Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC v. US
Defendant / Appellee: NEXTGEN FEDERAL SYSTEMS, LLC and UNITED STATES
Plaintiff / Appellant: RED CEDAR HARMONIA, LLC
Case Number: 19-2449
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Appellant's motion to extend time to file brief [ # 16 ], ERROR: (1) The caption provided on the document does not follow the official caption provided by the Clerk. (2) The filing does not include a certificate of compliance with the word/line count. CORRECTION: Future motions should have (1) the official caption provided by the Clerk, Fed. Cir. R. 27(a)(2), and (2) a certificate of compliance regarding the word count, Fed. R. App. P. 32(g)(1). THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [650263] [CAB] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:46 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 16 ] filed by Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC. The opening brief is due 12/10/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [650200] [CAB] [Entered: 11/18/2019 02:55 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION of Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC to extend the time to 12/10/2019 to file the Appellant's Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/12/2019 by email. [648759] [19-2449] [Walter English] [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:49 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 Docketing Statement for the Appellee NextGen Federal Systems, LLC. Service: 10/28/2019 by email. [645308] [19-2449] [Che Dungan] [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:08 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 10/28/2019 by email. [645304] [19-2449] [Sonia Murphy] [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:58 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC. Service: 10/28/2019 by email. [645255] [19-2449] [Walter English] [Entered: 10/28/2019 04:11 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [Clerk's Note: The contact information on Attorney Alfred M. Wurglitz's EOA [ # 8 ] does not match the information currently associated with Mr. Wurglitz' user account.] [642784] [CAB] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:21 AM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for Appellee NextGen Federal Systems, LLC. Service: 10/10/2019 by email. [641706] [19-2449] [Christopher Denny] [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:34 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC. Service: 10/10/2019 by email. [641673] [19-2449] --[Edited 11/18/2019 by CAB to add party filer] [Walter English] [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:59 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Christopher S. Denny as of counsel for Appellee NextGen Federal Systems, LLC. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640153] [19-2449] [Che Dungan] [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:47 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Alfred M. Wurglitz as of counsel for Appellee NextGen Federal Systems, LLC. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640152] [19-2449] [Che Dungan] [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:45 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for C. Peter Dungan as principal counsel for Appellee NextGen Federal Systems, LLC. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640151] [19-2449] [Che Dungan] [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:41 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 3 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 4 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 5 ], ERROR: The certificates of service attached to the entries of appearance for Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC contained improperly formatted electronic signatures. Specifically, the prefix "s/" should be "/s/". CORRECTION: For future filings, please follow the electronic signature format as written in FCR 25(d). THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [639969] [JAL] [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:59 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Michael W. Rich as of counsel for Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC. Service: 10/02/2019 by email. [639765] [19-2449] [Walter English] [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:04 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Emily J. Chancey as of counsel for Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC. Service: 10/02/2019 by email. [639762] [19-2449] [Walter English] [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:03 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for W. Brad English as principal counsel for Appellant Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC. Service: 10/02/2019 by email. [639760] [19-2449] [Walter English] [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:02 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Sonia W. Murphy as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639362] [19-2449] [Sonia Murphy] [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:36 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/23/2019. [638750] Entry of Appearance due 10/11/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/11/2019. Docketing Statement due 10/28/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/26/2019. [SJ] [Entered: 09/27/2019 01:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Cedar Harmonia, LLC v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEXTGEN FEDERAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Che Peter Dungan
Represented By: Christopher Denny
Represented By: Alfred M. Wurglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Sonia W. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RED CEDAR HARMONIA, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Rich Esq.
Represented By: Emily J. Chancey
Represented By: Walter Brad English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?