Ferring B.V. v. Allergan, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: ALLERGAN USA, INC., REPRISE BIOPHARMACEUTICS, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC., SERENITY PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION, SEYMOUR H. FEIN, SERENITY PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, ALLERGAN SALES, LLC and RONALD V. NARDI
Plaintiff / Appellant: FERRING INTERNATIONAL CENTER SA, FERRING B.V. and FERRING PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 20-1098
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 10, 2020 Summary Ferring B.V. v. Allergan, Inc.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTE TO FILE: FOR PRIOR ENTRIES SEE 20-1076 . [655983] [MMA] [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:48 AM]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Serenity's motion to dismiss [ # 651889-2 ]. Appeal No. 2020-1076 is dismissed. The revised official caption and short caption for the remaining appeal, Appeal No. 2020-1098, are reflected in this order. Each side shall bear its own costs in Appeal No. 2020-1076. Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center SA, and Ferring Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s opening brief in Appeal No. 2020-1098 is due within 60 days of the date of filing of this order. ISSUED AS A MANDATE (as to 2020-1076 only): December 12, 2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [655970] [20-1076, 20-1098] [LMS] [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:24 AM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1076 (Lead) with 20-1098 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [646492] [20-1076, 20-1098] [MMA] [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:51 PM]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER filed. Appeals 20-1076 and 20-1098 are hereby consolidated. The briefing schedule is set forth in the order. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [646490] [20-1076, 20-1098] [MMA] [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:47 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/29/2019. [645719] Entry of Appearance due 11/13/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/13/2019. Docketing Statement due 11/13/2019. Appellants' brief is due 12/30/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ferring B.V. v. Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLERGAN USA, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REPRISE BIOPHARMACEUTICS, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Represented By: Paul Skiermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLERGAN, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERENITY PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Represented By: Paul Skiermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEYMOUR H. FEIN
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERENITY PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Represented By: Paul Skiermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD V. NARDI
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FERRING INTERNATIONAL CENTER SA
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Represented By: Joshua A. Davis
Represented By: John W. Cox Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FERRING B.V.
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Represented By: Joshua A. Davis
Represented By: John W. Cox Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FERRING PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: William P. Deni Jr.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Kristen Healey Cramer
Represented By: Joshua A. Davis
Represented By: John W. Cox Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?