Khan v. Hemosphere Inc.
Defendant: F. NOEL PARENT, EARL SCHUMAN, KAUTILYA MEHTA, HARRY SCHANZER, BRENT STEFFEN, CARL DOERHOFF, CHANTEL HILE, DAVID RYNBRANDT, SCOTT BERMAN, JOHN THOMAS MEHIGAN, AJAY KALRA, WALLACE GOSNEY, CARLOS CRUZ, INTERSTATE BUSINESS, BILL K. CHANG, TERRENCE FITZGIBBONS, LAKSHMIKUMAR PILLAI, J. ANDRES GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN YAU, ANTONIO CASTANEDA, JOE CHAUVAPUN, VICTORIA TEODORESCU, STEPHEN B. SELF, ADAM B. LEVITT, CHARLES PIGOTT, JOHN GRABER, DAVID P. LLOYD, LON BITZER, BROOKS WHITNEY, PHILLIP CACIOPPO, JACOBO NURKO, ROBERT C. DAVIES, JOSEPH COATTI, TODD GENSLER, GREGORY DOMER, ANDREW SEIWERT, JOHN HOROWITZ, RICHARD DICKERMAN, GERARD CRECCA, DMITRI GELFAND, KARL STARK, RAMON VAZQUEZ, JEFFREY H. LAWSON, MICHAEL KORENMAN, ALBERT RICHARDSON, DAVID SHAPIRO, LOFTON MISIK, MARC ECKHAUSER, IMRAN MOHIUDDIN, SCOTT E. OLSSON, RASESH SHAH, UTTAM TRIPATHY, GREGORY C. SCHMIEDER, MARCELLO BORZATTA, JASON BEAVER, ROBERT GAYLE, AHMAD ABU-GHAIDA, MATTHEW LEAVITT, TOBY J. DUNN, MALEK HANANO, LIT FUNG, MICHAEL HARRINGTON, TIMOTHY FIELD, ROBERT MCLAFFERTY, CHRISTOPHER MARROCCO, STEFAN MOLDOVAN, ERIC K. PEDEN, HEMOSPHERE INC., ZACHARY BALDWIN, KAMAL F. KASSIS, JOSE OBERHOLZER, DAVID SOWDEN, RAMESH PALADUGU, A. CULLEN RICHARDSON, III, JOHN MATSUURA, JON SCHELLACK, MICHAEL INGEGNO, JEFFREY REESE, SAMIR KREIT, JOHN R. ROSS, SR., GORDON BURTCH, CLYDE R. REDMOND, THOMAS L. BARNES, ROBERT ALBRECHT, BART MUHS, STEVEN MAGNESS, GABRIEL G. CARABELLO, YEVGENIY RITS, JON M. WESLEY, CHRISTIE GOODEN, TIMOTHY SMITH, J. KEVIN CROSTON, KEVIN NOLAN, CHARLES MOOMEY, EDWARD RIGDON, FREDDIE L. MCRAE, FUAD RAMMADAN, JOSEPH GRAHAM, OMRAN ABUL KHOUDOUD, REAGAN QUAN, JON W. JONES, UTPAL DESAI, GEORGE LETSOU, JOHN FOOR, PETER KELLY, THOMAS WEHMANN, JOSE U. ZAMORA, RICARDO AGUIRRE, INGEMAR DAVIDSON, ROGER SHINNERL, EDWARD PAVILLARD, ANTHONY MURPHY, NARENDRA MYNENI, JOHN SCHOR, CARL MALTESE, THOMAS ABBRUZZESE, HANS A. BRINGS, DAVID AXELROD, JOHN ADENIYI, VITO A. MANTESE, WILLIAM B. COHEN, HANI SHENNIB, JOHN LLJAS, JOHN CARR, WILLIAM DESCHNER, ROBERT FELDTMAN, RICHARD DEMASI, CHRISTOPHER GRAMES, DANIEL D. LEE, EYAL BEN-ARIE, ROBERT POWERS, MARK ROSENBLOOM, DAVID CARROLL, SCOTT G. WESTFALL, JAMES WYNN, JAMES H. MORGAN, III, GUY LANCELLOTTI, MICHAEL JON COHEN, BIPINCHANDRA PATEL, IVO TZVETANOV, ROBERT JUBELIRER, BRANDT FEUERSTEIN, MICHAEL SUTHERLAND, PABLO UCEDA, PETER MOY, JEFFREY D. PUNCH, BRUCE BRENNAMAN, DAVID WHITLEY, ERIC D. WELLONS, RAJEEV RAO, DONALD L. JACOBS, TATSUO KAWAI, RICHARD B. HILL, APHRODITE HENDERSON, PAUL PERKOWSKI, JEFFREY WHITEHURST, DANIEL NATHANSON, JOHN LUCAS, III, MAURICE SOLIS, JOHN ILJAS, KUMARA RAMA, SAMUEL DURHAM, ROBERT STEPPACHER, STEPHEN SANOFSKY, JOSEPH ZARGE, STEVE MORRISON, STEPHEN MURRAY, STEPHEN MOTEW, MARTIN O'GRADY, HOMAYOUN HASHEMI, SCOTT KUJATH, RAYMOND WORKMAN, ROBERT HARLAND, JOSEPH CARUSO, THOMAS HUBER, BRADLEY SCHUBERT, SANTIAGO CHAHWAN, JOHN MCKINLEY, STEVEN WEBER, DENNIS JACOBS, DAVID LORAN, DEREK E. MOORE, HOSPITALS AND DOCTORS IMPLANTING UNPATENTED HERO GRAFT TO DOCTORS, DAVID H. SCHULMAN, CURTIS ERICKSON, MOHMMED MARGNI, IRENE GOLDSTEIN, GEOFFREY RISLEY, RAYMOND MAKHOUL, JOHN E. CODD and MARK RANDEL
Defendant / Appellee: LARRY D. FLANAGAN, JONATHAN R. MOLNAR, SHEPPARD MONDY, YVON R. BARIBEAU, TUAN-HUNG CHU, HEATHER LEBLANC, MICHAEL KLYCHAKIN, MARIUS SAINES, PETER WONG, TODD SMITH, SIDDARTH PATEL, JOHN C. KEDORA, IGNACIO RUA, MURRAY L. SHAMES, GERARDO ORTEGA, BORIS PAUL, FERNANDO KAFIE, STEPHEN JENSIK, RANDAL BAST, EUGENE SIMONI, MICHAEL WILLERTH, ALLEN HARTSELL, VIRGINIA WONG, CARLOS ROSALES, ROBERT S. BROOKS, WILLIAM OMLIE, JOSEPH GRIFFIN, JEFFREY SILVER, JON R. HENWOOD, WALTER RIZZONI, CHARLES M. EICHLER, ABILIO COELLO, ROBERT HOYNE, HERBERT OYE, WILLIAM SOPER, DAVID SMITH, GARY LEMMON, TIMOTHY C. HODGES, BRAD GRIMSLEY, TY DUNN, KOUROSH BAGHELAI, ANGELO SANTOS, EDDY LUH, ERIC LADENHEIM, JASON DEW, W. ANDREW TIERNEY, JASON BURGESS, JAMES D. LAWSON, HEIDI A. PEARSON, MOUNTAIN MEDIAL PHYSICIAN SPECIALISTS, HECTOR DIAZ-LUNA, PATRICK GERAGHTY, MARK GROVE, JOY GARG KAISER PERMANENTE, ELLEN DILLAVOU, MATTHEW J. BORKON, ANNE LALLY, BLAIR JORDAN, JONATHAN VELASCO, JAVIER ALVAREZ-TOSTADO, JEFFREY MARTINEZ, MICHAEL GALLICHIO, LOUIS ELKINS, LUIS SANCHEZ, PANKAJ BHATNAGAR, THOMAS ROSS, CHRISTOPHER WIXON, WILLIAM DUCEY, VICTOR BOWERS, CHAD LAURICH, ALLAN ROZA, JULIO VASQUEZ, LUIS G. ECHEVERRI, GEORGE BLESSIOS, HOWARD E. KATZMAN, AMIT DWIVEDI, TODD EARLY, STEPHEN WISE UNGER, CHASE TATTERSALL, PAUL ORLAND, ROBERT MOLNAR, BOULOS TOURSARKISSIAN, GUSTAVO TORRES, LEE FORESTIERE, DAVID B. LEESER, THOMAS HATSUKAMI, RUBAN NIRMALAN, ALOK K. GUPTA, JEFFREY PEARCE, ALEXANDER URIBE, STEPHEN HOHMANN, JEFF STANLEY, EDWARD BEVERLY MORRISON, JAMES W. CAMPBELL, ROBERT BRUMBERG, BENJAMIN WESTBROOK, ANDREW SHERWOOD, GARY TANNENBAUM, EDWARD KIM, HOWARD L. SAYLOR, ERIC GARDNER, THOMAS REIFSNYDER, WILLIAM SCHRODER, JAMES R. ROOKS, WILLAIM J. TAPSCOTT, STEPHEN SETTLE, MATTHEW G. BROWN, RAGHU L. MOTAGNAHALLI, ANDRES SCHANZER, THOMAS WINEK, JEFFREY CAMERON, DENNIS FRY, CLINTON ATKINSON, ALBERT SAM, DAMIAN LEBAMOFF, CRYOLIFE INC. and MERIT MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: NAZIR KHAN and IFTIKHAR KHAN
Case Number: 19-1952
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 13, 2020 KHAN v. HEMOSPHERE INC.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 163 Petition for writ of certiorari filed on 03/25/2021 in the U.S. Supreme Court. No.: 20-1363, Merit Medical Systems Inc. v. Nazir Khan. [766079] [JCP] [Entered: 04/01/2021 07:09 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 162 Notice from Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove of Withdrawal of Counsel. Service: 01/20/2021 by email. [750370] [19-1952] [Kathryn Campbell] [Entered: 01/20/2021 02:35 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 161 Petition for writ of certiorari filed on 12/01/2020, and placed on the docket 12/07/2020, in the U.S. Supreme Court. No.: 20-773, Nazir Khan, et al. v. Merit Medical Systems Inc., et al. [741180] [JAB] [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:42 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 160 Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [737654] [19-1952, 19-2394] [MJL] [Entered: 11/23/2020 12:52 PM]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER filed denying motion to stay mandate [ # 154 ] filed by Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [735630] [MJL] [Entered: 11/16/2020 09:11 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 158 REPLY of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to response [ # 157 ]. Service: 11/13/2020 by email. [735351] [19-1952] [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:32 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 157 RESPONSE of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to the motion [ # 154 ]. Service: 11/13/2020 by email. [735283] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 11/13/2020 09:49 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, et al. (Merit Physicians) and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc., Response [ # 155 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due 11/20/2020. Unless ordered otherwise, the deadline for any responsive filing runs from service of the original version. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [735236]--[Edited 11/13/2020 by MJL to correct filers] [MJL] [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:32 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 155 RESPONSE of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, et al. and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to the motion to stay mandate [ # 154 ]. Service: 11/12/2020 by email. [735221] [19-1952]--[Edited 11/13/2020 by MJL to consolidate text]. This motion is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 156 ]. [David Todd] [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:28 PM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 154 MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to stay the mandate. Service: 11/10/2020 by email. [734903] [19-1952] [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:03 PM]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER filed denying [ # 140 ] petition for panel rehearing, for en banc rehearing filed by Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [734186] [JAB] [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:37 AM]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER filed. The motions ([ # 149 ], [ # 150 ]) are denied. By: Per Curiam. