Power Integrations, Inc. v. Semiconductor Components
Appellant: SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS INDUSTRIES, LLC and POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 19-1868
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certified list received. Service: 06/24/2019 by email. [616507] [JAL] [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:26 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 4 ], ERROR: The certificate of interest [ # 4 ] was submitted in the cross-appeal of a consolidated group. All filings should be made in the lead appeal only. CORRECTION: As a compliant version of the certificate of interest was also filed in the lead appeal, no further action is necessary. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [610097] [JAL] [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:42 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609898] [19-1868] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:07 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1863 Lead with 19-1868 Cross-Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [609267] [19-1863, 19-1868] [JAL] [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:09 AM]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER filed. Appeals 19-1863 and 19-1868 are consolidated and will be considered an appeal and cross-appeal. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The certified list is due no later than 06/24/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [609265] [19-1863, 19-1868] [JAL] [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:08 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/13/2019. [607086] Entry of Appearance is due 05/28/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/28/2019. Docketing Statement is due 05/28/2019. Certified List is due on 06/24/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Integrations, Inc. v. Semiconductor Components
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.
Represented By: John C. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?