Immunex Corporation v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Appellee: GENZYME CORPORATION, REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Appellant: IMMUNEX CORPORATION
Case Number: 19-1749
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. Appellant's brief is due 07/15/2019. [608155] [MMA] [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:39 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Eric S. Hansen as of counsel for Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602776] [19-1749] [Eric Hansen] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:52 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Joel L. Thollander as of counsel for Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602775] [19-1749] [Joel Thollander] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:51 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Lauren L. Fornarotto as of counsel for Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602774] [19-1749] [Lauren Fornarotto] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:49 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Mike McKool as of counsel for Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602772] [19-1749] [Mike McKool] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:46 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for George W. Hicks, Jr. as of counsel for Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602763] [19-1749] [George Hicks] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:09 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602758] [19-1749] [John Garvish] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:00 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602757] [19-1749] [John Garvish] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:58 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for John F. Garvish, II as principal counsel for Appellees Genzyme Corporation, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602756] [19-1749] [John Garvish] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:57 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Immunex Corporation. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602710] [19-1749] [Eldora Ellison] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:47 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Immunex Corporation. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602708] [19-1749] [Eldora Ellison] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:45 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for David W. Roadcap as of counsel for Appellant Immunex Corporation. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602706] [19-1749] [David Roadcap] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:42 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for David H. Holman as of counsel for Appellant Immunex Corporation. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602702] [19-1749] [David Holman] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:40 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Jon E. Wright as of counsel for Appellant Immunex Corporation. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602699] [19-1749] [Jon Wright] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:38 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Eldora L. Ellison as principal counsel for Appellant Immunex Corporation. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602695] [19-1749] [Eldora Ellison] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:36 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/08/2019. [598962] Entry of Appearance due 04/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/24/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/24/2019. Certified List due on 05/20/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immunex Corporation v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GENZYME CORPORATION
Represented By: Lauren Lee Fornarotto Esq.
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Joel Lance Thollander
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: John Franklin Garvish II
Represented By: Lauren Fornarotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Lauren Lee Fornarotto Esq.
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Joel Lance Thollander
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: John Franklin Garvish II
Represented By: Lauren Fornarotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Lauren Lee Fornarotto Esq.
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Joel Lance Thollander
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: John Franklin Garvish II
Represented By: Lauren Fornarotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: IMMUNEX CORPORATION
Represented By: Eldora Ellison Ph.D.
Represented By: David William Roadcap Ph.D.
Represented By: David Holman Esq.
Represented By: Jon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?