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [733395] [JAB] [Entered: 11/03/2020 04:02 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 151 REPLY of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to response [ # 150 ]. Service: 10/30/2020 by email. [732434] [19-1952] [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 10/30/2020 08:34 AM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 150 RESPONSE of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to the motion to file a response/reply [ # 149 ] filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan with MOTION to for leave to file a response/reply to Doc. No. [ # 149 ]. Service: 10/29/2020 by email [732360] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:13 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan for leave to file a response/reply to Doc. No. [ # 147 ]. Service: 10/26/2020 by email. [731452] [19-1952] [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:47 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 148 18 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 147 ] received from Appellees and Cross-Appellant. [731372] [JAB] [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:37 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 147 RESPONSE of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to the petition [ # 140 ], petition [ # 140 ]. Service: 10/22/2020 by email. [730781] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:56 AM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 146 The court invites a combined response from the Appellees and Cross-Appellant to the petition for panel rehearing, for en banc rehearing filed by Appellants in 19-1952. Response due on 10/22/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [727611] [JAB] [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:54 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 144 Entry of appearance for Jonathan A. Herstoff; Camille Y. Turner; Kaitlin M. Abrams as counsel for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [722431] [JAB] [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:54 AM]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER filed granting motion leave to appear as counsel [ # 142 ] filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [722428] [JAB] [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:49 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan for leave to file entry of appearances(s) for Jonathan A. Herstoff; Camille Y. Turner; Kaitlin M. Abrams [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [721420] [19-1952] [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:13 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan, Entry of appearance for Jonathan A. Herstoff; Camille Y. Turner; Kaitlin M. Abrams [ # 139 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/21/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [721288] [JAB] [Entered: 09/14/2020 12:24 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 140 Petition for panel rehearing, for en banc rehearing filed by Appellants Nazir Khan and Iftikhar Khan. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [721259] [19-1952] [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:46 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 139 Entry of appearance for Jonathan A. Herstoff; Camille Y. Turner; Kaitlin M. Abrams as counsel for Appellants Nazir Khan and Iftikhar Khan. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [721257] [19-1952] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 141 ]. [Jonathan Herstoff] [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:43 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 138 JUDGMENT. AFFIRMED. Terminated on the merits after submission on the briefs. COSTS: No Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . [714628] [19-1952, 19-2394] [JAB] [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:20 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 137 OPINION filed for the court by Prost, Chief Judge; Moore, Circuit Judge and Stoll, Circuit Judge. Nonprecedential Opinion. [714625] [19-1952, 19-2394] [JAB] [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:18 AM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 136 Submitted ON THE BRIEFS. Panel: Judge: Prost , Judge: Moore , Judge: Stoll. [712371] [JAB] [Entered: 08/04/2020 12:45 PM]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file memorandum in lieu of oral argument [ # 133 ] filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. The memorandum is accepted for filing. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [709145] [JAB] [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:04 AM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 134 Paper document received from Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. (PENDING REVIEW). [708696] [JCP] [Entered: 07/20/2020 06:20 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 133 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Nazir Khan to extend the time to file Memorandum in Lieu of Oral Argument [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 07/20/2020 by clerk. [708344]--[Edited 07/20/2020 by JAB to revise docket text] [JCP] [Entered: 07/17/2020 06:00 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 132 Memorandum in lieu of oral argument for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc.. Service: 07/06/2020 by email, US mail. [705630] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:36 PM]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER filed denying [ # 115 ] motion to allow argument filed by Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [703878] [JAB] [Entered: 06/26/2020 09:37 AM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION WITHOUT ARGUMENT. Panel: 2008D. Case scheduled August 4, 2020. Argument is not required and this case will be submitted to the panel on the date indicated. [702761] [JAB] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:48 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 129 6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Response Brief with Supplemental Appendix [ # 108 ] received from Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. [702563] [CJF] [Entered: 06/19/2020 03:55 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 128 6 paper copies of the Corrected Supplemental Brief [ # 117 ] received from Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. [702557] [CJF] [Entered: 06/19/2020 03:43 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 127 6 paper copies of the Supplemental Appendix (Vol. I - II) [ # 67 ] received from Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Louis Elkins, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Heather LeBlanc, Damian Lebamoff, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc.. [702097] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:55 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 126 6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Response Brief [ # 85 ] received from Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Heather LeBlanc, Damian Lebamoff, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc.. [702082] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:12 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 125 6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Response Brief [ # 89 ] received from Appellee Louis Elkins. [702073] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:56 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 124 6 paper copies of the Opening Response Brief [ # 65 ] received from Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. [702068] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:52 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 122 6 paper copies of the Corrected Reply Brief [ # 112 ] received from Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. [702057] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:40 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 121 6 paper copies of the Corrected Supplemental Appendix [ # 103 ] received from Appellee Louis Elkins. [702050] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:30 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 123 6 paper copies of the Opening Response Brief [ # 68 ] received from Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. [702061] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:46 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 120 6 paper copies of the Appendix [ # 69 ] received from Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. [702048] [CJF] [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:24 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 119 Notice to counsel: The Clerk's Office directs that outstanding paper copies of all briefs and appendices in this case must be submitted on or before June 19, 2020. See Administrative Order No. 20-01 (Mar. 20, 2020). [700509] [MMA] [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:50 AM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 118 Notice of Correction to Doc No. [ # 117 ] for Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc.. Service: 05/20/2020 by email, US mail. [695980] [19-1952] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:04 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 117 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED (SUPPLEMENTAL) for CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. Number of Pages: 5. Service: 05/20/2020 by US mail, email. [695976]--[Edited 