Izzo Golf Inc. v. King Par Golf Incorporated
Plaintiff / Appellee: IZZO GOLF INC., fka Dancorp Investors, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: KING PAR GOLF INCORPORATED, dba Knight Golf Company and WILLIAM J. BAIRD
Case Number: 19-2416
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION of Cross-Appellant Izzo Golf Inc. Relief: a) dismissal of the appeal by Appellant King Par, and b) limitation of Appellant William Baird to the issue of denial of his motion to intervene. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 11/15/2019 by email. [649657] [19-2416] [Neal Slifkin] [Entered: 11/15/2019 12:53 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Official caption revised to reflect cross-appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [640578] [TAM] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:14 AM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-2416 (Lead) with 20-1016 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [640576] [19-2416, 20-1016] [TAM] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:14 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Entry of appearance for Corey David Grandmaison as principal counsel for Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated. Service: 10/04/2019 by email. [640445] [19-2416] [Corey Grandmaison] [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:50 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated. Service: 10/04/2019 by email. [640444] [19-2416] [Corey Grandmaison] [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:46 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated. Service: 10/04/2019 by email. [640443] [19-2416] [Corey Grandmaison] [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:43 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated, Entry of Appearance for Corey David Grandmaison, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], [ # 10 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 10/11/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [640181] [TAM] [Entered: 10/04/2019 08:58 AM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640110] [19-2416] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 11 ] [Corey Grandmaison] [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:38 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interest for Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640109] [19-2416] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 11 ] [Corey Grandmaison] [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:35 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Corey David Grandmaison as principal counsel for Appellants William J. Baird and King Par Golf Incorporated. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640107] [19-2416] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 11 ] [Corey Grandmaison] [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:32 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Izzo Golf Inc.. Service: 10/02/2019 by email. [639680] [19-2416] [Neal Slifkin] [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:30 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Izzo Golf Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 10/08/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [639261] [JAL] [Entered: 10/01/2019 08:41 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Izzo Golf Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639152] [19-2416] [Neal Slifkin] [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:52 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Izzo Golf Inc. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639149] [19-2416] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [Neal Slifkin] [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:51 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Neal L. Slifkin as principal counsel for Appellee Izzo Golf Inc.. Service: 09/30/2019 by email. [639146] [19-2416] [Neal Slifkin] [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:49 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice from United States District Court for the Western District of New York regard the Corrected Notice of Appeal. [638289] [MMA] [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:54 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/17/2019. [636779] Entry of Appearance due 10/03/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/03/2019. Docketing Statement due 10/03/2019. Appellant's brief is due 11/18/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Izzo Golf Inc. v. King Par Golf Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IZZO GOLF INC., fka Dancorp Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KING PAR GOLF INCORPORATED, dba Knight Golf Company
Represented By: Corey D. Grandmaison
Represented By: Corey David Grandmaison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM J. BAIRD
Represented By: Corey D. Grandmaison
Represented By: Corey David Grandmaison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?