In re: Morsa

Appellant: In re: STEVE MORSA
Appellee: ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 19-1757
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION of Steve Morsa to extend the time to 07/20/2019 to file the informal opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/03/2019 by clerk. [610925] [MJL] [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:52 AM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/21/2019 by US mail. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 06/14/2019. [609478] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:34 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Amy J. Nelson as of counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 05/13/2019 by email, US mail. [606766] [19-1757] [Amy Nelson] [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:54 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Iancu. Service: 05/13/2019 by email, US mail. [606764] [19-1757] [Kakoli Caprihan] [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:45 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Kakoli Caprihan as of counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 05/13/2019 by email, US mail. [606761] [19-1757] [Kakoli Caprihan] [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:43 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Duplicate entry of appearance for Steve Morsa as pro se received via mail. Service: 04/13/2019 by US mail. [603984] [MJL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:36 AM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Steve Morsa as pro se. Service: 04/13/2019 by US mail. [602078] [MJL] [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:04 PM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Thomas W. Krause as of counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 04/12/2019 by email, US mail. [599824] [19-1757] [Thomas Krause] [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:57 PM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Coke Morgan Stewart as principal counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 04/12/2019 by email, US mail. [599718] [19-1757] [Coke Stewart] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:48 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/04/2019. [599350] Entry of Appearance due 04/25/2019. Certified List due 05/21/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Morsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: In re: STEVE MORSA
Represented By: Steve Morsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Thomas W. Krause
Represented By: Amy J. Nelson
Represented By: Coke Morgan Stewart
Represented By: Kakoli Caprihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?