05/27/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:59 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 116 Entry of appearance for Kathryn A. Campbell as of counsel for Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Service: 05/20/2020 by email. [695959] [19-1952] [Kathryn Campbell] [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:07 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 115 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to allow oral argument [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 05/19/2020 by clerk. [695708]--[Edited 05/19/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 05/19/2020 03:13 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc., Supplemental Brief [ # 113 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant brief due on 05/20/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [694249] [MMA] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:12 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 113 FILED from Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. Title: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. Service: 05/08/2020 by email, US mail. [693292] [19-1952] This brief is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 114 ] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 05/08/2020 04:26 PM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 112 CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. Number of Pages: 18. Service: 03/11/2020 by email, US mail. [690538] This brief has been accepted. See Order [ # 111 ] [MMA] [Entered: 04/28/2020 02:40 PM]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER filed granting Merit's motion [ # 92 ] to the extent that the corrected reply brief attached to Merit's motion is accepted.; granting CryoLife's motion [ # 93 ] to the extent that within ten days from the date of filing of this order, CryoLife may file a 5-page supplemental brief addressing arguments raised on pages 7 through 9 of the appellants' corrected reply brief, ECF No. 74. These appeals are otherwise fully briefed and ready for calendaring, and thus all future filings shall be transmitted to the merits panel. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [690506] [LMS] [Entered: 04/28/2020 12:17 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 110 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. to Doc No. [ # 64 ]. Service: 03/27/2020 by email, US mail. [682481] [19-1952] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:14 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 109 Notice of Correction to Doc No. [ # 64 ] for Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email, US mail. [682477] [19-1952] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:11 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 108 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED with SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX for Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. Number of Pages: 14. Service: 03/27/2020 by US mail, email. [682470]--[Edited 04/06/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:02 PM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 107 REPLY of Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to response [ # 106 ]. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682115] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:10 PM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 105 MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY of Appellee CryoLife Inc. to response [ # 106 ]. Service: 03/24/2020 by US mail, email. [681468]--[Edited 03/26/2020 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:57 PM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 106 MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to the motion [ # 92 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. in 19-1952. Service: 03/26/2020 by clerk. [681883]--[Edited 03/26/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 03/26/2020 09:46 AM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 104 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellee Louis Elkins to Doc No. [ # 103 ]. Service: 03/23/2020 by email, US mail. [681077] [19-1952] [Patrick James] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:46 PM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 103 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED APPENDIX FILED (SUPPLEMENTAL) for Louis Elkins. Number of Pages: 132. Service: 03/23/2020 by email, US mail. [681016]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Patrick James] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:46 PM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc., Response Brief [ # 64 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/30/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [680981] [MMA] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:00 PM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION of Appellee CryoLife Inc. for leave to file a response/reply to Doc. No. [ # 74 ], to strike Brief [ # 74 ] [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 03/13/2020 by email, US mail. [678808] [19-1952] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 03/13/2020 07:00 PM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief or, alternatively, to strike party document [ # 91 ] [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 03/11/2020 by email, US mail. [678009] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 03/11/2020 04:18 PM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 91 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 03/09/2020 by clerk. [677209]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [JCP] [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:09 PM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 90 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 03/09/2020 by clerk. [677207]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [JCP] [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:08 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 89 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellee Louis Elkins. Number of Pages: 15. Service: 02/27/2020 by US mail, email. [674948]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Patrick James] [Entered: 02/27/2020 04:07 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 88 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED Notice of Joinder for Appellee Siddarth Patel joining in [ # 85 ] Opening Response Brief submitted by Appellees Edward Beverly Morrison, Luis G. Echeverri, Willaim J. Tapscott, James W. Campbell, Heather LeBlanc, Lee Forestiere, Edward Kim, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Marius Saines, Gustavo Torres, Charles M. Eichler, Eric Ladenheim, Robert S. Brooks, Anne Lally, Matthew G. Brown, Abilio Coello, Howard E. Katzman, Stephen Wise Unger, Fernando Kafie, Robert Hoyne, Robert Brumberg, Murray L. Shames, Victor Bowers, Heidi A. Pearson, Jeffrey Pearce, Michael Klychakin, William Schroder, Jonathan R. Molnar, Christopher Wixon, Julio Vasquez, William Soper, Jeffrey Silver, Stephen Jensik, Gary Lemmon, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Ruban Nirmalan, Chase Tattersall, William Ducey, Michael Willerth, Dennis Fry, Jeffrey Cameron, David Smith, Amit Dwivedi, Joseph Griffin, Albert Sam, Andrew Sherwood, Larry D. Flanagan, Thomas Reifsnyder, David B. Leeser, Andres Schanzer, Robert Molnar, Peter Wong, Kourosh Baghelai, Howard L. Saylor, Ty Dunn, William Omlie, James R. Rooks, Timothy C. Hodges, Eddy Luh, Pankaj Bhatnagar, Benjamin Westbrook, Yvon R. Baribeau, George Blessios, Gary Tannenbaum, Jason Dew, Jason Burgess, Paul Orland, James D. Lawson, Todd Early, Randal Bast, Clinton Atkinson, Jeff Stanley, Virginia Wong, Damian Lebamoff, Jonathan Velasco, Boris Paul, Walter Rizzoni, Jon R. Henwood, Carlos Rosales, Ellen Dillavou, Eugene Simoni, Alexander Uribe, Michael Gallichio, Angelo Santos, Chad Laurich, Eric Gardner, Stephen Settle, Blair Jordan, Tuan-Hung Chu, Brad Grimsley, Stephen Hohmann, John C. Kedora, Hector Diaz-Luna, Allen Hartsell, Jeffrey Martinez, Gerardo Ortega, Boulos Toursarkissian, Todd Smith, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Thomas Ross, Matthew J. Borkon, W. Andrew Tierney, Thomas Hatsukami, Herbert Oye, Thomas Winek, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Sheppard Mondy, Alok K. Gupta and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. in 19-1952. Service: 02/25/2020 by email, US mail. [674007]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 02/25/2020 12:34 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 87 MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to the motion for other relief [ # 75 ] in 19-1952. Service: 02/24/2020 by clerk. [673567]--[Edited 02/24/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:07 AM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 86 FILED from Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 02/20/2020 by email, US mail. [673004] [19-1952] This brief has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 112 ] [David Todd] [Entered: 02/20/2020 08:58 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 85 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Heather LeBlanc, Damian Lebamoff, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. Number of Pages: 85. Service: 02/20/2020 by US mail, email. