Sigmatech, Inc. v. US
Defendant / Appellee: DIGIFLIGHT, INC. and UNITED STATES
Plaintiff / Appellant: SIGMATECH, INC.
Case Number: 19-1384
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 6 ] filed by Appellant Sigmatech, Inc.; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [580739] [MMA] [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:11 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Sigmatech, Inc. to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580112]--[Edited 01/24/2019 by MJL to correct event] [Jon Levin] [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:17 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee DigiFlight, Inc.. Service: 01/10/2019 by email. [577425] [19-1384] [Christopher Lockwood] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:48 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Richard J.R. Raleigh, Jr. as of counsel for Appellee DigiFlight, Inc.. Service: 01/10/2019 by email. [577423] [19-1384] [Christopher Lockwood] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:47 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Jerome S. Gabig as of counsel for Appellee DigiFlight, Inc.. Service: 01/10/2019 by email. [577421] [19-1384] [Christopher Lockwood] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:46 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Christopher L. Lockwood as principal counsel for Appellee DigiFlight, Inc.. Service: 01/10/2019 by email. [577419] [19-1384] [Christopher Lockwood] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:45 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/26/2018. [576775] Entry of Appearance due 01/23/2019. Certificate of Interest due 01/23/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/08/2019. Appellant's brief due 03/11/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sigmatech, Inc. v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIGIFLIGHT, INC.
Represented By: Richard J.R. Raleigh Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Jerome S. Gabig
Represented By: Christopher L. Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Joseph Ashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SIGMATECH, INC.
Represented By: Jon Davidson Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?