Tom Ball, Brian Behlendorf, Matthew Bishop, Jon Bentley, Joshua Bloch, Dan Boneh, Gilad Bracha, Eric Brewer, Frederick Brooks, Rick Cattell, Vinton G. Cerf, William Cook, Mark Davis, Jeffrey Dean, L. Peter Deutsch, David L. Dill, Lester Earnest, Dawson Engler, Martin Fowler, Neal Gafter, Robert Harper, John Hennessy, Alan Kay, Brian Kernighan, David Klausner, Kin Lane, Ed Lazowska, Doug Lea, Bob Lee, Paul Menchini, James H. Morris, Peter Norvig, Martin Odersky, David Patterson, Tim Paterson, Alex Payne, Tim Peierls, Simon Phipps, Ronald L. Rivest, Curtis Schroeder, Robert Sedgewick, Mary Shaw, Dave Snigier, Alfred Z. Spector, Bjarne Stroustrup, Ivan E. Sutherland, Brad Templeton, Ken Thompson, Andrew Tridgell, Jeffrey Ullman, Andries van Dam, Guido van Rossum, John Villasenor, Jan Vitek, Philip Wadler, James H. Waldo, Daniel S. Wallach, Peter J. Weinberger, Steve Wozniak and Frank Yellin. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528922] [17-1118] [Jeffrey Pearlman] [Entered: 06/12/2018 11:31 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 269 TENDERED from Amici Curiae Tom Ball, Brian Behlendorf, Jon Bentley, Matthew Bishop, Joshua Bloch, Dan Boneh, Gilad Bracha, Eric Brewer, Frederick Brooks, Rick Cattell, Vinton G. Cerf, William Cook, Mark Davis, Jeffrey Dean, L. Peter Deutsch, David L. Dill, Lester Earnest, Dawson Engler, Martin Fowler, Neal Gafter, Robert Harper, John Hennessy, Alan Kay, Brian Kernighan, David Klausner, Kin Lane, Ed Lazowska, Doug Lea, Bob Lee, Paul Menchini, James H. Morris, Peter Norvig, Martin Odersky, Tim Paterson, David Patterson, Alex Payne, Tim Peierls, Simon Phipps, Ronald L. Rivest, Curtis Schroeder, Robert Sedgewick, Mary Shaw, Dave Snigier, Alfred Z. Spector, Bjarne Stroustrup, Ivan E. Sutherland, Brad Templeton, Ken Thompson, Andrew Tridgell, Jeffrey Ullman, Andries van Dam, Guido van Rossum, John Villasenor, Jan Vitek, Philip Wadler, James H. Waldo, Daniel S. Wallach, Peter J. Weinberger, Steve Wozniak and Frank Yellin. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528921] [17-1118] [Phillip Malone] [Entered: 06/12/2018 11:31 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 268 MOTION of Amici Curiae Tom Ball, Brian Behlendorf, Jon Bentley, Matthew Bishop, Joshua Bloch, Dan Boneh, Gilad Bracha, Eric Brewer, Frederick Brooks, Rick Cattell, Vinton G. Cerf, William Cook, Mark Davis, Jeffrey Dean, L. Peter Deutsch, David L. Dill, Lester Earnest, Dawson Engler, Martin Fowler, Neal Gafter, Robert Harper, John Hennessy, Alan Kay, Brian Kernighan, David Klausner, Kin Lane, Ed Lazowska, Doug Lea, Bob Lee, Paul Menchini, James H. Morris, Peter Norvig, Martin Odersky, Tim Paterson, David Patterson, Alex Payne, Tim Peierls, Simon Phipps, Ronald L. Rivest, Curtis Schroeder, Robert Sedgewick, Mary Shaw, Dave Snigier, Alfred Z. Spector, Bjarne Stroustrup, Ivan E. Sutherland, Brad Templeton, Ken Thompson, Andrew Tridgell, Jeffrey Ullman, Andries van Dam, Guido van Rossum, John Villasenor, Jan Vitek, Philip Wadler, James H. Waldo, Daniel S. Wallach, Peter J. Weinberger, Steve Wozniak and Frank Yellin for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendant-Cross-Appellant Google LLC on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528919] [17-1118] [Phillip Malone] [Entered: 06/12/2018 11:23 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 267 MOTION of Amicus Curiae R Street Institute (Entry of Appearance pending) Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge for leave to file amicus brief in support of Cross-Appellant Google LLC on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528915] [17-1118] [Meredith Rose] [Entered: 06/12/2018 10:52 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 266 Entry of appearance for Phillip R. Malone as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Tom Ball, Brian Behlendorf, Jon Bentley, Matthew Bishop, Joshua Bloch, Dan Boneh, Gilad Bracha, Eric Brewer, Frederick Brooks, Rick Cattell, Vinton G. Cerf, William Cook, Mark Davis, Jeffrey Dean, L. Peter Deutsch, David L. Dill, Lester Earnest, Dawson Engler, Martin Fowler, Neal Gafter, Robert Harper, John Hennessy, Alan Kay, Brian Kernighan, David Klausner, Kin Lane, Ed Lazowska, Doug Lea, Bob Lee, Paul Menchini, James H. Morris, Peter Norvig, Martin Odersky, Tim Paterson, David Patterson, Alex Payne, Tim Peierls, Simon Phipps, Ronald L. Rivest, Curtis Schroeder, Robert Sedgewick, Mary Shaw, Dave Snigier, Alfred Z. Spector, Bjarne Stroustrup, Ivan E. Sutherland, Brad Templeton, Ken Thompson, Andrew Tridgell, Jeffrey Ullman, Andries van Dam, Guido van Rossum, John Villasenor, Jan Vitek, Philip Wadler, James H. Waldo, Daniel S. Wallach, Peter J. Weinberger, Steve Wozniak and Frank Yellin. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528914] [17-1118] [Phillip Malone] [Entered: 06/12/2018 10:49 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 265 Entry of appearance for Meredith Rose as of counsel for R Street Institute. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528913] [17-1118] [Meredith Rose] [Entered: 06/12/2018 10:38 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 264 Entry of appearance for Meredith Rose as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528912] [17-1118] [Meredith Rose] [Entered: 06/12/2018 10:36 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 263 Notice of Rejection to Amici Curiae Clark D. Asay and Professor Pamela Samuelson, the following document(s): motion leave to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [ # 258 ] is REJECTED for filing. Reason(s): see attached. Service: 06/12/2018 by clerk. [528872] [SJ] [Entered: 06/12/2018 04:35 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 262 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The attorney entry of appearance Document No. [ # 256 ] is indicating more than one principal attorney for the party(s) and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [528871] [SJ] [Entered: 06/12/2018 04:32 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 261 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528833] [17-1118] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 06/12/2018 02:55 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 260 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendant-Cross-Appellant Google LLC on petition [ # 249 ] [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528831] [17-1118] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 06/12/2018 02:53 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 259 TENDERED from Copyright Professors Pamela Samuelson & Clark Asay Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528828] [17-1118] [Robert Walker] [Entered: 06/12/2018 02:48 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION of Copyright Professors Pamela Samuelson & Clark Asay for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendant-Cross Appellant Google LLC on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528826] [17-1118] [Robert Walker] [Entered: 06/12/2018 02:46 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 257 Entry of appearance for Catherine Newby Crump as of counsel for Copyright Professors Pamela Samuelson & Clark Asay. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528825] [17-1118] [Robert Walker] [Entered: 06/12/2018 02:43 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 256 Entry of appearance for Robert Walker as principal counsel for Copyright Professors Pamela Samuelson & Clark Asay. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528823] [17-1118] [Robert Walker] [Entered: 06/12/2018 02:41 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 255 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528796] [17-1118] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 06/12/2018 01:47 PM]
June 12, 2018 Filing 254 MOTION of Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendant Cross-Appellant Google on petition [ # 249 ] [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/12/2018 by email. [528792] [17-1118] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 06/12/2018 01:37 PM]
June 11, 2018 Filing 253 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/11/2018 by email. [528548] [17-1118] [Michael Barclay] [Entered: 06/11/2018 05:53 PM]
June 11, 2018 Filing 252 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation for leave to file amicus brief in support of Defendant-Cross-Appellant Google LLC on petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/11/2018 by email. [528547] [17-1118] [Michael Barclay] [Entered: 06/11/2018 05:48 PM]
May 31, 2018 Filing 251 18 paper copies of the petition for en banc rehearing [ # 249 ] received from Cross-Appellant Google LLC. [525861] [SJ] [Entered: 05/31/2018 01:33 PM]
May 30, 2018 Filing 250 Entry of appearance for Marisa C. Maleck as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Service: 05/30/2018 by email. [525602] [17-1118] [Marisa Maleck] [Entered: 05/30/2018 05:26 PM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 249 Petition for en banc rehearing filed by Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Service: 05/29/2018 by email. The paper copies of the petition must be filed within two business days (see Fed. Cir. R. 35(c)(4).The required paper copies should be received by the court on or before 05/31/2018 [525224] [17-1118] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 05/29/2018 08:27 PM]
May 25, 2018 Filing 248 Entry of appearance for Anne M. Voigts as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Service: 05/25/2018 by email. [524680] [17-1118] [Anne Voigts] [Entered: 05/25/2018 11:21 AM]
May 8, 2018 Filing 247 Amended Entry of appearance for Michael S. Kwun as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 05/08/2018 by email. [520189] [17-1118] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/08/2018 07:51 PM]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing/en banc [ # 245 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Petition for Rehearing due on or before 05/29/2018. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [511992] [SJ] [Entered: 04/10/2018 10:28 AM]
April 6, 2018 Filing 245 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Google LLC to extend the time to file a Petition for Rehearing En Banc until 05/29/2018. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/06/2018 by email. [511174] [17-1118] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 04/06/2018 10:17 AM]
April 6, 2018 Filing 244 Amended Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Google LLC. Service: 04/06/2018 by email. [511168] [17-1118] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 04/06/2018 10:12 AM]
March 27, 2018 Filing 243 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Reversed and Remanded; Cross-Appeal Dismissed. (Precedential Opinion). (For the Court: O'Malley, Circuit Judge; Plager, Circuit Judge and Taranto, Circuit Judge). [508126] [17-1118, 17-1202] [SJ] [Entered: 03/27/2018 09:38 AM]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER filed granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 234 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google Inc. in 17-1118. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [508118] [17-1118, 17-1202] [SJ] [Entered: 03/27/2018 09:29 AM]