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [672987]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [David Todd] [Entered: 02/20/2020 05:57 PM]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER filed accepting for filing, Appellants' corrected brief and appendix, filed on January 2, 2020. The motions [ # 75 ] [ # 77 ] to file corrected response briefs are granted. Mr. Elkins and Merit Medical Systems and the Merit Physician Appellees must file their corrected response briefs within 14 days of the date of filing this order. Any corrected reply brief must be filed within 7 days of the date of the last-filed response brief. No extensions should be anticipated. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [672354] [LMS] [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:49 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 101 3 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 80 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679501] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 01:39 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 100 3 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 82 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679500] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 01:38 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 99 3 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 83 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679498] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 01:36 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 98 3 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 84 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679495] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 01:35 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 84 MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 02/18/2020 by clerk. [672695]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [MMA] [Entered: 02/20/2020 08:55 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 83 MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 02/18/2020 by clerk. [672692]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [MMA] [Entered: 02/20/2020 08:55 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 82 MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 02/18/2020 by clerk. [672691]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [MMA] [Entered: 02/20/2020 08:54 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 80 MODIFIED ENTRY: FILED from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 02/18/2020 by clerk. [671917]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by MMA] This brief has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 90 ] [JCP] [Entered: 02/18/2020 09:59 AM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 79 Reply in Further Support of Motion [75] for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Response to Appellants' Corrected Brief [72] Or, In the Alternative, to Strike Appellants' Corrected Brief [72] for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc.. Service: 02/11/2020 by email, US mail. [670432] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:46 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 78 MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan of opposition to motion [ # 75 ]. Service: 02/04/2020 by clerk. [668450]--[Edited 02/05/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 02/04/2020 07:18 PM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION of Appellee Louis Elkins to clarify Motion for Clarification or Alternative Request for Leave to File Corrected Response Brief to Appellants' Corrected Brief [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/31/2020 by email, US mail. [667685] [19-1952] [Patrick James] [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:36 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 94 3 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 76 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679374] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:29 AM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 76 MODIFIED ENTRY: FILED from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 01/30/2020 by clerk. [667369]--[Edited 01/31/2020 by MMA] This brief has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 91 ] [JCP] [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:48 PM]
January 17, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Response to Appellants' Corrected Brief, Or, In the Alternative, to strike Brief [ # 72 ] [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 01/17/2020 by email, US mail. [664068] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:57 AM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 97 3 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 74 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679493] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 01:32 PM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 74 MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 11. Service: 01/16/2020 by clerk. [664003]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [MMA] [Entered: 01/16/2020 06:36 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 96 3 paper copies of the Corrected Appendix [ # 73 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679395] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:52 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 95 3 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Brief [ # 72 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [679394] [CJF] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:51 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 73 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED APPENDIX FILED for Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 187. Service: 12/23/2019 by US mail. [661434]--[Edited 03/03/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] This appendix has been accepted. See Order [ # 81 ] [MMA] [Entered: 01/08/2020 10:26 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 72 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 12/23/2019 by US mail. [661433]--[Edited 03/03/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] This brief has been accepted. See Order [ # 81 ] [MMA] [Entered: 01/08/2020 10:25 AM]
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER The appellants must submit their corrected opening brief within 14 days of the date of filing of this order. Otherwise, their appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The appellees' motions [ # 60 ] [ # 61 ] are denied as moot. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [659751] [LMS] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:56 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 70 FILED from Appellee Siddarth Patel. Title: NOTICE OF JOINDER. Service: 12/23/2019 by email, US mail. [658706] [19-1952] This notice of joinder has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 88 ] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:03 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 69 MODIFIED ENTRY: APPENDIX FILED for Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Number of Pages: 107. Service: 12/23/2019 by US mail, email. [658695]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Brian Schmalzbach] [Entered: 12/23/2019 08:32 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 68 MODIFIED ENTRY: BRIEF FILED for Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Number of Pages: 21. Service: 12/23/2019 by US mail, email. [658693]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Brian Schmalzbach] [Entered: 12/23/2019 08:30 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 67 MODIFIED ENTRY: APPENDIX FILED (SUPPLEMENTAL) for Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Louis Elkins, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Heather LeBlanc, Damian Lebamoff, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Merit Medical Systems Inc. Number of Pages: 1158. Service: 12/23/2019 by email, US mail. [658690]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [David Todd] [Entered: 12/23/2019 07:20 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 66 FILED from Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc.. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/23/2019 by email, US mail. [658688] [19-1952] This brief has been corrected. See Doc. No. [ # 85 ] [David Todd] [Entered: 12/23/2019 07:13 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 65 MODIFIED ENTRY: BRIEF FILED for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Number of Pages: 25. Service: 12/23/2019 by US mail, email. [658682]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [David Roodman] [Entered: 12/23/2019 06:48 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 64 FILED from Appellees CryoLife Inc. and Hemosphere Inc. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/23/2019 by email, US mail. [658630] [19-1952] This brief is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 102 ] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:26 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 63 FILED from Appellee Louis Elkins. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/23/2019 by email, US mail. [658531] [19-1952] This brief and appendix has been corrected. See Docs. [ # 89 ] [ # 103 ] [Patrick James] [Entered: 12/23/2019 02:49 PM]
