Backoff, LLC v. Samoco Oil Tools, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant: BACKOFF, LLC and NUTEC, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: SAMOCO OIL TOOLS, INC.
Case Number: 19-1355
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER filed. The motion [ # 18 ] is granted. Mr. Keaty is withdrawn as counsel. Within 30 days from the date of filing of this order, Backoff and NuTec are directed to have counsel file an entry of appearance on their behalf. Failure to do so will result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. The briefing schedule is stayed. Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk. [587075] [LS] [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:26 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to withdraw attorney Docket No. [ # 18 ], ERROR: Appellants' motion does not contain the official caption or short caption for this appeal, a certificate of interest, and a certificate of compliance. CORRECTION: The official caption and short caption for this appeal can be found on the docket report. Pursuant to FCR 27(a)(7), motion must include a certifcate of interest. Pursuant to FRAP 32(g)(1), motions must contain a certificate of compliance with the word count. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [586302] [MMA] [Entered: 02/15/2019 11:14 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION of Thomas S. Keaty to withdraw counsel Thomas S. Keaty [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 02/08/2019 by email. [584594] [19-1355] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:47 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581087] [19-1355] [Brad Harrigan] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:59 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc., Corrected Certificate of Interest [ # 15 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[581070] [MMA] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:39 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581046] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 16 ] [Brad Harrigan] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:18 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Kenneth L. Tolar as of counsel for Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581045] [19-1355] [Brad Harrigan] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:17 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Corrected Entry of appearance for Brad E. Harrigan as principal counsel for Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581040] [19-1355] [Brad Harrigan] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:16 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580969] [19-1355] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:39 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580965] [19-1355] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:36 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corrected Entry of appearance for Thomas S. Keaty as principal counsel for Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580964] [19-1355] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:34 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc., Entry of Appearance - B. Harrigan; Entry of Appearance - K. Tolar; Certificate of Interest [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 01/25/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[579012] [MMA] [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:57 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc., Entry of Appearance - T. Keaty; Certificate of Interest; Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached).Compliant documents due on 01/25/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[578997] [MMA] [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:43 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc. Service: 01/16/2019 by email. [578747] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 9 ] [Kenneth Tolar] [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:13 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Kenneth L. Tolar as of counsel for Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc. Service: 01/16/2019 by email. [578745] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 9 ] [Kenneth Tolar] [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:11 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Brad E. Harrigan as principal counsel for Appellee Samoco Oil Tools, Inc. Service: 01/16/2019 by email. [578744] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 9 ] [Kenneth Tolar] [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:10 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc. Service: 01/16/2019 by clerk, email. [578647] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 8 ] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:16 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc. Service: 01/16/2019 by clerk, email. [578646] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 8 ] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:14 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Thomas S. Keaty as principal counsel for Appellants Backoff, LLC and NuTec, Inc. Service: 01/16/2019 by clerk, email. [578642] [19-1355]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 8 ] [Thomas Keaty] [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:13 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/28/2018. [575155] Entry of Appearance due 01/16/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/16/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/16/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/04/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 01/02/2019 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backoff, LLC v. Samoco Oil Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BACKOFF, LLC
Represented By: Thomas S. Keaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NUTEC, INC.
Represented By: Thomas S. Keaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMOCO OIL TOOLS, INC.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Tolar I
Represented By: Brad E. Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?