March 13, 2018 Filing 241 RESPONSE of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to the supplemental authority [ # 240 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google Inc. in 17-1118. Service: 03/13/2018 by email. [504752] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 03/13/2018 04:32 PM]
March 9, 2018 Filing 240 Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 03/09/2018 by email. [503760] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 03/09/2018 11:22 AM]
December 7, 2017 Filing 239 Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by E. Joshua Rosenkranz for Oracle America, Inc. and Daryl Joseffer for Google Inc. Panel: Judge: O'Malley , Judge: Plager , Judge: Taranto. [481029] [JAB] [Entered: 12/07/2017 03:33 PM]
November 15, 2017 Filing 238 Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. designating E. Joshua Rosenkranz as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 10 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 5 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [475813] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/15/2017 01:52 PM]
November 15, 2017 Filing 237 Response to oral argument order from the Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. designating Daryl L. Joseffer as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 15 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [475709] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 11/15/2017 11:49 AM]
October 24, 2017 Filing 236 REPLY of Cross-Appellant Google Inc. to response filed by Appellant in 17-1118 , Doc. No [ # 235 ]. Service: 10/24/2017 by email. [470209] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 10/24/2017 04:27 PM]
October 17, 2017 Filing 235 RESPONSE of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to the motion to modify the official caption [ # 234 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google Inc. in 17-1118. Service: 10/17/2017 by email. [468648] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 10/17/2017 10:35 PM]
October 16, 2017 Filing 234 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Google Inc. to modify the official caption. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 10/16/2017 by email. [468093] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 10/16/2017 02:26 PM]
October 2, 2017 Filing 233 Amended Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 10/02/2017 by email. [464830] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 10/02/2017 03:22 PM]
September 15, 2017 Filing 232 NOTICE OF CALENDARING. Panel: 1712A. Case scheduled Dec 07, 2017 3:00 p.m. at the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20439), Courtroom 201. Response to oral argument order due: 11/15/2017. Arguing counsel is required to check-in at the Clerk's Office, 4th Floor, Room 401, between 1:30 p.m. and 2:30 p.m. on the day of argument. Please review the # Oral Argument Order. [461214] [JAB] [Entered: 09/15/2017 10:12 AM]
September 12, 2017 Filing 231 RESPONSE of Cross-Appellant Google Inc. to the supplemental authority [ # 220 ] filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc. in 17-1118. Service: 09/12/2017 by email. [460528] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 09/12/2017 05:35 PM]
September 8, 2017 Filing 230 Notice from Cross-Appellant Google Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument (None). Service: 09/08/2017 by email. [459716] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 09/08/2017 12:33 PM]
September 7, 2017 Filing 229 6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Response Brief [ # 226 ] received from Cross-Appellant Google Inc. [459489] [CW] [Entered: 09/07/2017 03:55 PM]
September 6, 2017 Filing 228 6 copies of the Supplementary Media Appendix (corresponding to joint appendix [221], [ # 222 ]) received from Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [459030] [MJL] [Entered: 09/06/2017 03:15 PM]
September 6, 2017 Filing 227 6 paper copies of the Confidential Joint Appendix in 4 Volumes [221] received from Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [459022]--[Edited 09/06/2017 by JP] [CW] [Entered: 09/06/2017 03:07 PM]
August 30, 2017 Filing 226 CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellant Google Inc. [ # 224 ]. Number of Pages: 85. Service: 08/30/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 09/08/2017. [457915] [MJL] [Entered: 08/31/2017 08:56 AM]
August 30, 2017 Filing 225 Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [135] for Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 08/30/2017 by email. [457837] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 08/30/2017 05:28 PM]
August 30, 2017 Filing 224 TENDERED from Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Title: CORRECTED RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 08/30/2017 by email. [457836] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 08/30/2017 05:25 PM]
August 29, 2017 Filing 223 Pursuant to Practice Note 34, counsel should advise the clerk of court of scheduling conflicts for the next three court weeks [NOV, DEC, JAN], or thereafter. When filing the notice of conflicts, counsel should docket the Notice Regarding Conflicts with Argument Dates event, which is found in the Calendar event category. The notice of conflict with oral argument is due on or before 09/05/2017. [457515] [MJL] [Entered: 08/29/2017 04:13 PM]
August 29, 2017 Filing 220 Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 08/29/2017 by email. [457433] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/29/2017 03:17 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 222 APPENDIX FILED for Oracle America, Inc. [ # 218 ]. Number of Pages: 1880. Service: 08/25/2017 by email. Paper copies should be provided of the confidential version only. [457474] [MJL] [Entered: 08/29/2017 03:39 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 221 CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX FILED for Oracle America, Inc. [217]. Number of Pages: 1881. Service: 08/25/2017 by email. The paper copies of the confidential version of the appendix should be received by the court on or before 09/06/2017. [457465] [MJL] [Entered: 08/29/2017 03:35 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 219 Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 08/25/2017 by email. [456905] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:18 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 218 TENDERED from Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 08/25/2017 by email. [456899] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:37 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 217 TENDERED from Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX Service: 08/25/2017 by email. [456896] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:28 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 216 Statement of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 33 for Appellant Oracle America, Inc. and Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 08/25/2017 by email. [456887] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:15 PM]
August 25, 2017 Filing 215 Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 08/25/2017 by email. [456886] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:13 PM]
August 23, 2017 Filing 214 No reply brief was filed in this case for Cross-Appellant Google Inc., and the time for filing the brief has passed. Appendix is due 08/25/2017. [455970] [MJL] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:32 AM]
August 10, 2017 Filing 213 6 paper copies of the Corrected Reply Brief [ # 212 ] received from Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [452910] [CW] [Entered: 08/10/2017 10:00 AM]
August 4, 2017 Filing 212 CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [ # 210 ]. Number of Pages: 71. Service: 08/04/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/11/2017. Cross-Appellant's reply brief is due 08/18/2017. [451573] [MJL] [Entered: 08/04/2017 01:44 PM]
August 4, 2017 Filing 211 Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [ # 208 ] for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 08/04/2017 by email. [451559] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/04/2017 01:22 PM]
August 4, 2017 Filing 210 TENDERED from Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Title: CORRECTED RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 08/04/2017 by email. [451557] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/04/2017 01:18 PM]
August 4, 2017 Filing 209 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The Response & Reply Brief for Oracle America, Inc. [ # 208 ] is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected brief due 08/18/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [451444] [MJL] [Entered: 08/04/2017 09:15 AM]
August 2, 2017 Filing 208 TENDERED from Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 08/02/2017 by email. [451035]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 209 ]. [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 08/02/2017 04:36 PM]
June 19, 2017 Filing 207 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae App Developers Alliance, Engine Advocacy and GitHub, Inc.. Service: 06/19/2017 by email. [440429] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 06/19/2017 02:57 PM]
June 19, 2017 Filing 206 Notice to counsel for Amici Curiae App Developers Alliance, Engine Advocacy and GitHub, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that the Certificate of Interest has not been filed. Please file the COI promptly. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [440232] [MJL] [Entered: 06/19/2017 10:12 AM]
June 13, 2017 Filing 205 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 204 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Ethan P. Davis has been withdrawn as counsel for Cross-Appellant. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [438597] [MJL] [Entered: 06/13/2017 08:50 AM]
June 12, 2017 Filing 204 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Google Inc. to withdraw counsel Ethan P. Davis. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438473] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 06/12/2017 03:28 PM]
June 8, 2017 Filing 203 6 paper copies of the Corrected Amicus Brief [ # 194 ] received from Amici Curiae App Developers Alliance, Engine Advocacy and GitHub, Inc. [437654] [JCP] [Entered: 06/08/2017 04:13 PM]
June 7, 2017 Filing 202 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 172 ] received from Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. [437350] [JCP] [Entered: 06/07/2017 08:42 PM]
June 5, 2017 Filing 201 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 175 ] received from Amici Curiae Harold Abelson, Tom Ball, et al. (Computer Scientists). [436382] [CMP] [Entered: 06/05/2017 02:39 PM]