December 12, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to clarify [ # 56 ], to extend the time to 14 days after notice that Appellants have filed a compliant brief to file the Response Briefs for All Appellees and Cross-Appellant. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 12/12/2019 by email. [656299] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 12/12/2019 08:26 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION of Appellee Siddarth Patel to extend the time to 02/03/2020 to file the Responsive Brief. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 12/11/2019 by email, US mail. [655795] [19-1952]--[Edited 12/13/2019 by MJL to correct consent] [Alaina Lakawicz] [Entered: 12/11/2019 06:08 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan, Corrected Opening Brief with Appendix [ # 58 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant brief due on 12/26/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [655606] [MMA] [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:22 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 62 3 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Brief with Appendix [ # 58 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [657869] [CJF] [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:15 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 58 CORRECTED BRIEF FILED with APPENDIX for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 11/12/2019 by email, US mail. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [655602] This brief is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 59 ] [MMA] [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:18 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 57 Official caption revised. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [644458] [MMA] [Entered: 10/24/2019 01:50 PM]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting appellants' motions [ # 50 ] [ # 55 ] only to the extent that their compliant opening brief must be filed no later than 50 days from the date of filing of this order. The appellees' responsive briefs and cross-appellant's opening and response brief are due no later than 40 days after the appellants file their compliant brief. The motions are otherwise denied. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [637492] [LMS] [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:20 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 55 (Document construed as) MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to extend the time to 11/15/2019 to file the Opening Brief with Appendix. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 09/23/2019 by clerk. [637329] [MMA] [Entered: 09/23/2019 10:18 AM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. to the motion [ # 50 ] filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635874] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:52 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 53 Letter from Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong, Virginia Wong and Cross-Appellant Merit Medical Systems Inc. Additional New Circumstances Relevant to Pending Motion (Dkt. 41). Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635865] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:36 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 52 Official caption revised to reflect 19-2394 as the Cross-Appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [635327] [MMA] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:03 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 51 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1952 (Lead) with 19-2394 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [635317] [19-1952, 19-2394] [MMA] [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:56 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 50 (Document construed as) MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to extend the time to 11/15/2019 to file the Opening Brief with Appendix. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 09/12/2019 by clerk. [635075] [MMA] [Entered: 09/12/2019 12:45 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION of Appellee Siddarth Patel to extend the time to 11/15/2019 to file the Response Brief. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 09/09/2019 by email, US mail. [634175] [19-1952] [Alaina Lakawicz] [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:48 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 48 Notice from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan of 7th Circuit appeal status. Service: 09/09/2019 by clerk. [633905] [MMA] [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:22 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 47 Letter from Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Merit Medical Systems Inc., Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong and Virginia Wong Additional New Circumstances Relevant to Pending Motion. Service: 09/03/2019 by email. [632645] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:51 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 46 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to modify the official caption Docket No. [ # 44 ], ERROR: (1) Appellants' motion does not use the official caption for this appeal. (2) The motion is only signed by one of the appellants. CORRECTION: In future filings, the official caption must be used and each party filer must sign the document. The official caption can be found on the docket report. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [630270] [MMA] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:41 PM]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 44 ] filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [630253] [MMA] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:17 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 44 (Document construed as) MOTION of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to modify the official caption [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 08/20/2019 by email. [630244] [MMA] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:02 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 43 Entry of appearance for Sarah I. Rashid as of counsel for Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Service: 08/20/2019 by email, US mail. [629689] [19-1952] [Sarah Rashid] [Entered: 08/20/2019 05:17 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 42 Entry of appearance for Edwin E. Brooks as of counsel for Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Service: 08/20/2019 by email, US mail. [629687] [19-1952] [Edwin Brooks] [Entered: 08/20/2019 05:15 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION of Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, Randal Bast, Pankaj Bhatnagar, George Blessios, Matthew J. Borkon, Victor Bowers, Robert S. Brooks, Matthew G. Brown, Robert Brumberg, Jason Burgess, Jeffrey Cameron, James W. Campbell, Tuan-Hung Chu, Abilio Coello, Jason Dew, Hector Diaz-Luna, Ellen Dillavou, William Ducey, Ty Dunn, Amit Dwivedi, Todd Early, Luis G. Echeverri, Charles M. Eichler, Larry D. Flanagan, Lee Forestiere, Dennis Fry, Michael Gallichio, Eric Gardner, Joseph Griffin, Brad Grimsley, Alok K. Gupta, Allen Hartsell, Thomas Hatsukami, Jon R. Henwood, Timothy C. Hodges, Stephen Hohmann, Robert Hoyne, Stephen Jensik, Blair Jordan, Fernando Kafie, Howard E. Katzman, John C. Kedora, Edward Kim, Michael Klychakin, Eric Ladenheim, Anne Lally, Chad Laurich, James D. Lawson, Damian Lebamoff, Heather LeBlanc, David B. Leeser, Gary Lemmon, Eddy Luh, Jeffrey Martinez, Merit Medical Systems Inc., Jonathan R. Molnar, Robert Molnar, Sheppard Mondy, Edward Beverly Morrison, Raghu L. Motagnahalli, Mountain Medial Physician Specialists, Ruban Nirmalan, William Omlie, Paul Orland, Gerardo Ortega, Herbert Oye, Boris Paul, Jeffrey Pearce, Heidi A. Pearson, Joy Garg Kaiser Permanente, Thomas Reifsnyder, Walter Rizzoni, James R. Rooks, Carlos Rosales, Thomas Ross, Allan Roza, Ignacio Rua, Marius Saines, Albert Sam, Angelo Santos, Howard L. Saylor, Andres Schanzer, William Schroder, Stephen Settle, Murray L. Shames, Andrew Sherwood, Jeffrey Silver, Eugene Simoni, David Smith, Todd Smith, William Soper, Jeff Stanley, Gary Tannenbaum, Willaim J. Tapscott, Chase Tattersall, W. Andrew Tierney, Gustavo Torres, Boulos Toursarkissian, Stephen Wise Unger, Alexander Uribe, Julio Vasquez, Jonathan Velasco, Benjamin Westbrook, Michael Willerth, Thomas Winek, Christopher Wixon, Peter Wong and Virginia Wong to set briefing schedule, to extend the time to 10/07/2019 to file the Appellees' Response Briefs. