Austin v. HHS
Respondent / Appellee: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Petitioner / Appellant: HOLLY AUSTIN, parent of K.A., a minor
Case Number: 19-1379
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 12 ] filed by Appellant Holly Austin. Appellant's opening brief is due 04/22/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [589599] [JAL] [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:12 AM]
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION of Appellant Holly Austin to extend the time to 04/22/2019 to file the Opening Brief by petitioner-appellant. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/28/2019 by email, US mail. [589430] [19-1379] [Robert Krakow] [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:05 PM]
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Holly Austin, Motion [ # 10 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant motion due 03/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [589316] [MJL] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:08 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION of Appellant Holly Austin to extend the time to 04/22/2019 to file the Petitioner-appellant's opening brief, which deadline is now March 8, 2019, the date to be extended. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/26/2019 by email, US mail. [588559] [19-1379]. This motion is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 11 ]. [Robert Krakow] [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:10 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Holly Austin. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585444] [19-1379] [Robert Krakow] [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:13 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Holly Austin, Docketing Statement [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[584042] [JAL] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:28 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Holly Austin. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583867] [19-1379] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Robert Krakow] [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:57 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement for the Appellee HHS. Service: 01/22/2019 by email. [579727] [19-1379] [Robert Coleman] [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:44 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Mollie D. Gorney as principal counsel for Appellee HHS. Service: 01/22/2019 by email. [579724] [19-1379] [Robert Coleman] [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:41 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Holly Austin. Service: 01/21/2019 by email, clerk, US mail. [579500] [19-1379] [Robert Krakow] [Entered: 01/21/2019 04:06 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Robert J. Krakow as principal counsel for Appellant Holly Austin. Service: 01/21/2019 by email, clerk, US mail. [579499] [19-1379] [Robert Krakow] [Entered: 01/21/2019 04:01 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Certified list from the United States Court of Federal Claims. Service: 01/10/2019 by clerk. Appellant's brief is due 03/11/2019. [577230] [JAL] [Entered: 01/10/2019 10:36 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/21/2018. [576363]. Entry of Appearance due 01/22/2019. Certificate of Interest due 01/22/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/06/2019. Certified List due 02/19/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 01/07/2019 02:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. HHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Mollie Gorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HOLLY AUSTIN, parent of K.A., a minor
Represented By: Robert Joel Krakow I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?