June 5, 2017 Filing 200 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 174 ] received from Amici Curiae Timothy K. Armstrong, Clark D. Asay, et al. (42 Intellectual Property Law Professors). [436371] [CMP] [Entered: 06/05/2017 02:23 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 199 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Timothy K. Armstrong, Clark D. Asay, et al. (42 Intellectual Property Law Professors). Service: 06/02/2017 by email. [436037] --[Edited 07/13/2017 by clerk to consolidate docket text] [Jason Schultz] [Entered: 06/02/2017 02:25 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 198 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 171 ] received from Amicus Curiae Mozilla Corporation. [435972] [JCP] [Entered: 06/02/2017 01:15 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 197 6 paper copies of the amicus Brief [ # 170 ] received from Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. [435970] [JCP] [Entered: 06/02/2017 01:14 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 196 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 173 ] received from Amici Curiae Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.. [435937] [CMP] [Entered: 06/02/2017 12:01 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 195 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account of of Phillip R. Malone for Harold Abelson, Tom Ball, et al. (Computer Scientists). The e-mail address, (lyndaj@stanford.edu), associated with your CM/ECF account has generated a delivery failure notice. Counsel should promptly report a change in contact information with the Pacer Service Center (see Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(1). [435892] --[Edited 07/13/2017 by clerk to consolidate docket text] [PMM] [Entered: 06/02/2017 10:11 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 194 CORRECTED AMICUS BRIEF FILED for App Developers Alliance, Engine Advocacy and GitHub, Inc. [ # 193 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/09/2017. [435865] [MJL] [Entered: 06/02/2017 08:49 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 193 TENDERED from Engine Advocacy, The App Developers Alliance and Github Inc. Title: CORRECTED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435787] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 06/01/2017 05:19 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 192 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Harold Abelson, Tom Ball, et al. (Computer Scientists). Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435682] --[Edited 07/13/2017 by clerk to consolidate docket text] [Phillip Malone] [Entered: 06/01/2017 02:41 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 191 Corrected Entry of appearance for Richard M. Brunell as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435675] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 06/01/2017 02:35 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 190 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435673] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 06/01/2017 02:33 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 189 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435646] [Michael Barclay] [Entered: 06/01/2017 12:46 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 188 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Mozilla Corporation. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435643] [Marcia Hofmann] [Entered: 06/01/2017 12:32 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 187 Corrected Entry of appearance for Lisa W. Bohl as of counsel for Amici Curiae Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435626] [Lisa Bohl] [Entered: 06/01/2017 11:53 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 186 Corrected Entry of appearance for Michael G. Pattillo, Jr. as of counsel for Amici Curiae Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435618] [Rayiner Hashem] [Entered: 06/01/2017 11:40 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 185 Corrected Entry of appearance for Rayiner I. Hashem as of counsel for Amici Curiae Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435616] [Rayiner Hashem] [Entered: 06/01/2017 11:36 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 184 Corrected Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435615] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 06/01/2017 11:34 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 183 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.. Service: 06/01/2017 by email. [435614] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 06/01/2017 11:32 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 182 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file response and reply brief [ # 168 ] filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc. The brief is due 08/02/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [435538] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:37 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 181 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: Amicus Briefs [ # 155 ] (American Antitrust Institute) and [ # 165 ] (Computer Scientists) did not have the correct party designations on the captions included on the covers. CORRECTION: Please ensure future filings reflect the correct caption and party designations. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [435529] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:27 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 180 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: The contact information contained on the entries of appearance for Richard Brunell [147] and Shubha Ghosh [ # 148 ] does not match the information contained in the attorneys' user accounts. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entries of appearance and in the user accounts matches. [435523] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:20 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The entries of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken [150], Michael G. Pattillo [156], Rayiner I. Hashem [157], and Lisa W. Bohl [161] contain incomplete party names and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. Please ensure all represented parties include the entire party name on the appearance form. At the discretion of the court, the corrected documents may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [435521] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:15 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The entry of appearance for Richard Brunell [147] indicates intended participation as both principal counsel and not principal counsel and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [435519] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:11 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 177 Clerk's Note to the File: The amicus curiae are advised that the court requires Certificates of Interest (COIs) for each party entered onto the docket once the brief has been accepted for filing by the court. Please file the COIs promptly (note that this requirement must be met even if the COI was attached to the brief). Paper copies of the following briefs should be received by the court on or before 06/08/2017: [ # 170 ], [ # 171 ], [ # 172 ], [ # 173 ], [ # 174 ], [ # 175 ]). [435517] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:08 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE OF REJECTION: The Brief of Amici Curiae Engine Advocacy, The App Developers, and GitHub Inc. [ # 160 ] is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Corrected brief due 06/15/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [435514] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:56 AM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 169 Entry of appearance for Clement S. Roberts as of counsel for Engine Advocacy, The App Developers Alliance, and GitHub, Inc.. Service: 05/31/2017 by email. [435478] [Clement Roberts] [Entered: 05/31/2017 05:41 PM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 168 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to extend the time to 08/02/2017 at 11:59 pm to file the reply brief. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/31/2017 by email. [435464] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 05/31/2017 04:47 PM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 167 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 145 ] received from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. [435385] [KW] [Entered: 05/31/2017 02:30 PM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 166 6 paper copies of the Response Brief [136] received from Cross-Appellant Google Inc. [435370] [KW] [Entered: 05/31/2017 02:05 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 175 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Harold Abelson, Tom Ball, et al. (Computer Scientists) [ # 165 ]. Number of Pages: 36. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435512] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:52 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 174 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Timothy K. Armstrong, Clark D. Asay, et al. (42 Intellectual Property Law Professors) [ # 163 ]. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435509] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:42 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 173 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Microsoft Corp. and Red Hat, Inc. [ # 162 ]. Number of Pages: 25. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435502] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:33 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 172 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for American Antitrust Institute [ # 155 ]. Number of Pages: 27. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435501] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:30 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 171 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Mozilla Corporation [ # 153 ]. Number of Pages: 19. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435500] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:29 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 170 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge [ # 149 ]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435499] [MJL] [Entered: 06/01/2017 08:27 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 165 TENDERED from Computer Scientists Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435128] [Phillip Malone] [Entered: 05/30/2017 09:28 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 164 Entry of appearance for Jason M. Schultz as principal counsel for 42 Intellectual Property Law Professors. