Kutt v. Apple Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., NVIDIA CORPORATION, NOKIA CORPORATION, MR. STUART SMITH LLP, SONY CORPORATION, HTC CORPORATION, TOSHIBA CORPORATION, DELL INC., MICROSOFT CORPORATION, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., ARM HOLDING PLC, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD., LENOVO GROUP LIMITED, ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, AT&T CORP., SPRINT CORPORATION, QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, PAMELA MARY DEVINS, ELLEN AZEVEDO, HEWLET PACKARD COMPANY, FUJITU LIMITED, EDWARD FRANCIS O'CONNOR, LLP, EBAY INC., ARM LIMITED, INTEL CORPORATION, SCOTIABANK, fka Bank of Nova Scotia, T-MOBILE USA, INC., INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, RHEA GREENE, TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., BLACKBERRY LTD, fka Research In Motion Inc., JONES DAY, BANKING & TRUST COMPANY, STORAGE POST INC, BEST BUY CO INC, ROBERT GREENE, GOOGLE CORPORATION, CAROL CLAY, APPLE INC., AMAZON.COM INC., ATMEL CORPORATION, SEASONS CONDOMINIUMS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA GOVERNMENTS, ACER INCORPORATED, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., BRANCH BANKING & TRUST CO., GOOGLE LLC, ACER, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., ARM HOLDINGS, PLC, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, ASUSTEK COMPUTER, INC., DELL, INC., FUJITSU LIMITED, EBAY, INC., BLACKBERRY LIMITED, fka Research In Motion Inc., BEST BUY CO., INC., BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, ARM LTD., THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. and BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, nka Truist Bank
Plaintiff / Appellant: MERS KUTT
Case Number: 20-1757
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Qst.)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Filing 185 Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [865086] [VDW] [Entered: 08/05/2022 11:23 AM]
August 3, 2022 Filing 184 Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [865085] [VDW] [Entered: 08/05/2022 11:21 AM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 183 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 170 ], [ # 164 ] received from Appellees ARM Ltd., AT&T Corp., Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Apple Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day, Lenovo Group Limited, NVIDIA Corporation, Scotiabank, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc.. [863321] [VDW] [Entered: 07/27/2022 11:23 AM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 182 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 148 ], received from Appellees Branch Banking and Trust Company and Travelers Companies, Inc.. [862451] [VDW] [Entered: 07/22/2022 09:37 AM]
July 19, 2022 Filing 181 Outstanding paper copies of all briefs and appendices must be submitted within five business days from the date of issuance of this notice. See Fed. Cir. R. 25(c)(3)(A). [861700] [MMA] [Entered: 07/19/2022 09:07 AM]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting the motion [ # 179 ] to the extent that ECF No. 179 is accepted as Mr. Kutt's corrected informal reply brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [861675] [LMS] [Entered: 07/19/2022 08:38 AM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 179 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF FILED by Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt. Service: 07/12/2022 by clerk. [860556]--[Edited 07/19/2022 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] This document has been accepted. See Order [ # 180 ] [VDW] [Entered: 07/12/2022 03:31 PM]
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER If he wishes to change filing methods in this case, Mr. Kutt should promptly file a motion for such relief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [856936] [LMS] [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:47 AM]
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 176 ] only to the extent that within 14 days of the date of filing of this order, Mr. Kutt may file a corrected informal reply brief, not to exceed 15 pages. If Mr. Kutt continues to seek to file a supplemental appendix in connection with that corrected reply brief, he should simultaneously file a motion requesting leave to do so. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [856935] [LMS] [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:37 AM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 176 MODIFIED ENTRY: Corrected MOTION of Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt to extend the time to file brief. Service: 06/02/2022 by clerk. [853275]--[Edited 06/23/2022 by MMA] [VDW] [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:59 PM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 175 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Filing for Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt. Service: 06/02/2022 by clerk. [853274] [VDW] [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:59 PM]
