Oracle America, Inc. v. US
Defendant: AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-2326
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to extend the time to 11/04/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. Counsel for Oracle seeks to extend the 10/28/19 deadline to allow for consultation with other counsel regarding protected material consistent with the Practice Note for Fed. Cir. Rule 26.. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/25/2019 by email. [644731] [19-2326] [Craig Holman] [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:46 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to extend the time to 11/04/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. Counsel for Oracle seeks to extend the 10/28/19 deadline to allow for consultation with other counsel regarding protected material consistent with the Practice Note for Fed. Cir. Rule 26.. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/25/2019 by email. [644660] [19-2326] [Craig Holman] [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:42 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellee Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639037] [19-2326] [Daniel Forman] [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:30 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Amazon Web Services, Inc., Docketing Statement [ # 17 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 10/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [639019] [JAL] [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:37 AM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Amazon Web Services, Inc. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638948] [19-2326] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 18 ] [Daniel Forman] [Entered: 09/27/2019 07:06 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/26/2019 by email. [638478] [19-2326] [Craig Holman] [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:20 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 09/25/2019 by email. [638181] [19-2326] [William Rayel] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:40 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Oracle America, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/25/2019 by email. [638094] [19-2326] [Craig Holman] [Entered: 09/25/2019 11:59 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Zachary H. Schroeder as of counsel for Appellee Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2019 by email. [634799] [19-2326] [Zachary Schroeder] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:08 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Robert J. Sneckenberg as of counsel for Appellee Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2019 by email. [634790] [19-2326] [Robert Sneckenberg] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:02 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Official caption revised to reflect appearance filed on behalf of appellee Amazon Web Services. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [634130] [SJ] [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:33 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interest for Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2019 by email. [634002] [19-2326] [Daniel Forman] [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:39 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Daniel R. Forman as principal counsel for Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2019 by email. [633998] [19-2326] [Daniel Forman] [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:37 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Nathaniel E. Castellano as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633112] [19-2326] [Nathaniel Castellano] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:45 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Amanda J. Sherwood as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633104] [19-2326] [Amanda Sherwood] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:23 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Dana E. Koffman as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633102] [19-2326] [Dana Koffman] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:08 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Kara L. Daniels as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633099] [19-2326] [Kara Daniels] [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:58 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633096] [19-2326] [Craig Holman] [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:52 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Craig A. Holman as principal counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633095] [19-2326] [Craig Holman] [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:49 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for William P. Rayel as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 08/28/2019 by email. [631754] [19-2326] [William Rayel] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:23 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/27/2019. [631746] Entry of Appearance due 09/11/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/11/2019. Docketing Statement due 09/27/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 10/28/2019. [SJ] [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle America, Inc. v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Craig Holman
Represented By: Amanda J. Sherwood
Represented By: Kara L. Daniels
Represented By: Dana Koffman
Represented By: Nathaniel Edward Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: William Porter Rayel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?