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435121] [Jason Schultz] [Entered: 05/30/2017 07:34 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 163 TENDERED from 42 Intellectual Property Law Professors Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435120] [Jason Schultz] [Entered: 05/30/2017 07:32 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 162 TENDERED from Microsoft Corp., Red Hat, Inc., and Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435104] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 05/30/2017 06:23 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 161 Entry of appearance for Lisa W. Bohl as of counsel for Microsoft Corp., RedHat, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435094] [Lisa Bohl] [Entered: 05/30/2017 05:38 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 160 TENDERED from Engine Advocacy, The App Developers Alliance, and Github, Inc. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435090]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [ # 176 ]. [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 05/30/2017 05:33 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 159 Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley as principal counsel for Engine Advocacy, The App Developers Alliance, and Github, Inc.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435089] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 05/30/2017 05:29 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 158 Entry of appearance for Joseph C. Gratz as of counsel for Engine Advocacy, The App Developers Alliance, and GitHub, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2017 by email. [435088] [Joseph Gratz] [Entered: 05/30/2017 05:25 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 157 Entry of appearance for Rayiner I. Hashem as of counsel for Microsoft Corp., RedHat, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435083] [Rayiner Hashem] [Entered: 05/30/2017 05:18 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 156 Entry of appearance for Michael G. Pattillo as of counsel for Microsoft Corp., RedHat, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435080] [Michael Pattillo] [Entered: 05/30/2017 05:15 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 155 TENDERED from American Antitrust Institute Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435068] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 05/30/2017 04:55 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 154 Entry of appearance for Jeffrey T. Pearlman as of counsel for Computer Scientists. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435062] [Jeffrey Pearlman] [Entered: 05/30/2017 04:42 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 153 TENDERED from Mozilla Corporation (Amicus Curiae urging affirmance of the Judgment) Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435041] [Marcia Hofmann] [Entered: 05/30/2017 04:27 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 152 Entry of appearance for Phillip R. Malone as principal counsel for Computer Scientists. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435036] [Phillip Malone] [Entered: 05/30/2017 04:22 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 151 Entry of appearance for Marcia Hofmann as principal counsel for Mozilla Corporation (Amicus Curiae urging affirmance of the Judgment). Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [435008] [Marcia Hofmann] [Entered: 05/30/2017 04:01 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 150 Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken as principal counsel for Microsoft Corp., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Red Hat, Inc.. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [434978] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 05/30/2017 03:21 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 149 TENDERED from Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [434914] [Michael Barclay] [Entered: 05/30/2017 01:41 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 148 Entry of appearance for Shubha Ghosh as of counsel for Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [434901] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 05/30/2017 01:06 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 147 Entry of appearance for Richard Brunell as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [434899] [Richard Brunell] [Entered: 05/30/2017 01:04 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 146 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 05/30/2017 by email. [434823] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 05/30/2017 11:16 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 144 Corrected Entry of appearance for Matthew Schruers as of counsel for Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434793] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 05/30/2017 10:36 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 143 Corrected Entry of appearance for Jonathan Band as principal counsel for Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434789] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 05/30/2017 10:34 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The entries of appearance for Jonathan Band [139] and Matthew Schruers [140] are without proper/complete proof of service and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected documents may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [434715] [MJL] [Entered: 05/30/2017 08:26 AM]
May 26, 2017 Filing 145 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Computer & Communications Industry Association [ # 141 ]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/06/2017. [434809] [MJL] [Entered: 05/30/2017 10:56 AM]
May 26, 2017 Filing 141 TENDERED from Computer and Communications Industry Association Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434648] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 05/26/2017 04:33 PM]
May 26, 2017 Filing 140 Entry of appearance for Matthew Schruers as of counsel for Computer and Communications Industry Association (amicus curiae). Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434633] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 05/26/2017 04:16 PM]
May 26, 2017 Filing 139 Entry of appearance for Jonathan Band as principal counsel for Computer and Communications Industry Association (amicus curiae). Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434631] [Jonathan Band] [Entered: 05/26/2017 04:14 PM]
May 26, 2017 Filing 138 Entry of appearance for Mitchell L. Stoltz as of counsel for Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434567] [Mitchell Stoltz] [Entered: 05/26/2017 02:53 PM]
May 26, 2017 Filing 137 Entry of appearance for Michael Barclay as principal counsel for Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Service: 05/26/2017 by email. [434533] [Michael Barclay] [Entered: 05/26/2017 02:11 PM]
May 22, 2017 Filing 136 BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellant Google Inc. [135]. Number of Pages: 85. Service: 05/22/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 05/31/2017. Appellant's response and reply brief is due 07/03/2017. [433454]. This brief has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 226 ]. [MJL] [Entered: 05/23/2017 10:41 AM]
May 22, 2017 Filing 135 TENDERED from Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 05/22/2017 by email. [433350]. This brief has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 226 ]. [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 05/22/2017 11:40 PM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 134 Entry of appearance for Renny F. Hwang as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service: 05/18/2017 by email. [432669] [Renny Hwang] [Entered: 05/18/2017 09:11 PM]
March 9, 2017 Filing 133 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account of Mr. Aaron Y. Huang for Eugene H. Spafford, Zhi Ding, Adam Porter and Ken Castleman. The e-mail address, (libia.busalacchi@weil.com), associated with your CM/ECF account has generated a delivery failure notice. Counsel should promptly report a change in contact information with the Pacer Service Center (see Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(1). [413806] [PMM] [Entered: 03/09/2017 10:52 AM]
March 8, 2017 Filing 132 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file cross-appellant's principal and response brief [ # 131 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. The brief is due 05/22/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [413584] [MJL] [Entered: 03/08/2017 04:16 PM]
March 8, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Google Inc. to extend the time to 05/22/2017 at 11:59 pm to file the appellee/respondent/cross-appellant's principal brief. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/08/2017 by email. [413565] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 03/08/2017 04:07 PM]
March 3, 2017 Filing 130 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Competitive Carriers Association. Service: 03/03/2017 by email. [412537] [Rebecca Murphy Thompson] [Entered: 03/03/2017 05:28 PM]
March 2, 2017 Filing 128 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 92 ] received from Amici Curiae Sandra Aistars, Matthew Barblan, et al. [412227] [KW] [Entered: 03/03/2017 09:31 AM]
March 1, 2017 Filing 129 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 84 ] received from Amicus Curiae Copyright Alliance. [412254] [KW] [Entered: 03/03/2017 10:06 AM]
March 1, 2017 Filing 127 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 89 ] received from Amici Curiae IFTA, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. and SAG-AFTRA. [411654] [KW] [Entered: 03/01/2017 01:16 PM]
