DMF, Inc. v. AMP Plus, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellee: DMF, INC., a California corporation
Defendant / Appellant: ELCO LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation and AMP PLUS, INC., a California corporation, dba ELCO Lighting
Case Number: 19-1750
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellant's opening brief [ # 18 ] filed by Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc. Brief is due 07/10/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [610505] [TAM] [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:51 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION of Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc. to extend the time to 07/10/2019 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610411] [19-1750] [Robert Boone] [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:03 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected Entry of appearance for Daniel A. Crowe as of counsel for Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc.. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604418] [19-1750] [Daniel Crowe] [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:56 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 Docketing Statement for the Appellee DMF, Inc.. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604206] [19-1750] [Ben Davidson] [Entered: 04/30/2019 06:50 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 Notice to counsel for Appellee DMF, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that the Docketing Statement has not been filed.. A completed docketing statement must be filed promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [604154] [TAM] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:56 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc., Corrected Entry of Appearance for Daniel Crowe [ # 13 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[604139] [TAM] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:44 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corrected Entry of appearance for Daniel A. Crowe as of counsel for Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2019 by email. [603817] [19-1750] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 14 ] [Daniel Crowe] [Entered: 04/29/2019 06:28 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2019 by email. [603816] [19-1750] [Daniel Crowe] [Entered: 04/29/2019 06:26 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 6 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 7 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entries of appearance for D. Long [ # 6 ] and B. Davidson [ # 7 ] does not match the information in the attorneys' user accounts. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user accounts matches. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [603103] [JAL] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:17 AM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc., Entry of Appearance - D. Crowe, Certificate of Interest [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 05/03/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[603100] [JAL] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:11 AM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 2 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entry of appearance for R. Boone III [ # 2 ] does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that the information listed on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [603099] [JAL] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:07 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee DMF, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602977] [19-1750] [Ben Davidson] [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:51 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Ben M. Davidson as of counsel for Appellee DMF, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602976] [19-1750] [Ben Davidson] [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:49 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for David W. Long as principal counsel for Appellee DMF, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602973] [19-1750] [Ben Davidson] [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:46 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement for the Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by clerk, email. [602624] [19-1750] [Daniel Crowe] [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:57 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for the Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by clerk, email. [602623] [19-1750] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Daniel Crowe] [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:55 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Daniel A. Crowe as of counsel for Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by clerk, email. [602622] [19-1750] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Daniel Crowe] [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:51 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Robert E. Boone III as principal counsel for Appellants AMP Plus, Inc. and ELCO Lighting, Inc. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602599] [19-1750]--[Edited 04/26/2019 by JAL to add party filers] [Robert Boone] [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:07 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/04/2019. [598992] Entry of Appearance due 04/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/24/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/24/2019. Appellant's brief is due 06/10/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DMF, Inc. v. AMP Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DMF, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Ben M. Davidson
Represented By: David W. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELCO LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Robert Edward Boone III
Represented By: Daniel A. Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMP PLUS, INC., a California corporation, dba ELCO Lighting
Represented By: Robert Edward Boone III
Represented By: Daniel A. Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?