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629410] [19-1952] [David Todd] [Entered: 08/19/2019 06:35 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan, Opening Brief with Appendix [ # 38 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant brief with appendix due on 08/21/2019. The deadline for any responsive filing runs from service of the corrected version. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [626716] --[Edited 09/13/2019 by CAB to revise docket text] [MMA] [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:02 PM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 3 paper copies of the Opening Brief [ # 38 ] received from Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. [627839] [CJF] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:29 AM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 38 BRIEF FILED for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Number of Pages: 80. Service: 08/07/2019 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [626705] This filing is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 39 ] [MMA] [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:51 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 37 Entry of appearance for Jason Meyer as of counsel for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 07/29/2019 by email, US mail. [624149] [19-1952] [Jason Meyer] [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:57 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 Entry of appearance for Alaina J. Lakawicz as of counsel for Appellee Siddarth Patel. Service: 07/12/2019 by email, US mail. [620565] [19-1952] [Alaina Lakawicz] [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:52 AM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to Doc No. [ # 29 ]. Service: 06/25/2019 by email. [617901] [MMA] [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:26 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan to Doc No. [ # 28 ]. Service: 06/25/2019 by email. [617899] [MMA] [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:25 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 33 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Service: 06/18/2019 by email. [615891] [MMA] [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:14 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Louis Elkins. Service: 06/19/2019 by email, US mail. [615506] [19-1952] [Patrick James] [Entered: 06/19/2019 12:18 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 31 Entry of appearance for Patrick R. James as principal counsel for Appellee Louis Elkins. Service: 06/19/2019 by email, US mail. [615505] [19-1952] [Patrick James] [Entered: 06/19/2019 12:16 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 28 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 29 ], ERROR: The entry of appearance and certificate of interest are incomplete. CORRECTION: As pro se parties, the certificate of interest is not required. The entry of appearance is required only to indicate a change of address. No corrected filing is required. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [615500] [MMA] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:42 AM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan Nazar Khan and Iftikhar Khan. Service: 06/19/2019 by clerk. [615498] [MMA] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:35 AM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 Entry of appearance for Nazar Khan and Iftikhar Khan as pro se for Appellants Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. Service: 06/19/2019 by clerk. [615497]--[Edited 06/19/2019 by MMA to correct date of service] [MMA] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:32 AM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Louis Elkins, Certificate of Interest; Entry of Appearance - P. James; Corrected Certificate of Service [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], [ # 26 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 06/26/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [615450] [MMA] [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:53 AM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellee Louis Elkins to Doc No. [ # 9 ]. Service: 06/18/1963 by email, US mail. [615300] [19-1952] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 27 ] [Patrick James] [Entered: 06/18/2019 06:16 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/18/2019 by email. [615227] [19-1952] [David Roodman] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:19 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/18/2019 by email. [615222] [19-1952] [David Roodman] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:17 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 Corrected Entry of appearance for David A. Roodman as principal counsel for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/18/2019 by email, US mail. [615220] [19-1952] [David Roodman] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:13 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Siddarth Patel. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614878] [19-1952] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 06/17/2019 05:36 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellee Siddarth Patel to Doc No. [ # 18 ], Doc No. [ # 17 ]. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614874] [19-1952] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 06/17/2019 05:26 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 Docketing Statement for CryoLife, Inc. and Hemosphere, Inc. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614868] [19-1952]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by MMA to reflect the correct party filers] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 06/17/2019 05:01 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, et al. Service: 06/17/2019 by email. [614781] [19-1952]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by MMA to revise docket text] [David Todd] [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:30 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Siddarth Patel. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614765] [19-1952] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:18 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Jennifer M. Kurcz as principal counsel for Appellee Siddarth Patel. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614762] [19-1952] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:15 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Service: 06/17/2019 by email. [614741] [19-1952] [Brian Schmalzbach] [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:00 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Service: 06/17/2019 by email. [614739] [19-1952] [Brian Schmalzbach] [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:58 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Brian D. Schmalzbach as principal counsel for Appellees Javier Alvarez-Tostado and Mark Grove. Service: 06/17/2019 by email. [614736] [19-1952] [Brian Schmalzbach] [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:56 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614694] [19-1952] [David Roodman] [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:51 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interest for CryoLife, Inc. and Hemosphere, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614689] [19-1952] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:43 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Steven McMahon Zeller as principal counsel for CryoLife, Inc. and Hemosphere, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614686] [19-1952] [Steven Zeller] [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:40 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Barbara A. Smith as of counsel for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, clerk. [614663] [19-1952] [Barbara Smith] [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:01 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Patrick R. James as principal counsel for Appellee Louis Elkins. