Lee v. FAA
Petitioner: EVELYN LEE
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 19-1790
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Alison S. Vicks as principal counsel for Respondent FAA. Service: 06/18/2019 by email. [615268] [19-1790] [Alison Vicks] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:10 PM]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed. Within 40 days of the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to jointly stipulate to the certified list, or in the alternative, to file an agreed statement pursuant to Rule 10(d) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Service: 06/11/2019 by clerk. [613045] [LS] [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:06 AM]
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 Notice from the arbitrator of non-filing of the certified list. [612227] [MJL] [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:15 AM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Respondent FAA. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609599] [19-1790] [Andrew Lamb] [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:23 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Respondent FAA, Docketing Statement [ # 12 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 06/03/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[609553] [MMA] [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:28 AM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Docketing Statement for the Respondent FAA. Service: 05/22/2019 by email. [609140] [19-1790] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 13 ] [Andrew Lamb] [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:32 PM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Docketing Statement for the Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 05/20/2019 by email. [608432] [19-1790] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:07 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Andrew W. Lamb as principal counsel for Respondent FAA. Service: 05/15/2019 by email. [607495] [19-1790] [Andrew Lamb] [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:09 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected Entry of appearance for Erina M. Hammond as of counsel for Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604147] [19-1790] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:51 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Petitioner Evelyn Lee, Entry of Appearance - E. Hammond [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[604142] [JAL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:47 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Erina M. Hammond as of counsel for Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604127] [19-1790] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:17 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Marguerite L. Graf as principal counsel for Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604125] [19-1790] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:16 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Magen V. Stevens as of counsel for Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604121] [19-1790] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:13 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Statement Concerning Discrimination pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 15(c) for Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604119] [19-1790] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:11 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Petitioner Evelyn Lee. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604115] [19-1790] [Magen Stevens] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:09 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerk's letter to the arbitrator directing that the certified list be filed. Certified List due 06/03/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [601800] [MJL] [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:10 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/16/2019. 15(c) due 05/06/2019. Entry of Appearance due 05/06/2019. Certificate of Interest due 05/06/2019. Docketing Statement due 05/22/2019. [601788] [MJL] [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. FAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Alison Vicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EVELYN LEE
Represented By: Marguerite L. Graf
Represented By: Magen Stevens
Represented By: Erina M. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?