McRo, Inc. v. Bandai Namco Games America
Defendant / Appellee: DISNEY INTERACTIVE STUDIOS, INC., LUCASARTS ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY LLC, BANDAI NAMCO GAMES AMERICA INC., SUCKER PUNCH PRODUCTIONS, LLC, SQUARE ENIX, INC., ACTIVISION PUBLISHING, INC., INFINITY WARD, INC., TREYARCH CORPORATION, ELECTRONIC ARTS, INC., BLIZZARD ENTERTAINMENT, INC., NAUGHTY DOG, INC., SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT AMERICA LLC and LUCASARTS, A DIVISION OF LUCASFILM ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY LTD. LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: MCRO, INC., dba Planet Blue
Case Number: 19-1557
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 34 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file principal brief [ # 33 ] filed by Appellant McRo, Inc. Brief is due 05/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [592576] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:52 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION of Appellant McRo, Inc. to extend the time to 05/31/2019 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [592013] [19-1557] [Mark Raskin] [Entered: 03/11/2019 05:50 PM]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER filed. The revised official caption is reflected above. Service: 03/06/2019 by clerk. [590882] [NEL] [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:42 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 31 Entry of appearance for Catherine Y. Kim as of counsel for Appellees Electronic Arts, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Infinity Ward, Inc.. Service: 03/05/2019 by email. [590566] [19-1557] [Catherine Kim] [Entered: 03/05/2019 07:06 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 30 Entry of appearance for Wendy J. Ray as of counsel for Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/04/2019 by email. [590096] [19-1557] [Wendy Ray] [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:21 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/04/2019 by email. [590092] [19-1557] [Benjamin Fox] [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:16 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 28 Corrected Entry of appearance for Benjamin J. Fox as principal counsel for Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/04/2019 by email. [590088] [19-1557] [Benjamin Fox] [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:11 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Square Enix, Inc., Entry of Appearance - Benjamin J. Fox and Corrected Certificate of Interest [ # 26 ], [ # 23 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 03/11/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[589979] [TAM] [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:18 AM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 26 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589903] [19-1557] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 27 ] [Benjamin Fox] [Entered: 03/01/2019 08:11 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589879] [19-1557] [Benjamin Fox] [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:54 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589876] [19-1557] [Benjamin Fox] [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:52 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 Entry of appearance for Benjamin J. Fox as principal counsel for Appellee Square Enix, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589872] [19-1557] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 27 ] [Benjamin Fox] [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:48 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 Entry of appearance for Eugene Novikov as of counsel for Appellees Electronic Arts, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Infinity Ward, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589859] [19-1557] [Eugene Novikov] [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:06 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 Entry of appearance for Timothy P. Horgan-Kobelski as of counsel for Appellees Electronic Arts, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Infinity Ward, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589856] [19-1557] [Tim Horgan-Kobelski] [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:01 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Electronic Arts, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Infinity Ward, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589855] [19-1557] [Sonal Mehta] [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:55 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Electronic Arts, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Infinity Ward, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589854] [19-1557] [Sonal Mehta] [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:50 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 Entry of appearance for Sonal N. Mehta as principal counsel for Appellees Electronic Arts, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc. and Activision Publishing, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589853] [19-1557] [Sonal Mehta] [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:47 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for James Chang as of counsel for Appellees Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. and LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589841] [19-1557] [James Chang] [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:12 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 Objection to the official caption pursuant to Rule 12 Practice Note by Appellees Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. and LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589761] [19-1557] [Evan Finkel] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:44 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. and LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589757] [19-1557] [Evan Finkel] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:36 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. and LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589754] [19-1557] [Evan Finkel] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:32 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Evan Finkel as principal counsel for Appellees Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. and LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589747] [19-1557] [Evan Finkel] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:25 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Beth A. Larigan as of counsel for Appellees Naughty Dog, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC and Sucker Punch Productions, LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589735] [19-1557] [Beth Larigan] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:58 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Naughty Dog, Inc., Sucker Punch Productions, LLC and Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589732] [19-1557] [John Garretson] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:54 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Naughty Dog, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC and Sucker Punch Productions, LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589729] [19-1557] [John Garretson] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:50 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for John D. Garretson as principal counsel for Appellees Naughty Dog, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC and Sucker Punch Productions, LLC. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589726] [19-1557] [John Garretson] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:46 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for John F. Petrsoric as of counsel for Appellant McRo, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589725] [19-1557] [John Petrsoric] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:45 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Michael DeVincenzo as of counsel for Appellant McRo, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589724] [19-1557] [Michael DeVincenzo] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:41 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Robert A. Whitman as of counsel for Appellant McRo, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589722] [19-1557] [Robert Whitman] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:37 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant McRo, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589721] [19-1557] [Mark Raskin] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:35 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant McRo, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589719] [19-1557] [Mark Raskin] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:31 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant McRo, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589718] [19-1557] [Mark Raskin] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:29 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Mark S. Raskin as principal counsel for Appellant McRo, Inc.. Service: 03/01/2019 by email. [589717] [19-1557] [Mark Raskin] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:27 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 02/07/2019. [586364] Entry of Appearance due 03/01/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/01/2019. Docketing Statement due 03/01/2019. Appellant's brief is due 04/16/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRo, Inc. v. Bandai Namco Games America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISNEY INTERACTIVE STUDIOS, INC.
Represented By: Evan N. Budaj
Represented By: Evan Finkel
Represented By: James Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUCASARTS ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Evan Finkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANDAI NAMCO GAMES AMERICA INC.
Represented By: Justin M. Lee Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUCKER PUNCH PRODUCTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Beth A. Larigan
Represented By: John D. Garretson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SQUARE ENIX, INC.
Represented By: Wendy J. Ray
Represented By: Benjamin J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTIVISION PUBLISHING, INC.
Represented By: Sonal Naresh Mehta
Represented By: Catherine Kim
Represented By: Tim Horgan-Kobelski
Represented By: Eugene Novikov Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INFINITY WARD, INC.
Represented By: Sonal Naresh Mehta
Represented By: Catherine Kim
Represented By: Tim Horgan-Kobelski
Represented By: Eugene Novikov Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREYARCH CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward R. Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELECTRONIC ARTS, INC.
Represented By: Evan N. Budaj
Represented By: Sonal Naresh Mehta
Represented By: Catherine Kim
Represented By: Tim Horgan-Kobelski
Represented By: Eugene Novikov Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLIZZARD ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Sonal Naresh Mehta
Represented By: Catherine Kim
Represented By: Tim Horgan-Kobelski
Represented By: Eugene Novikov Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NAUGHTY DOG, INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Larigan
Represented By: John D. Garretson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Beth A. Larigan
Represented By: John D. Garretson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUCASARTS, A DIVISION OF LUCASFILM ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY LTD. LLC
Represented By: Evan Finkel
Represented By: James Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MCRO, INC., dba Planet Blue
Represented By: Mark Stewart Raskin
Represented By: Michael DeVincenzo
Represented By: Robert Whitman
Represented By: John Francis Petrsoric Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?