Universal Stabilization Tech. v. Advanced BioNutrition Corp.

Plaintiff / Appellant: UNIVERSAL STABILIZATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Defendant / Cross Appellant: ADVANCED BIONUTRITION CORP., a Maryland corporation
Case Number: 19-1380
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 582246-2 ] in 18-2413; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [582856] [18-2413, 19-1380] [MMA] [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:48 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Note to file: The following cases are associated:18-2413 Lead with 19-1380 Cross-Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [580923] [18-2413, 19-1380] [MMA] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:20 AM]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated, and the motion [ # 6 ] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The appellant's opening brief remains due March 25, 2019. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [580918] [18-2413, 19-1380] [LS] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:07 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION of Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp. to extend the time to 05/06/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578163] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:53 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578156] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:39 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Christopher H. Blaszkowski as of counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578155] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:38 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Andrew J. Koopman as of counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578153] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:34 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Benjamin E. Leace as principal counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578151] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:32 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/20/2018. [576448] Entry of Appearance due 01/22/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/22/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/22/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/08/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Stabilization Tech. v. Advanced BioNutrition Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNIVERSAL STABILIZATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Wagner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / cross appellant: ADVANCED BIONUTRITION CORP., a Maryland corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Koopman
Represented By: Benjamin E. Leace
Represented By: Christopher H. Blaszkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?