Wi-LAN Inc. v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION and VIZIO, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: WI-LAN INC.
Case Number: 20-1041
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 Entry of appearance for John C. O'Quinn as of counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 11/15/2019 by email. [649724] [20-1041] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:15 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 11 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 12 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 14 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 15 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 17 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 18 ], ERROR: The preliminary documents for Sharp Electronics Corporation did not list all consolidated case numbers. CORRECTION: For future filings, please list both the lead appeal number along with any consolidated cases. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [646084] [JAL] [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:07 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [646083] [JAL] [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:06 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 Docketing Statement for the Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645669] [20-1041] [Rex Hwang] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:26 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645668] [20-1041] [Gianni Cutri] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:26 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645667] [20-1041] [Gianni Cutri] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:25 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interest for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645666] [20-1041] [Rex Hwang] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:24 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Joel R. Merkin as of counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645665] [20-1041] [Gianni Cutri] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:24 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Michael W. De Vries as of counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645664] [20-1041] [Gianni Cutri] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:23 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Rex Hwang as of counsel for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645663] [20-1041] [Rex Hwang] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:22 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Adam R. Alper as of counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645662] [20-1041] [Gianni Cutri] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:21 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Gianni Cutri as principal counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645661] [20-1041] [Gianni Cutri] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:19 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Stanley M. Gibson as principal counsel for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645660] [20-1041] [Stanley Gibson] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:19 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645625] [20-1041] [Patrick Conroy] [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:24 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645623] [20-1041] [Patrick Conroy] [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:23 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Monte M. Bond as of counsel for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645622] [20-1041] [Patrick Conroy] [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:22 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Terry A. Saad as of counsel for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645621] [20-1041] [Patrick Conroy] [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:22 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Daniel F. Olejko as of counsel for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645619] [20-1041] [Patrick Conroy] [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:21 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Patrick J. Conroy as principal counsel for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645618] [20-1041] [Patrick Conroy] [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:20 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1041 Lead with 20-1043 Member Case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [645059] [20-1041, 20-1043] [JAL] [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:50 AM]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating appeals 20-1041 and 20-1043. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Appellant's brief is due 12/27/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [645050] [20-1041, 20-1043] [JAL] [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:41 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/11/2019. [642218] Entry of Appearance is due 10/29/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/29/2019. Docketing Statement is due 10/29/2019. Appellant's brief is due 12/16/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wi-LAN Inc. v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Joel Robert Merkin
Represented By: Michael W. De Vries
Represented By: Gianni Cutri
Represented By: Adam R. Alper
Represented By: John C. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIZIO, INC.
Represented By: Stanley Martin Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Rex Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WI-LAN INC.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Patrick J. Conroy Esq.
Represented By: Terry Saad
Represented By: Monte Bond
Represented By: Daniel Fletcher Olejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?