Halozyme, Inc. v. Iancu

Plaintiff / Appellee: HALOZYME, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 19-1383
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Iancu, Motion to Deconsolidate Appeals [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document should be submitted in lead case 19-1011. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[582177] [JAL] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:22 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION of Appellant Iancu to deconsolidate appeals, to stay appeal [Consent: opposed]. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582118] [19-1383] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Jaynie Lilley] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:09 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 9 ], ERROR: The entry of appearance for J. Lilley [ # 9 ] was made in 19-1383, which is a cross-appeal. CORRECTION: Documents should only be filed in the lead appeal (19-1011); if this document has not also been filed in the lead appeal, please re-file promptly. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [582115] [JAL] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:06 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Jaynie Lilley as principal counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 01/28/2019 by email. [581371] [19-1383] [Jaynie Lilley] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:06 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1011 Lead with 19-1383 Cross-Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [580717] [19-1011, 19-1383] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:52 PM]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed. Appeal Nos. 19-1011 and 19-1383 are consolidated. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The appellant's opening brief remains due no later than 02/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [580712] [19-1011, 19-1383] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:50 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for William G. Gaede III as principal counsel for Appellee Halozyme, Inc.. Service: 01/24/2019 by clerk, email. [580654] [19-1383] [William Gaede] [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:33 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Kakoli Caprihan as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580052] [19-1383] [Kakoli Caprihan] [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:03 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Amy J. Nelson as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580050] [19-1383] [Amy Nelson] [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:57 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Frances M. Lynch as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580043] [19-1383] [Frances Lynch] [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:54 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Thomas W. Krause as principal counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580039] [19-1383] [Thomas Krause] [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:50 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/26/2018. [576771] Entry of Appearance due 01/23/2019. Certificate of Interest due 01/23/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/08/2019. Appellant's brief due 03/11/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halozyme, Inc. v. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HALOZYME, INC.
Represented By: William G. Gaede III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Amy J. Nelson
Represented By: Frances Lynch
Represented By: Thomas W. Krause
Represented By: Kakoli Caprihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?