Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and AMAZON.COM, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Case Number: 20-1244
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Amazon Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc., Entry of Appearance for Daniel T. Shvodian [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [659073] [TAM] [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:28 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Note to file: The following cases are associated:20-1241 (Lead) with 20-1244 (Member Case). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [659055] [20-1241, 20-1244] [TAM] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:54 AM]
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER consolidating appeals (20-1241 with 20-1244). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [659053] [20-1241, 20-1244] [TAM] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:45 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658991] [20-1244] [Lewis Hudnell] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:31 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Nathan K. Kelley as of counsel for Appellees Amazon Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658967] [20-1244] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:06 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658795] [20-1244] [Lewis Hudnell] [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:30 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Lewis E. Hudnell, III as principal counsel for Appellant Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658794] [20-1244] [Lewis Hudnell] [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:29 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Entry of appearance for Daniel T. Shvodian as principal counsel for Appellees Amazon Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658766] [20-1244] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 13 ] [Daniel Shvodian] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:48 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Amazon Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658764] [20-1244] [Daniel Shvodian] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:45 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Amazon Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658762] [20-1244] [Daniel Shvodian] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:43 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Wing Liang as of counsel for Appellees Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Technologies, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658760] [20-1244] [Wing Liang] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:38 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Daniel T. Shvodian as principal counsel for Appellees Amazon Technologies, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 12/26/2019 by email. [658757] [20-1244] [Daniel Shvodian] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:31 AM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/03/2019. [655621] Entry of Appearance due 12/26/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/26/2019. Docketing Statement due 12/26/2019. Appellant's brief is due 02/10/2020. [TAM] [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Daniel T. Shvodian
Represented By: Nathan K. Kelley
Represented By: Wing Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Daniel T. Shvodian
Represented By: Nathan K. Kelley
Represented By: Wing Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Represented By: Lewis Emery Hudnell Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?