DataTern, Inc. v. Blazent, Inc.

Undetermined: DATATERN, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, LTD., EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION, CARL WARREN & CO., INC., TERADATA CORPORATION, LANCET SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC., BLAZENT, INC., INFORMATICA CORPORATION, PREMIER, INC., MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, INC. and AIRLINES REPORTING CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellant: MICROSTRATEGY, INC.
Case Number: 19-1398
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 22 ] filed by Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc. Appellant's opening brief is due 04/11/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [591787] [TAM] [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:55 AM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION of Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc. to withdraw party, Epicor Software Corporation, as a party to this appeal [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/11/2019 by clerk. [591786] [19-1398] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:53 AM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION of Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc. to correct or supplement motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/07/2019 by email. [591232] [19-1398] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:19 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc., Motion to Extend Time [ # 20 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached)..Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[590996] [TAM] [Entered: 03/07/2019 09:16 AM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION of Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc. to extend the time to 04/11/2019 to file the principal brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/05/2019 by email. [590558] [19-1398] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 21 ] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:38 PM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 Corrected Entry of appearance for Thomas C. Lundin Jr. as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 02/20/2019 by clerk, email. [587312] [19-1398] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 02/20/2019 08:58 AM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc., Entry of Appearance - Thomas Lundin [ # 14 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/26/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[587116] [TAM] [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:29 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583490] [19-1398] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 02/05/2019 01:19 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 Duplicate Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [583462] [19-1398] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:57 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [583461] [19-1398] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:55 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Duplicate Entry of appearance for Thomas C. Lundin Jr. as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [583459] [19-1398] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 18 ] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:53 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Duplicate Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [583457] [19-1398] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:51 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Teradata Corporation, Certificate of Interest [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/11/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[583221] [TAM] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:14 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582788] [19-1398] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 12 ] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:42 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582785] [19-1398] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:41 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Craig R. Smith as principal counsel for Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582782] [19-1398] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:37 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to counsel for Appellees Airlines Reporting Corporation, Blazent, Inc., Carl Warren & Co., Inc., Epicor Software Corporation, Informatica Corporation, Lancet Software Development, Inc., Magic Software Entertainment, Inc., Magic Software Entertainment, Ltd., Premier, Inc., Teradata Corporation and Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that an Entry of Appearance, Docketing Statement, and the Certificate of Interest has not been filed. A completed certificate of Interest must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 by 02/04/2019. An Entry of Appearance and Docketing Statement must be filed promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [582733] [TAM] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:42 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1398 (Lead) with 19-1401 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [582689] [19-1398, 19-1401] [TAM] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:06 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Proshanto Mukherji as of counsel for Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580985] [19-1398] [Proshanto Mukherji] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:04 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580982] [19-1398] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:55 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580979] [19-1398] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:51 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580975] [19-1398] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:47 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Adam J. Kessel as principal counsel for Appellant MicroStrategy, Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580973] [19-1398] [Adam Kessel] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:44 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/08/2019. [577674] Entry of Appearance due 01/25/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/25/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/25/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/12/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 01/11/2019 01:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DataTern, Inc. v. Blazent, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DATATERN, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Charles Lundin Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, LTD.
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephen Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL WARREN & CO., INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERADATA CORPORATION
Represented By: Craig Robert Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LANCET SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By: Derek B. Domian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLAZENT, INC.
Represented By: Melissa A. Brand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INFORMATICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Heather B. Repicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PREMIER, INC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Leno Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIRLINES REPORTING CORPORATION
Represented By: Dominic E. Massa Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICROSTRATEGY, INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?