March 1, 2017 Filing 126 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 87 ] received from Amici Curiae Scott McNealy and Brian Sutphin. [411649] [KW] [Entered: 03/01/2017 01:01 PM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 125 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 91 ] received from Amicus Curiae Competitive Carriers Association. [411517] [KW] [Entered: 03/01/2017 09:24 AM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 124 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 88 ] received from Amicus Curiae Ralph Oman. [411511] [KW] [Entered: 03/01/2017 09:16 AM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 123 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 94 ] received from Amicus Curiae BSA I The Software Alliance. [411294] [KW] [Entered: 02/28/2017 02:32 PM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 122 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 86 ] received from Amici Curiae Ken Castleman, Zhi Ding, Adam Porter and Eugene H. Spafford. [411291] [KW] [Entered: 02/28/2017 02:31 PM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 121 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 93 ] received from Amici Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, National Press Photographers Association, North American Nature Photography Association, DMLA and Professional Photographers of America. [411274] [KW] [Entered: 02/28/2017 02:16 PM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 119 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 85 ] received from Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. [411253] [KW] [Entered: 02/28/2017 01:49 PM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 120 6 paper copies of the Amicus Brief [ # 90 ] received from Amici Curiae Association of American Publishers and Recording Industry Association of America. [411265] [KW] [Entered: 02/28/2017 02:06 PM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 118 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Sandra Aistars, Matthew Barblan, Jon A. Baumgarten, Stephen Carlisle, Jon M. Garon, Hugh Hansen, Devlin Hartline, Jiarui Liu, Adam Mossoff, Raymond T. Nimmer, Sean M. O'Connor, Eric Priest and Mark F. Schultz. Service: 02/27/2017 by email. [410854] [Antigone Peyton] [Entered: 02/27/2017 02:24 PM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 117 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, National Press Photographers Association, North American Nature Photography Association and DMLA. Service: 02/27/2017 by email. [410755] [Lindsay Bowen] [Entered: 02/27/2017 11:39 AM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 116 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Scott McNealy and Brian Sutphin. Service: 02/27/2017 by email. [410753] [Steven Cottreau] [Entered: 02/27/2017 11:37 AM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The certificate of interest [111] filed by Amicus Curiae Sandra Aistars in 17-1118 is incomplete and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. The certificate of interest must contain the information required by Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 and must be signed. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. Please ensure the corrected certificate contains all the required information. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [410745] [MJL] [Entered: 02/27/2017 11:18 AM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 114 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae SAG-AFTRA. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410631] [Duncan Crabtree-Ireland] [Entered: 02/24/2017 11:42 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 113 Corrected Entry of appearance for Duncan W. Crabtree-Ireland as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae SAG-AFTRA. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410630] [Duncan Crabtree-Ireland] [Entered: 02/24/2017 11:39 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 112 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Ralph Oman. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410626] [Marc Lewis] [Entered: 02/24/2017 09:29 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 111 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Sandra Aistars. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410625] [Antigone Peyton] [Entered: 02/24/2017 09:14 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 110 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae IFTA and Motion Picture Association of America, Inc.. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410624] [Robert Rotstein] [Entered: 02/24/2017 08:50 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 109 Corrected Entry of appearance for J. Matthew Williams as of counsel for Amici Curiae IFTA and Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. , Independent Film & Televsion Alliance (IFTA). Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410616] [J. Williams] [Entered: 02/24/2017 07:52 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 108 Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert H. Rotstein as principal counsel for Amici Curiae IFTA and Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. , Independent Film & Television Alliance (IFTA). Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410615] [Robert Rotstein] [Entered: 02/24/2017 07:39 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 107 Corrected Entry of appearance for Rebecca Murphy Thompson as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Competitive Carriers Association. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410606] [Rebecca Murphy Thompson] [Entered: 02/24/2017 06:31 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 106 Entry of appearance for Erica L. Ross as of counsel for Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410604] [Erica Ross] [Entered: 02/24/2017 06:15 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 105 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410603] [Kenneth Doroshow] [Entered: 02/24/2017 06:11 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 104 Entry of appearance for Kenneth L. Doroshow as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410602] [Kenneth Doroshow] [Entered: 02/24/2017 06:08 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 103 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Ken Castleman, Zhi Ding, Adam Porter and Eugene H. Spafford. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410599] [Jared Bobrow] [Entered: 02/24/2017 05:52 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 102 Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410595] [Daniel Brooks] [Entered: 02/24/2017 05:11 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 101 Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Association of American Publishers and Recording Industry Association of America. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410590] [William Jay] [Entered: 02/24/2017 04:55 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 100 Clerk's Note to the File: The amicus curiae are advised that the court requires Certificates of Interest (COIs) for each party entered onto the docket. Please file the COIs promptly (note that this requirement must be met even if the COI was attached to the brief). [410583] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 04:33 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 99 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: George M. Borkowski (entry of appearance [ # 83 ]) is not a registered filer with CM/ECF for the Federal Circuit. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FCR 25(a)(2), attorneys who appear before this court must be registered for the court's CM/ECF system. Please register promptly. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [410579] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 04:29 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 98 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: The contact information included on the entry of appearance for Annemarie Hassett [ # 54 ] does not match the information contained in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [410576] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 04:27 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The entries of appearance for Robert H. Rotstein [46], Duncan W. Crabtree-Ireland, [47], J. Matthew Williams [48], Kenneth L. Doroshow [51], Erica L. Ross [52], and Rebecca Murphy Thompson [70] are without proper/complete proof of service and therefore cannot be accepted for filing at this time. You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected documents may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [410573] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 04:25 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 96 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: Amicus Briefs [ # 69 ] (MPAA, IFTA, SAG-AFTRA) and [ # 71 ] (RIAA, AAP) did not have the correct party designations on the captions included on the covers. CORRECTION: Please ensure future filings reflect the correct caption and party designations. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [410563] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 04:04 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 95 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: Amicus Briefs [ # 59 ] (Spafford, Ding, Porter, Castleman) and [ # 74 ] (Intellectual Property Scholars) did not have the complete case number on the cover (the cross-appeal number was not included). CORRECTION: Please ensure future filings reflect the complete case number. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [410560] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:58 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 83 Entry of appearance for George M. Borkowski as of counsel for Recording Industry Association of America. Service: 02/24/2017 by email. [410400] [William Jay] [Entered: 02/24/2017 11:39 AM]
February 22, 2017 Filing 82 Entry of appearance for Scott J. Sholder as of counsel for PACA, DMLA; Graphic Artists Guild; National Press Photographers Association; North American Nature Photography Association; American Society of Media Photographers, Inc.; American Photographic Artists; Professional Photographers of America. Service: 02/22/2017 by email. [409813] [Scott Sholder] [Entered: 02/22/2017 06:11 PM]
February 22, 2017 Filing 81 Entry of appearance for Lindsay W. Bowen as principal counsel for PACA, DMLA; Graphic Artists Guild; National Press Photographers Assoc; North American Nature Photography Assoc; American Society of Media Photogs, Inc; American Photographic Artists; Professional Photographers of America. Service: 02/22/2017 by email. [409812] [Lindsay Bowen] [Entered: 02/22/2017 06:07 PM]
February 22, 2017 Filing 80 Amended Entry of appearance for Antigone Peyton as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Scholars (see list of names attached to the Entry of Appearance form). Service: 02/22/2017 by email. [409810] [Antigone Peyton] [Entered: 02/22/2017 06:00 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 94 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for BSA I The Software Alliance [ # 79 ]. Number of Pages: 19. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410554] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:51 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 93 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, National Press Photographers Association, North American Nature Photography Association, DMLA and Professional Photographers of America [ # 77 ]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410552] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:48 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 92 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Sandra Aistars, Matthew Barblan, et al. (Intellectual Property Scholars) [ # 74 ]. Number of Pages: 20. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410549] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:44 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 91 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Competitive Carriers Association [ # 72 ]. Number of Pages: 22. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410545] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:41 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 90 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Association of American Publishers and Recording Industry Association of America [ # 71 ]. Number of Pages: 31. