DataTern, Inc. v. Blazent, Inc.

Undetermined: DATATERN, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, LTD., EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION, CARL WARREN & CO., INC., TERADATA CORPORATION, LANCET SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC., BLAZENT, INC., INFORMATICA CORPORATION, PREMIER, INC., MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, INC. and AIRLINES REPORTING CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellant: MICROSTRATEGY, INC.
Case Number: 19-1401
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc., Motion to Withdraw Party [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[591747] [TAM] [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:06 AM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION of Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc. Consent Motion by Plaintiff/Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc. to Dismiss Only Cross-Appellee Epicor Software Corporation from Cross-Appeal No. 19-1398 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/06/2019 by clerk. [590794] [19-1401] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 12 ] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:12 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1398 (Lead) with 19-1401 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [582689] [19-1398, 19-1401] [TAM] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:06 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 5 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 6 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 7 ], ERROR: The lead appeal number is incorrect. CORRECTION: When filing documents please use the proper Lead and Cross-Appeal numbers. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [582685] [TAM] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:02 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [581940] [19-1401] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:11 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [581938] [19-1401] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:10 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [581937] [19-1401] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:08 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Thomas C. Lundin Jr. as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant DataTern, Inc.. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. [581936] [19-1401] [Thomas Lundin] [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:05 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581177] [19-1401] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 01/25/2019 06:04 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581170] [19-1401] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:25 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Craig R. Smith as principal counsel for Appellee Teradata Corporation. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [581169] [19-1401] [Craig Smith] [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:23 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/08/2019. [577716] . [TAM] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DataTern, Inc. v. Blazent, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DATATERN, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Charles Lundin Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, LTD.
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephen Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL WARREN & CO., INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERADATA CORPORATION
Represented By: Craig Robert Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LANCET SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By: Derek B. Domian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLAZENT, INC.
Represented By: Melissa A. Brand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INFORMATICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Heather B. Repicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PREMIER, INC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Leno Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGIC SOFTWARE ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIRLINES REPORTING CORPORATION
Represented By: Dominic E. Massa Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICROSTRATEGY, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?