Ibrahim v. US
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMEEL IBRAHIM
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-2300
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 7, 2020 IBRAHIM v. US

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice from Appellant Jameel Ibrahim entitled 'Judicial Notice' (Constitution attached). Service: 10/09/2019 by clerk. [641315] [SJ] [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:49 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION of Appellant Jameel Ibrahim for summary judgment [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 10/09/2019 by clerk. [641312] [SJ] [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:45 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 4 paper copies of the Informal Opening Response Brief with Appendix [ # 9 ] received from Appellee US. [637416] [CJF] [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:38 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Outstanding paper copies of all briefs and appendices must be submitted within five business days from the date of issuance of this notice. See Fed. Cir. R. 25(c)(1). [637290] [SJ] [Entered: 09/23/2019 09:19 AM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MODIFIED ENTRY: INFORMAL BRIEF FILED with APPENDIX for Appellee US. Number of Pages: 23. Service: 09/16/2019 by email, US mail. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [635856] --[compliance review complete - Edited 09/23/2019 by SJ] [Erin Murdock-Park] [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:58 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 3 paper copies of the Informal Opening Brief [ # 8 ] received from Appellant Jameel Ibrahim. [637665] [CJF] [Entered: 09/24/2019 09:26 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 MODIFIED ENTRY: INFORMAL BRIEF FILED for Appellant Jameel Ibrahim. Number of Pages: 2. Service: 08/26/2019 by US mail. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [634360] --[compliance review complete - Edited 09/10/2019 by SJ] [SJ] [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:13 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Jameel Ibrahim as pro se Appellant. Service: 09/10/2019 by clerk. [634357] [SJ] [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:11 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Erin Murdock-Park as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 09/03/2019 by email, US mail. [632896] [19-2300] [Erin Murdock-Park] [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:43 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Jameel Ibrahim, Entry of Appearance, Informal Opening Brief, & Notice [ # 4 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 2 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 09/12/2019. Informal opening brief is due 09/16/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [631835] [SJ] [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:30 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice from Appellant Jameel Ibrahim regarding district court case in New Jersey. Service: 08/29/2019 by clerk. [631828] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [SJ] [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:16 AM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 FILED from Appellant Jameel Ibrahim. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/29/2019 by clerk. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [631823] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [SJ] [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:14 AM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Jameel Ibrahim as pro se Appellant. Service: 08/29/2019 by clerk. [631821] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [SJ] [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:11 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/20/2019. [630288] Entry of Appearance due 09/05/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 09/16/2019. [SJ] [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibrahim v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMEEL IBRAHIM
Represented By: Jameel Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Robert Edward Kirschman Jr.
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Deborah Ann Bynum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?