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410543] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:39 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 89 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for IFTA, MPAA. and SAG-AFTRA [ # 69 ]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410542] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:37 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 88 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Ralph Oman [ # 68 ]. Number of Pages: 23. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410540] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:35 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 87 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Scott McNealy and Brian Sutphin [ # 60 ]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410538] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:33 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 86 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for Ken Castleman, Zhi Ding, Adam Porter and Eugene H. Spafford [ # 59 ]. Number of Pages: 27. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410532] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:30 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 85 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for NYIPLA [ # 57 ]. Number of Pages: 20. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410529] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:27 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 84 AMICUS BRIEF FILED for The Copyright Alliance [ # 55 ]. Number of Pages: 27. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/03/2017. [410526] [MJL] [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:24 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 79 TENDERED from BSA - The Software Alliance (amicus curiae) Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408855] [Richard Rainey] [Entered: 02/17/2017 06:24 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 78 Certificate of Interest for BSA - The Software Alliance (amicus). Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408854]--[Edited 02/21/2017 by clerk to correct party filer] [Richard Rainey] [Entered: 02/17/2017 06:20 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 77 TENDERED from PACA DIGITAL MEDIA LICENSING ASSOCIATION, INC., GRAPHIC ARTISTS GUILD, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, NORTH AMERICAN NATURE PHOTOGRAPHY ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MEDIA PHOTOGRAPHERS, INC., AMERICAN PHOTOGRAPHIC ARTISTS, AND PROFESSIONAL Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408849] [Lindsay Bowen] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:54 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 76 Entry of appearance for Peter A. Swanson as of counsel for BSA | The Software Alliance (amicus curiae). Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408848] [Peter Swanson] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:53 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 75 Entry of appearance for Richard L. Rainey as principal counsel for BSA | The Software Alliance (amicus curiae). Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408847] [Richard Rainey] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:48 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 74 TENDERED from Intellectual Property Scholars Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408846] [Antigone Peyton] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:47 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 73 Entry of appearance for Antigone G. Peyton as principal counsel for Intellectual Property Scholars. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408845] [Antigone Peyton] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:43 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 72 TENDERED from Competitive Carriers Association Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408842] [Rebecca Murphy Thompson] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:26 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 71 TENDERED from Recording Industry Association of America and Association of American Publishers Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408841] [William Jay] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:25 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 70 Entry of appearance for Rebecca Murphy Thompson as principal counsel for Competitive Carriers Association. Service: 02/17/2016 by email. [408839] [Rebecca Murphy Thompson] [Entered: 02/17/2017 05:10 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 69 TENDERED from Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (MPAA), Independent Film & Television Alliance (IFTA), and Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists (SAG-AFTRA) Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by clerk. [408831] [Robert Rotstein] [Entered: 02/17/2017 04:46 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 68 TENDERED from Ralph Oman Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408781] [Marc Lewis] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:56 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 67 Entry of appearance for Evangeline A.Z. Burbidge as of counsel for Ralph Oman. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408776] [Evangeline Burbidge] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:52 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 66 Entry of appearance for Marc R. Lewis as principal counsel for Ralph Oman. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408773] [Marc Lewis] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:47 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 65 Entry of appearance for Andrew Kim as of counsel for Recording Industry Association of America and Association of American Publishers. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408767] [Andrew Kim] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:42 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 64 Entry of appearance for William M. Jay as principal counsel for Recording Industry Association of America and Association of American Publishers. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408755] [William Jay] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:35 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 63 Entry of appearance for Amanda Branch as of counsel for Eugene H. Spafford, Ph.D., Zhi Ding, Ph.D., Adam Porter, Ph.D., and Ken Castleman, Ph.D.. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408707] [Jared Bobrow] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:01 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 62 Entry of appearance for Aaron Y. Huang as of counsel for Eugene H. Spafford, Ph.D., Zhi Ding, Ph.D., Adam Porter, Ph.D., and Ken Castleman, Ph.D.. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408705] [Jared Bobrow] [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:00 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 61 Entry of appearance for Jared Bobrow as principal counsel for Eugene H. Spafford, Ph.D., Zhi Ding, Ph.D., Adam Porter, Ph.D., and Ken Castleman, Ph.D.. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408701] [Jared Bobrow] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:58 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 60 TENDERED from Scott McNealy and Brian Sutphin Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408685] [Steven Cottreau] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:52 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 59 TENDERED from Eugene H. Spafford, Ph.D., Zhi Ding, Ph.D., Adam Porter, Ph.D., and Ken Castleman, Ph.D. Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408673] [Jared Bobrow] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:45 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 58 Entry of appearance for Steven T. Cottreau as principal counsel for Scott McNealy and Brian Sutphin. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408671] [Steven Cottreau] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:39 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 57 TENDERED from New York Intellectual Property Law Association Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408668] [Daniel Brooks] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:31 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 56 Entry of appearance for Charles R. Macedo as of counsel for New York Intellectual Property Law Association. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408667] [Daniel Brooks] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:30 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 55 TENDERED from The Copyright Alliance Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408665] [Kenneth Doroshow] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:30 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 54 Entry of appearance for Annemarie Hassett as of counsel for New York Intellectual Property Law Association. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408664] [Daniel Brooks] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:29 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 53 Entry of appearance for Daniel J. Brooks as principal counsel for New York Intellectual Property Law Association. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408663] [Daniel Brooks] [Entered: 02/17/2017 02:29 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 52 Entry of appearance for Erica L. Ross as of counsel for The Copyright Alliance. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408650] [Erica Ross] [Entered: 02/17/2017 01:59 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 51 Entry of appearance for Kenneth L. Doroshow as principal counsel for The Copyright Alliance. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408648] [Kenneth Doroshow] [Entered: 02/17/2017 01:52 PM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 50 Entry of appearance for Scott J. Sholder as of counsel for PACA, Digital Media Licensing ASsociation, Inc.. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408587] [Scott Sholder] [Entered: 02/17/2017 11:21 AM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 49 Entry of appearance for Lindsay W. Bowen as principal counsel for PACA, Digital Media Licensing Association, Inc.. Service: 02/17/2017 by email. [408581] [Lindsay Bowen] [Entered: 02/17/2017 11:13 AM]
February 16, 2017 Filing 48 Entry of appearance for J. Matthew Williams as of counsel for Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., and Independent Film & Television Alliance. Service: 02/16/2017 by clerk. [408454] [J. Williams] [Entered: 02/16/2017 09:45 PM]
February 16, 2017 Filing 47 Entry of appearance for Duncan W. Crabtree-Ireland as principal counsel for Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. Service: 02/16/2017 by email. [408453] [Duncan Crabtree-Ireland] [Entered: 02/16/2017 09:40 PM]
