Valeant Pharmaceuticals v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals
Defendant / Appellee: MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. and MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD., KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC and DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC.
Case Number: 19-2402
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellants' opening brief [ # 22 ] filed by Appellants Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc. The opening brief is due 12/16/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [648829] [TAM] [Entered: 11/13/2019 09:04 AM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION of Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC to extend the time to 12/16/2019 to file the November 15, 2019. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/08/2019 by email. [648303] [19-2402] [Thomas Steindler] [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:51 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 10/04/2019 by email. [640300] [19-2402] [Charles Chevalier] [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:23 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 Entry of appearance for Charles H.Chevalier as of counsel for Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Service: 10/04/2019 by email. [640297] [19-2402] [Charles Chevalier] [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:18 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639210] [19-2402] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:07 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639209] [19-2402] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:06 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Adam Burrowbridge as of counsel for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639207] [19-2402] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:03 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for Kristina M. Hanson as of counsel for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639206] [19-2402] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:02 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Wendy L. Devine as of counsel for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639205] [19-2402] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:01 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Tung-On Kong as principal counsel for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639204] [19-2402] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:59 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Entry of Appearance as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [638848] [JAL] [Entered: 09/27/2019 03:36 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638814] [19-2402] [John Livingstone] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:45 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Samhitha Medatia as of counsel for Appellant Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638813] [19-2402] [John Livingstone] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:44 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for John D. Livingstone as principal counsel for Appellant Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638811] [19-2402] [John Livingstone] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:43 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Christopher M. Bruno as of counsel for Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638725] [19-2402] [Christopher Bruno] [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:23 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Ian B. Brooks as of counsel for Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638715] [19-2402] [Ian Brooks] [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:06 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638713] [19-2402] [Thomas Steindler] [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:03 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638711] [19-2402] [Thomas Steindler] [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:01 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Thomas P. Steindler as principal counsel for Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Service: 09/27/2019 by email. [638709] [19-2402] [Thomas Steindler] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:59 AM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd., and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Transcript Purchase Order Forms [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 10/02/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [638003] [JAL] [Entered: 09/25/2019 09:54 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/24/2019 by email. [637913] [19-2402] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 4 ] [Charles Chevalier] [Entered: 09/24/2019 05:52 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Dow Pharmaceutical Sciences, Inc., Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Valeant Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. and Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/24/2019 by email. [637910] [19-2402] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 4 ] [Jonathon Lower] [Entered: 09/24/2019 05:39 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/11/2019. [635786] Entry of Appearance due 09/30/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2019. Docketing Statement due 09/30/2019. Appellants' brief is due 11/15/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valeant Pharmaceuticals v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: Adam William Burrowbridge
Represented By: Tung On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: Adam William Burrowbridge
Represented By: Tung On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: Adam William Burrowbridge
Represented By: Tung On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD.
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Thomas P. Steindler
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bruno Esq.
Represented By: Ian Barnett Brooks
Represented By: Charles H. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Samhitha Medatia Esq.
Represented By: John D. Livingstone
Represented By: Charles H. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Thomas P. Steindler
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bruno Esq.
Represented By: Ian Barnett Brooks
Represented By: Charles H. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Thomas P. Steindler
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bruno Esq.
Represented By: Ian Barnett Brooks
Represented By: Charles H. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?