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614627] [19-1952] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 27 ] [Patrick James] [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:45 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Louis Elkins. Service: 06/17/2019 by email, US mail. [614625] [19-1952] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 27 ] [Patrick James] [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:43 AM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/14/2019 by email, US mail. [614358] [19-1952] [David Roodman] [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:02 PM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for David A. Roodman as principal counsel for Appellees Patrick Geraghty and Luis Sanchez. Service: 06/14/2019 by email, US mail. [614350] [19-1952] [David Roodman] [Entered: 06/14/2019 02:52 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, et al. Service: 06/13/2019 by email. [614054] [19-1952]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by MMA to revise docket text] [David Todd] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:45 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for David R. Todd as of counsel for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, et al. Service: 06/13/2019 by email. [614046] [19-1952]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by MMA to revise docket text] [David Todd] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:29 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Thomas R. Vuksinick as of counsel for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, et al. Service: 06/13/2019 by email. [614042] [19-1952]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by MMA to revise the docket text] [David Todd] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:21 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Brent P. Lorimer as principal counsel for Appellees Clinton Atkinson, Kourosh Baghelai, Yvon R. Baribeau, et al. Service: 06/13/2019 by email. [614012] [19-1952]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by MMA to revise docket text] [David Todd] [Entered: 06/13/2019 03:39 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/29/2019. [611022] Entry of Appearance due 06/17/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/17/2019. Appellants' Informal brief is due 06/24/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Khan v. Hemosphere Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. NOEL PARENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARL SCHUMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAUTILYA MEHTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY SCHANZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT STEFFEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL DOERHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANTEL HILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID RYNBRANDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN THOMAS MEHIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJAY KALRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLACE GOSNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERSTATE BUSINESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL K. CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRENCE FITZGIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKSHMIKUMAR PILLAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. ANDRES GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN YAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CASTANEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE CHAUVAPUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA TEODORESCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN B. SELF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM B. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES PIGOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN GRABER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID P. LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LON BITZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKS WHITNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP CACIOPPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACOBO NURKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT C. DAVIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH COATTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD GENSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY DOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SEIWERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DICKERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERARD CRECCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMITRI GELFAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL STARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMON VAZQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY H. LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KORENMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOFTON MISIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC ECKHAUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMRAN MOHIUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT E. OLSSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASESH SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTTAM TRIPATHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCELLO BORZATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON BEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GAYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMAD ABU-GHAIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW LEAVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOBY J. DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALEK HANANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIT FUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY FIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MCLAFFERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER MARROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEFAN MOLDOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC K. PEDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEMOSPHERE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMAL F. KASSIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE OBERHOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SOWDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMESH PALADUGU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. CULLEN RICHARDSON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MATSUURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON SCHELLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL INGEGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMIR KREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. ROSS, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON BURTCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLYDE R. REDMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS L. BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT ALBRECHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BART MUHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MAGNESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL G. CARABELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YEVGENIY RITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON M. WESLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIE GOODEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. KEVIN CROSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN NOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES MOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD RIGDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDDIE L. MCRAE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUAD RAMMADAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMRAN ABUL KHOUDOUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAGAN QUAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON W. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTPAL DESAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE LETSOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN FOOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS WEHMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE U. ZAMORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICARDO AGUIRRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGEMAR DAVIDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER SHINNERL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD PAVILLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NARENDRA MYNENI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SCHOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL MALTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS ABBRUZZESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANS A. BRINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID AXELROD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ADENIYI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITO A. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM B. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANI SHENNIB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LLJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM DESCHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT FELDTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DEMASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER GRAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL D. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYAL BEN-ARIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT POWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ROSENBLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT G. WESTFALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES WYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES H. MORGAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY LANCELLOTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JON COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIPINCHANDRA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVO TZVETANOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT JUBELIRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDT FEUERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABLO UCEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER MOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY D. PUNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE BRENNAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WHITLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC D. WELLONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJEEV RAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD L. JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATSUO KAWAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD B. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APHRODITE HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL PERKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY WHITEHURST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL NATHANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LUCAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURICE SOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ILJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUMARA RAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL DURHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT STEPPACHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN SANOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ZARGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MOTEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN O'GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMAYOUN HASHEMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT KUJATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND WORKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH CARUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY SCHUBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTIAGO CHAHWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCKINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN WEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID LORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK E. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPITALS AND DOCTORS IMPLANTING UNPATENTED HERO GRAFT TO DOCTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H. SCHULMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS ERICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHMMED MARGNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRENE GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFFREY RISLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND MAKHOUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. CODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK RANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY D. FLANAGAN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN R. MOLNAR
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHEPPARD MONDY
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YVON R. BARIBEAU
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUAN-HUNG CHU
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEATHER LEBLANC
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL KLYCHAKIN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIUS SAINES
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER WONG
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD SMITH
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIDDARTH PATEL
Represented By: Jennifer Kurcz
Represented By: Alaina J. Lakawicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN C. KEDORA
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IGNACIO RUA
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MURRAY L. SHAMES
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERARDO ORTEGA
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BORIS PAUL
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FERNANDO KAFIE
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN JENSIK
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDAL BAST
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EUGENE SIMONI
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL WILLERTH
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLEN HARTSELL
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA WONG
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLOS ROSALES
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT S. BROOKS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM OMLIE
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH GRIFFIN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY SILVER
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON R. HENWOOD
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALTER RIZZONI
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES M. EICHLER
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABILIO COELLO
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT HOYNE
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERBERT OYE
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM SOPER
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SMITH
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY LEMMON
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY C. HODGES
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD GRIMSLEY
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TY DUNN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KOUROSH BAGHELAI
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELO SANTOS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDDY LUH
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC LADENHEIM
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON DEW
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. ANDREW TIERNEY
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON BURGESS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES D. LAWSON
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEIDI A. PEARSON
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOUNTAIN MEDIAL PHYSICIAN SPECIALISTS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HECTOR DIAZ-LUNA
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK GERAGHTY
Represented By: David Alan Roodman
Represented By: Jason Meyer
Represented By: Barbara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK GROVE
Represented By: Edwin Earl Brooks
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Campbell
Represented By: Sarah Rashid
Represented By: Edwin E. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOY GARG KAISER PERMANENTE
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN DILLAVOU
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW J. BORKON
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANNE LALLY
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLAIR JORDAN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN VELASCO
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAVIER ALVAREZ-TOSTADO
Represented By: Edwin Earl Brooks
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Campbell
Represented By: Sarah Rashid
Represented By: Edwin E. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY MARTINEZ
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL GALLICHIO
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOUIS ELKINS
Represented By: John Patrick Passarelli Esq.
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS SANCHEZ
Represented By: David Alan Roodman
Represented By: Jason Meyer
Represented By: Barbara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANKAJ BHATNAGAR
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS ROSS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER WIXON
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM DUCEY
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VICTOR BOWERS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAD LAURICH
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLAN ROZA
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIO VASQUEZ
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS G. ECHEVERRI
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE BLESSIOS
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD E. KATZMAN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMIT DWIVEDI
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD EARLY
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN WISE UNGER
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHASE TATTERSALL
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL ORLAND
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT MOLNAR
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOULOS TOURSARKISSIAN
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUSTAVO TORRES
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE FORESTIERE
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Thomas R. Vuksinick
Represented By: David R. Todd