February 16, 2017 Filing 46 Entry of appearance for Robert H. Rotstein as principal counsel for Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., and Independent Film & Television Alliance. Service: 02/16/2017 by clerk. [408451] [Robert Rotstein] [Entered: 02/16/2017 09:25 PM]
February 16, 2017 Filing 45 6 paper copies of the Confidential Opening Brief [43] received from Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [408312] [KW] [Entered: 02/16/2017 03:57 PM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 44 BRIEF FILED for Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [ # 41 ]. Number of Pages: 78. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. Cross-Appellant Google Inc.'s brief is due 03/22/2017. Paper copies should be provided of the confidential version only. [407267] [MJL] [Entered: 02/14/2017 12:15 PM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 43 CONFIDENTIAL BRIEF FILED for Appellant Oracle America, Inc. [42]. Number of Pages: 78. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. The paper copies of the confidential version of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/22/2017. [407264] [MJL] [Entered: 02/14/2017 12:10 PM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 42 TENDERED from Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL OPENING BRIEF Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406654] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 02/10/2017 04:29 PM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 41 TENDERED from Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406651] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 02/10/2017 04:22 PM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 40 Amended Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406415] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 02/10/2017 11:16 AM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 39 Entry of appearance for Lisa T. Simpson as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406408] [Lisa Simpson] [Entered: 02/10/2017 11:11 AM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 38 Entry of appearance for Deborah K. Miller as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406403] [Deborah Miller] [Entered: 02/10/2017 11:06 AM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 37 Entry of appearance for Ruchika Agrawal as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406398] [Ruchika Agrawal] [Entered: 02/10/2017 10:59 AM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 36 Entry of appearance for Matthew L. Bush as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406391] [Matthew Bush] [Entered: 02/10/2017 10:54 AM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 35 Entry of appearance for Matthew Sarboraria as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406382] [Matthew Sarboraria] [Entered: 02/10/2017 10:49 AM]
February 10, 2017 Filing 34 Entry of appearance for Dorian Daley as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 02/10/2017 by email. [406372] [Dorian Daley] [Entered: 02/10/2017 10:41 AM]
December 22, 2016 Filing 33 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney Adam M. Conrad [ # 32 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Google Inc.. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [393451] [MJL] [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:04 AM]
December 22, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Google Inc. to withdraw counsel Adam M. Conrad. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 12/22/2016 by email. [393421] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 12/22/2016 09:30 AM]
November 30, 2016 Filing 31 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file the appellant's opening brief [ # 30 ] filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. The brief is due 02/10/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [387011] [MJL] [Entered: 11/30/2016 08:46 AM]
November 29, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to extend the time to 02/10/2017 to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/29/2016 by email. [386987] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/29/2016 08:13 PM]
November 28, 2016 Filing 29 Entry of appearance for Annette Hurst as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/28/2016 by email. [386415] [Annette Hurst] [Entered: 11/28/2016 04:40 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 28 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/14/2016 by email. [382485] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/14/2016 12:17 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 27 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Notice regarding the ECF account of Mr. Joshua L. Simmons for Oracle America, Inc.. The e-mail address, (justin.morris@kirkland.com), associated with your CM/ECF account has generated a delivery failure notice. Counsel should promptly report a change in contact information with the Pacer Service Center (see Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(1). [382402] [PMM] [Entered: 11/14/2016 10:56 AM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 26 Official caption revised to reflect cross-appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [382362] [MJL] [Entered: 11/14/2016 10:13 AM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 25 Note to file: The following cases are consolidated: 17-1118 (Lead) with 17-1202 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [382361] [17-1118, 17-1202] [MJL] [Entered: 11/14/2016 10:12 AM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 24 Entry of appearance for Michael Kwun as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382225] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 11/11/2016 03:00 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 23 Entry of appearance for Reid P. Mullen as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382224] [Reid Mullen] [Entered: 11/11/2016 02:56 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 22 Entry of appearance for Steven A. Hirsch as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382223] [Steven Hirsch] [Entered: 11/11/2016 02:51 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 21 Entry of appearance for Christa M. Anderson as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382222] [Christa Anderson] [Entered: 11/11/2016 02:44 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 20 Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert A. Van Nest as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382221] [Robert Van Nest] [Entered: 11/11/2016 02:41 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 19 Entry of appearance for Robert A. Van Nest as principal counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382219] [Robert Van Nest] [Entered: 11/11/2016 02:32 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 18 Entry of appearance for Joshua L. Simmons as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382205] [Joshua Simmons] [Entered: 11/11/2016 12:30 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Dale M. Cendali as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/11/2016 by email. [382204] [Dale Cendali] [Entered: 11/11/2016 12:25 PM]
November 10, 2016 Filing 16 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: The contact information on the entry of appearance for Ethan P. Davis [ # 13 ] does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. [381836] [MJL] [Entered: 11/10/2016 08:45 AM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 15 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381701] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:59 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 14 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381700] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:58 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Ethan P. Davis as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381698] [Ethan Davis] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:52 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Adam M. Conrad as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381697] [Adam Conrad] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:48 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Bruce W. Baber as of counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381695] [Bruce Baber] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:44 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Daryl L. Joseffer as principal counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381694] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:43 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Peter Bicks as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381670] [Peter Bicks] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:17 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Andrew D. Silverman as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381669] [Andrew Silverman] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:14 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Jeremy Peterman as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381663] [Jeremy Peterman] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:12 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Melanie L. Bostwick as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381660] [Melanie Bostwick] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:10 PM]
November 7, 2016 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Kelsi B. Corkran as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/07/2016 by email. [380747] [Kelsi Corkran] [Entered: 11/07/2016 11:00 AM]
November 4, 2016 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/04/2016 by email. [380568] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:31 PM]
November 4, 2016 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/04/2016 by email. [380566] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:28 PM]
November 4, 2016 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for E. Joshua Rosenkranz as principal counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/04/2016 by email. [380564] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:26 PM]
October 28, 2016 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/27/2016. [378284] Entry of Appearance due 11/14/2016. Certificate of Interest due 11/14/2016. Docketing Statement due 11/14/2016. Appellant's brief due 12/27/2016. [MJL] [Entered: 10/28/2016 10:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Oracle America, Inc. v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEVE WOZNIAK
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PHOTOGRAPHIC ARTISTS
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSEPH SCOTT MILLER
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSHUA DAVID SARNOFF
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ZHI DING
Represented By: Jared Bobrow Esq.
