Liqwd, Inc. v. L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, L.L.C., L'OREAL USA, INC. and L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: OLAPLEX LLC and LIQWD, INC.
Case Number: 19-2280
Filed: August 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Daniel Zeilberger as of counsel for Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629243] [19-2280] [Daniel Zeilberger] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:25 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Igor V. Timofeyev as of counsel for Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629241] [19-2280] [Igor Timofeyev] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:23 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Joseph E. Palys as of counsel for Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629234] [19-2280] [Joseph Palys] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:18 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Stephen B. Kinnaird as of counsel for Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629232] [19-2280] [Stephen Kinnaird] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:15 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Naveen Modi as principal counsel for Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629228] [19-2280] [Naveen Modi] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:10 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Joseph M. Paunovich as of counsel for Appellees Liqwd, Inc. and Olaplex LLC. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629218] [19-2280] [Joseph Paunovich] [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:38 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Stephanie N. Solomon as of counsel for Appellees Liqwd, Inc. and Olaplex LLC. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629186] [19-2280] [Stephanie Solomon] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:03 AM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Sanford I. Weisburst as principal counsel for Appellees Liqwd, Inc. and Olaplex LLC. Service: 08/19/2019 by email. [629180] [19-2280] [Sanford Weisburst] [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:42 AM]
August 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Liqwd, Inc. and Olaplex LLC. Service: 08/18/2019 by email. [629129] [19-2280] [Sanford Weisburst] [Entered: 08/18/2019 12:08 PM]
August 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION of Appellees Liqwd, Inc. and Olaplex LLC for leave to file a response/reply to [ # 4 ] reply [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 08/17/2019 by email. [629126] [19-2280] [Sanford Weisburst] [Entered: 08/17/2019 03:49 PM]
August 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPLY of Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C. to response [ # 3 ]. Service: 08/17/2019 by email. [629125] [19-2280] --[Edited 08/17/2019 by CAB to correct party filers] [Naveen Modi] [Entered: 08/17/2019 01:33 PM]
August 17, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE of Appellees Liqwd, Inc. and Olaplex LLC to the motion for interim stay [ # 2 ] filed by Appellants L'Oreal USA, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C. in 19-2280. Service: 08/17/2019 by email. [629121] [CAB] [Entered: 08/17/2019 08:40 AM]
August 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION of Appellants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C. for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8/18 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 08/16/2019 by email, hand delivery. [629120] [CAB] [Entered: 08/17/2019 08:36 AM]
August 17, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. [629119] Fee/IFP due on 09/03/2019. Entry of Appearance due 09/03/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/03/2019. Docketing Statement due 09/03/2019. [CAB] [Entered: 08/17/2019 08:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liqwd, Inc. v. L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: L'OREAL USA S/D, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Zeilberger
Represented By: Stephen Blake Kinnaird
Represented By: Igor Victor Timofeyev
Represented By: Joseph Palys
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel Zeilberger
Represented By: Stephen Blake Kinnaird
Represented By: Igor Victor Timofeyev
Represented By: Joseph Palys
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: L'OREAL USA, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Zeilberger
Represented By: Stephen Blake Kinnaird
Represented By: Igor Victor Timofeyev
Represented By: Joseph Palys
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Zeilberger
Represented By: Stephen Blake Kinnaird
Represented By: Igor Victor Timofeyev
Represented By: Joseph Palys
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OLAPLEX LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Solomon
Represented By: Sanford Ian Weisburst
Represented By: Joseph M. Paunovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LIQWD, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Solomon
Represented By: Sanford Ian Weisburst
Represented By: Joseph M. Paunovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?