Henry v. Fernandez-Rundle

Defendant / Appellee: KATHERINE FERNANDEZ-RUNDLE
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHAWN MARCOS HENRY
Case Number: 19-1391
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed. This matter and all filings are transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. (Per Curiam). Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk. [586858] [LS] [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:13 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 INFORMAL BRIEF FILED for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Number of Pages: 2. Service: 02/05/2019 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [583430] [SMJ] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:14 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581056] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:29 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Release of Personal Property from Escrow form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581054] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:25 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Release of Lien on Real Property form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581048] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:22 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581047] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:20 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581044] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:17 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Performance Bond form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581038] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:14 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of 12/18/18 district court dimissal order for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581034] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:12 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Bid Bond form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581031] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:10 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Individual Surety for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581029] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:06 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581024] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:04 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581023] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:02 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Shawn Marcos Henry as pro se Appellant. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581017] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:58 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/04/2019. [577084] Entry of Appearance due 01/23/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/23/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 01/30/2019. [SMJ] [Entered: 01/09/2019 04:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Fernandez-Rundle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE FERNANDEZ-RUNDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN MARCOS HENRY
Represented By: Shawn Marcos Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?