Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. v. Tietex International Ltd.

Defendant / Appellee: TIETEX INTERNATIONAL LTD.
Plaintiff / Appellant: PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 19-1751
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 10 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entry of appearance does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. [602831] [MMA] [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:42 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Tietex International Ltd.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602801] [19-1751] [Neil Jones] [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:49 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 20 Corrected Entry of appearance for Lynne A. Borchers as principal counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602766] [19-1751] [Peter Siddoway] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:19 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 Corrected Entry of appearance for Peter D. Siddoway as of counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602765] [19-1751] [Peter Siddoway] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:18 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 18 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602762] [19-1751] [Peter Siddoway] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:05 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602761] [19-1751] [Peter Siddoway] [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:03 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Corrected Entry of appearance for Whitney D. Pierce as of counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602750] [19-1751] [Whitney Pierce] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:46 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Richard A. Coughlin as of counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602745] [19-1751] [Richard Coughlin] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:37 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Tietex International Ltd.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602689] [19-1751] [Neil Jones] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:32 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Neil C. Jones as principal counsel for Appellee Tietex International Ltd.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602684] [19-1751] [Neil Jones] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:26 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Samuel W. Outten as of counsel for Appellee Tietex International Ltd.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602681] [19-1751] [Samuel Outten] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:22 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for William S. Brown as of counsel for Appellee Tietex International Ltd.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602675] [19-1751] [William Brown] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:15 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Ashley B. Summer as of counsel for Appellee Tietex International Ltd.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602668] [19-1751] [Ashley Summer] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:05 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 4 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 5 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the documents does not match the information in the attorneys' user accounts. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. [602290] [MMA] [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:36 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 4 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 5 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 7 ], ERROR: The documents do not include the consolidated case number. CORRECTION: Filings must include all consolidated/cross-appeal case numbers. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [602284] [MMA] [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:30 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Whitney D. Pierce as of counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2019 by email. [602131] [19-1751] [Whitney Pierce] [Entered: 04/22/2019 05:34 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 04/22/2019 by email. [602112] [19-1751] [Peter Siddoway] [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:55 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Peter D. Siddoway as of counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2019 by email. [601978] [19-1751] [Peter Siddoway] [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:59 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Lynne A. Borchers as principal counsel for Appellant Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.. Service: 04/22/2019 by email. [601971] [19-1751] [Lynne Borchers] [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:46 PM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1751 (Lead) with 19-1754 (Member Case). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [601578] [19-1751, 19-1754] [MMA] [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:37 AM]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating appeals (19-1751 with 19-1754). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [601573] [19-1751, 19-1754] [MMA] [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:35 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/09/2019. [599104] Entry of Appearance due 04/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/24/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/24/2019. Appellant's brief is due 06/10/2019.--[Edited 04/12/2019 by CAB to attach corrected notice] [MMA] [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. v. Tietex International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIETEX INTERNATIONAL LTD.
Represented By: Samuel W. Outten
Represented By: William S. Brown
Represented By: Ashley Boland Summer
Represented By: Neil C. Jones Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Richard A. Coughlin
Represented By: Whitney Demain Pierce Esq.
Represented By: Peter Daniel Siddoway
Represented By: Lynne A. Borchers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?