Olaf Soot Design, LLC v. Daktronics, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: DAKTRONICS, INC. and DAKTRONICS HOIST, INC.
Not Yet Classified: OLAF SOOT DESIGN, LLC
Case Number: 20-1009
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 Entry of appearance for Domingo M. LLagostera as of counsel for Appellant Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 11/18/2019 by email. [650331] [20-1009] [Domingo Llagostera] [Entered: 11/18/2019 05:14 PM]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 16 ] filed by Daktronics, Inc. Daktronics Hoist, Inc. is dismissed from these appeals. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. The parties shall bear their own costs. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [648098] [20-1009, 20-1034] [LMS] [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:46 AM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2019 by email. [645298] [20-1009] [Russell Wong] [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:26 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2019 by email. [645296] [20-1009] [Russell Wong] [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:21 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION of Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc. to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/28/2019 by email. [645292] [20-1009] [Russell Wong] [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:10 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc., Certificate of Interest and Docketing Statement [ # 13 ], [ # 14 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 10/28/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [643500] [TAM] [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:20 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643250] [20-1009] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 15 ] [Kenneth Bressler] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:31 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643249] [20-1009] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 15 ] [Kenneth Bressler] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:29 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Service: 10/18/2019 by clerk. [643235] [20-1009] [James Bollinger] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:09 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Service: 10/18/2019 by clerk. [643228] [20-1009] [James Bollinger] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:05 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Kenneth L. Bressler as principal counsel for Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 10/16/2019 by email. [642690] [20-1009] [Kenneth Bressler] [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:23 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Phoenix S. Pak as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Service: 10/16/2019 by clerk. [642597] [20-1009] [Phoenix Pak] [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:48 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Gerald E. Porter as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Service: 10/15/2019 by clerk. [642409] [20-1009] [Gerald Porter] [Entered: 10/15/2019 04:21 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Katherine Harihar as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Service: 10/15/2019 by clerk. [642381] [20-1009] [Katherine Harihar] [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:46 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for James M. Bollinger as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Service: 10/15/2019 by clerk. [642363] [20-1009] [James Bollinger] [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:28 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Official caption revised to reflect cross-appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [641614] [TAM] [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:21 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Note to file: The following cases are associated:20-1009 (Lead) with 20-1034 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [641611] [20-1009, 20-1034] [TAM] [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:19 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc. indicating that a request is made to the reporter for a transcript. Service: 10/08/2019 by email. [641171] [20-1009] [Russell Wong] [Entered: 10/08/2019 06:04 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Russell T. Wong as of counsel for Appellants Daktronics Hoist, Inc. and Daktronics, Inc.. Service: 10/08/2019 by email. [641169] [20-1009] [Russell Wong] [Entered: 10/08/2019 05:38 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/24/2019. [640348] Entry of Appearance due 10/18/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/18/2019. Docketing Statement due 10/18/2019. Appellant's brief is due 12/03/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olaf Soot Design, LLC v. Daktronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAKTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Domingo M. Llagostera
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Represented By: Kenneth Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAKTRONICS HOIST, INC.
Represented By: Domingo M. Llagostera
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OLAF SOOT DESIGN, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Phoenix Pak
Represented By: James M. Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?