Braemar Manufacturing, LLC v. The Scottcare Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: THE SCOTTCARE CORPORATION and AMBUCOR HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARDIONET, LLC and BRAEMAR MANUFACTURING, LLC
Case Number: 19-2263
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 1, 2020 BRAEMAR MANUFACTURING, LLC v. THE SCOTTCARE CORPORATION

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY of Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC to response [ # 19 ]. Service: 10/09/2019 by email. [641384] [19-2263] [Ching-Lee Fukuda] [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:26 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE of Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc. to the motion [ # 18 ] filed by Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 10/08/2019 by email. [641153] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:34 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION of Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC to extend the time to 12/10/2019 to file the OPENING BRIEF. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 10/02/2019 by email. [639827] [19-2263] [Ching-Lee Fukuda] [Entered: 10/02/2019 05:48 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 Filing fee paid in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on 08/27/2019. [632928] [TAM] [Entered: 09/04/2019 08:24 AM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 Notice to counsel for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC: The record of this case indicates that the filing fee has not been paid. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [631164]} [TAM] [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:27 AM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2019 by email. [631118] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:35 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2019 by email. [631117] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:33 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Meghan A. Farley as of counsel for Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2019 by email. [631115] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:31 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Andrew S. Gallinaro as of counsel for Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2019 by email. [631112] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:28 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Kevin Dooley Kent as of counsel for Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2019 by email. [631109] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:16 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for John Guernsey as principal counsel for Appellees Scottcare Corporation and Ambucor Health Solutions, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2019 by email. [631107] [19-2263] [John Guernsey] [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:14 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Notice of Appeal for Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/20/2019 by email. [630493] [TAM] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:16 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630453] [19-2263] [Ching-Lee Fukuda] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:17 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630452] [19-2263] [Ching-Lee Fukuda] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:16 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Ryan C. Morris as of counsel for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630451] [19-2263] [Ryan Morris] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:09 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Nathan A. Greenblatt as of counsel for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630450] [19-2263] [Nathan Greenblatt] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:06 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Bradford J. Badke as of counsel for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630449] [19-2263] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:03 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Todd M. Simpson as of counsel for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630447] [19-2263] [Todd Simpson] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:01 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Ching-Lee Fukuda as principal counsel for Appellants Braemar Manufacturing, LLC and Cardionet, LLC. Service: 08/22/2019 by email. [630446] [19-2263] [Ching-Lee Fukuda] [Entered: 08/22/2019 06:58 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/08/2019. [627531] Fee/IFP due on 08/26/2019. Entry of Appearance due 08/26/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/26/2019. Docketing Statement due 08/26/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 10/11/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:40 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braemar Manufacturing, LLC v. The Scottcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE SCOTTCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: John A. Guernsey
Represented By: John Guernsey
Represented By: Andrew S. Gallinaro
Represented By: Kevin Dooley Kent
Represented By: Meghan A. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMBUCOR HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: John A. Guernsey
Represented By: John Guernsey
Represented By: Andrew S. Gallinaro
Represented By: Kevin Dooley Kent
Represented By: Meghan A. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARDIONET, LLC
Represented By: Ching-Lee Fukuda
Represented By: Todd Matthew Simpson
Represented By: Nathan A. Greenblatt Esq.
Represented By: Ryan C. Morris
Represented By: Bradford J. Badke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRAEMAR MANUFACTURING, LLC
Represented By: Ching-Lee Fukuda
Represented By: Todd Matthew Simpson
Represented By: Nathan A. Greenblatt Esq.
Represented By: Ryan C. Morris
Represented By: Bradford J. Badke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?