Finjan, Inc. v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: FINJAN, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: JUNIPER NETWORKS, INC.
Case Number: 19-2405
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellant's opening brief and Appellee's response brief [ # 16 ] filed by Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc. and Appellant Finjan, Inc. The opening brief is due 12/18/2019. The response brief is due 02/26/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [646355] [TAM] [Entered: 11/01/2019 12:06 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION of Appellant Finjan, Inc. and Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc. to extend the time to 12/18/2019 to file the Deadlines for Finjan to File Opening Brief and Juniper to File Response Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645655] [19-2405] [Robert Courtney] [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:59 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Joshua Glucoft as of counsel for Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645590] [19-2405] [Jonathan Kagan] [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:50 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Finjan, Inc. and Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc., Motion [ # 13 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 11/05/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [645399] [TAM] [Entered: 10/29/2019 10:18 AM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION of Finjan, Inc. and Juniper Networks, Inc. to extend the time to 12/18/2019 to file the Opening Brief and 2/26/2020 to file the Response Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/21/2019 by email. [643395] [19-2405]--[Edited 10/25/2019 by MJL to correct docket text] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 14 ] [Robert Courtney] [Entered: 10/21/2019 12:28 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Finjan, Inc.. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639500] [19-2405] [Oliver Richards] [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:57 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639494] [19-2405] [Jonathan Kagan] [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:13 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639493] [19-2405] [Jonathan Kagan] [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:11 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Rebecca Carson as of counsel for Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639492] [19-2405]--[Edited 10/02/2019 by CAB to add party filer] [Jonathan Kagan] [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:10 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Jonathan S. Kagan as principal counsel for Appellee Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639491] [19-2405] [Jonathan Kagan] [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:08 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Note to file: 19-2405 (COMP COMPANION started 09/25/2019) with 19-1837. These cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel for oral argument. [638201] [19-1837, 19-2405] [MMA] [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:14 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Francis J. Albert as of counsel for Appellant Finjan, Inc.. Service: 09/20/2019 by email. [637212] [19-2405] [Francis Albert] [Entered: 09/20/2019 05:05 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Robert Courtney as of counsel for Appellant Finjan, Inc.. Service: 09/20/2019 by email. [637177] [19-2405] [Robert Courtney] [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:31 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Juanita R. Brooks as principal counsel for Appellant Finjan, Inc.. Service: 09/20/2019 by email. [637119] [19-2405] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:16 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Finjan, Inc.. Service: 09/20/2019 by email. [637110] [19-2405] [Oliver Richards] [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:09 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Oliver J. Richards as of counsel for Appellant Finjan, Inc.. Service: 09/20/2019 by email. [637109] [19-2405] [Oliver Richards] [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:08 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/11/2019. [636105] Entry of Appearance due 10/01/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/01/2019. Docketing Statement due 10/01/2019. Appellant's brief is due 11/18/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FINJAN, INC.
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: Robert P. Courtney
Represented By: Juanita Rose Brooks
Represented By: Francis J. Albert
Represented By: Oliver Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUNIPER NETWORKS, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Glucoft
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Kagan
Represented By: Rebecca Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?