Represented By: Aaron Y. Huang
Represented By: Amanda Branch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROGER ALLAN FORD
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVE SNIGIER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YVETTE JOY LIEBESMAN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BEN DEPOORTER
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JESSICA SILBEY, Esq.
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN HENNESSY
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARY SHAW
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RONALD L. RIVEST
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUIDO VAN ROSSUM
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEN CASTLEMAN
Represented By: Jared Bobrow Esq.
Represented By: Aaron Y. Huang
Represented By: Amanda Branch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BJARNE STROUSTRUP
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JON A. BAUMGARTEN
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIGUEL DE ICAZA
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOUG LEA
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEA SHAVER
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KIN LANE
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FREDERICK BROOKS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICK CATTELL
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAUL MENCHINI
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOB LEE
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAN VITEK
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEFFREY ULLMAN
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SEAN M. O'CONNOR
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM JENNINGS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL W. CARROLL
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GILAD BRACHA
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSHUA BLOCH
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHILIP WADLER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PACA, DIGITAL MEDIA LICENSING ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEN THOMPSON
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID PATTERSON
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTIN ODERSKY
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDRIES VAN DAM
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW BISHOP
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAWSON ENGLER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BSA I THE SOFTWARE ALLIANCE
Represented By: Peter Andrew Swanson
Represented By: Richard L. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAYMOND T. NIMMER
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCREEN ACTORS GUILD - AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS
Represented By: Duncan W. Crabtree-Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID L. DILL
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Charles R. Macedo
Represented By: Annemarie Hassett
Represented By: Daniel J. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALAN KAY
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEPHEN CARLISLE
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REBECCA TUSHNET
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN BEHLENDORF
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN J. LOVE
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RALPH OMAN
Represented By: Evangeline Zimmerman Burbidge
Represented By: Marc Robert Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE APP DEVELOPERS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Joseph Gratz
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Represented By: Clement Roberts Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALEX PAYNE
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JENNIFER M. URBAN, Esq.
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ERIC BREWER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jonathan Band Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHYAMKRISHNA BALGANESH
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TYLER T. OCHOA
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VICTORIA F. PHILLIPS
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOZILLA CORPORATION
Represented By: Marcia Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY
Represented By: Lisa Wang Bohl
Represented By: Michael Gregory Pattillo Jr.
Represented By: Rayiner Hashem
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM BALL
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHERINE J. STRANDBURG
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANNEMARIE BRIDY
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES GRIMMELMANN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAMELA SAMUELSON
Represented By: Catherine Crump
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCOTT MCNEALY
Represented By: Steven Thomas Cottreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEAL GAFTER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARTI K. RAI
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE
Represented By: Mitchell L. Stoltz Esq.
Represented By: Meredith Filak Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEVIN COLLINS
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL TIEMANN
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK F. SCHULTZ
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADAM MOSSOFF
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEROME H. REICHMAN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL J. MADISON
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BARBARA SIMONS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HAROLD ABELSON
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTIN FOWLER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Mitchell L. Stoltz Esq.
Represented By: Michael Barclay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JIARUI LIU
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HUGH HANSEN
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAM COOK
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OREN BRACHA
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHENG LIANG
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE
Represented By: Richard M. Brunell
Represented By: Shubha Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RED HAT, INC.
Represented By: Lisa Wang Bohl
Represented By: Michael Gregory Pattillo Jr.
Represented By: Rayiner Hashem
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEVLIN HARTLINE
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: L. PETER DEUTSCH
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JESSICA LITMAN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GERALD JAY SUSSMAN
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LESTER EARNEST
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK DAVIS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: R STREET INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIM PATERSON
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SANDRA AISTARS
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW BARBLAN
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN SUTPHIN
Represented By: Steven Thomas Cottreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIMOTHY K. ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PROFESSIONAL PHOTOGRAPHERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRANK YELLIN
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ERIC PRIEST
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER NORVIG
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RECORDING INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: William M. Jay
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Represented By: George M. Borkowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL RUSTAD
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANN BARTOW
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK P. MCKENNA
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRENDAN EICH
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER J. WEINBERGER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EUGENE H. SPAFFORD
Represented By: Jared Bobrow Esq.
Represented By: Aaron Y. Huang
Represented By: Amanda Branch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CLARK D. ASAY
Represented By: Catherine Crump
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ED LAZOWSKA
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MEDIA PHOTOGRAPHERS, INC.
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES H. WALDO
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW CHIN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JULIE E. COHEN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS
Represented By: William M. Jay
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Represented By: J. Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTH AMERICAN NATURE PHOTOGRAPHY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT SEDGEWICK
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VINTON G. CERF
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADAM PORTER
Represented By: Jared Bobrow Esq.
Represented By: Aaron Y. Huang
Represented By: Amanda Branch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JIM GIBSON
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CURTIS SCHROEDER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GITHUB, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Gratz
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Represented By: Clement Roberts Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW TANENBAUM
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIM PEIERLS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN KERNIGHAN
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GRAPHIC ARTISTS GUILD
Represented By: Scott J. Sholder
Represented By: Lindsay Warren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW W. MOORE
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEFFREY DEAN
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES H. MORRIS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRAD TEMPLETON
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL A. CARRIER
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DANIEL S. WALLACH
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WHITFIELD DIFFIE
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BARBARA LISKOV
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID KLAUSNER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ENGINE ADVOCACY
Represented By: Joseph Gratz
Represented By: Mark A. Lemley
Represented By: Clement Roberts Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARON PERZANOWSKI
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN VILLASENOR
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAN BONEH
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAY KURZWEIL
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTOPHER JON SPRIGMAN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAN L. BURK
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW SAG
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN L. FRYE
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE COPYRIGHT ALLIANCE
Represented By: Kenneth L. Doroshow
Represented By: Erica Lauren Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER JASZI
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALFRED Z. SPECTOR
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMPETITIVE CARRIERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Rebecca Murphy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW TRIDGELL
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INDEPENDENT FILM & TELEVISION ALLIANCE
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Represented By: J. Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT HARPER
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IVAN E. SUTHERLAND
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REBECCA CURTIN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINUS TORVALDS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JON BENTLEY
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEIRDRE K. MULLIGAN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICROSOFT CORP.
Represented By: Lisa Wang Bohl
Represented By: Michael Gregory Pattillo Jr.
Represented By: Rayiner Hashem
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SIMON PHIPPS
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GORDON BELL
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ERIC GOLDMAN
Represented By: Jason Michael Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JON M. GARON
Represented By: Antigone Gabriella Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BILL PUGH
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / cross appellant: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Hirsch Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest Esq.
Represented By: Anne M. Voigts
Represented By: Bruce William Baber
Represented By: Michael Soonuk Kwun Esq.
Represented By: Daryl Joseffer
Represented By: Renny F. Hwang
Represented By: Christa M. Anderson
Represented By: Reid P. Mullen Esq.
Represented By: Marisa Maleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / cross appellant: GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Sarboraria Esq.
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Represented By: Andrew D. Silverman
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley Esq.
Represented By: Annette Louise Hurst Esq.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Melanie L. Bostwick
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Peter A. Bicks
Represented By: Kelsi Brown Corkran
Represented By: E. Joshua Rosenkranz
Represented By: Jeremy Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?