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 167 ] filed by Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Mr. Fahrenkrog is withdrawn, and Mr. Hawes's entry of appearance is accepted for filing. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853063] [LMS] [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:48 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 173 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt to extend the time to file brief. Service: 05/31/2022 by clerk. [852819]--[Edited 06/01/2022 by MMA] [VDW] [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:11 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 172 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Filing for Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt. Service: 05/31/2022 by clerk. [852817] [VDW] [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:09 PM]
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER modifying the official caption. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [851818] [NL] [Entered: 05/25/2022 01:29 PM]
May 6, 2022 Filing 170 CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX FILED by Appellees ARM Ltd., AT&T Corp., Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Apple Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Dell, Inc., Google LLC, Intel Corporation, IBM, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day, Lenovo Group Limited, NVIDIA Corporation, Scotiabank, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc. Service: 04/26/2022 by email. [848315] This document has been accepted. See Order [ # 169 ] [MMA] [Entered: 05/06/2022 05:10 PM]
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting [ # 158 ] ECF No. 158. The revised official caption is reflected in this order.; granting [ # 165 ] ECF No. 165-1 to the extent that ECF No. 165-3 is accepted for filing as the Moving Appellees' corrected supplemental appendix. Within 14-days of the date of filing of this order, the court will reform the caption to note the non-participation of any of Arm Holdings, PLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Company, Qualcomm Incorporated, HTC Corporation, Nokia Corporation, Asustek Computer, Inc., Sony Corporation, Fujitsu Limited, Amazon.com, Inc., eBay, Inc., Atmel Corporation, Edward Francis OConnor, LLP, Condominium Association, Storage Post Inc, Robert Greene, Rhea Greene, Mr. Stuart Smith LLP, and United States of America Governments unless within that time the party files an entry of appearance in this appeal. See Practice Note to Fed. Cir. R. 12. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848231] [LMS] [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:20 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 168 Amended Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as counsel for Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846934] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/02/2022 04:41 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 167 MOTION of Appellee Advanced Micro Devices to withdraw counsel Aaron R. Fahrenkrog. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846919] [20-1757] [Aaron Fahrenkrog] [Entered: 05/02/2022 04:03 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 166 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846916] [20-1757] [Aaron Fahrenkrog] [Entered: 05/02/2022 03:59 PM]
April 26, 2022 Filing 165 MOTION of Appellees ARM Ltd., AT&T Corp., Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Apple Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Dell, Inc., Google LLC, Intel Corporation, IBM, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day, Lenovo Group Limited, NVIDIA Corporation, Scotiabank, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc. to extend the time to 04/26/2022 to file the appendix. Service: 04/26/2022 by email. [845580]--[Edited 04/27/2022 by MMA - Reason: to correct relief] [Benjamin Elacqua] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:26 PM]
April 26, 2022 Filing 164 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED RESPONSE BRIEF FILED by Appellees ARM Ltd., AT&T Corp., Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Apple Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Dell, Inc., Google LLC, Intel Corporation, IBM, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day, Lenovo Group Limited, NVIDIA Corporation, Scotiabank, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc. Service: 04/26/2022 by email. [845560]--[Edited 05/06/2022 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 04/26/2022 04:20 PM]
April 26, 2022 Filing 163 Amended Entry of appearance for Rose Cordero Prey; Joshua Lee Raskin as counsel for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Service: 04/26/2022 by email. [845459] [20-1757] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 04/26/2022 12:21 PM]
April 20, 2022 Filing 162 Entry of appearance for Kevin P. Anderson as counsel for Appellee ARM Ltd.. Service: 04/20/2022 by clerk. [844288] [20-1757] [Kevin Anderson] [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:53 AM]
April 19, 2022 Filing 161 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees ARM Ltd., AT&T Corp., Acer, Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Apple Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Dell, Inc., Google LLC, Intel Corporation, IBM, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day, Lenovo Group Limited, NVIDIA Corporation, Scotiabank, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc., Response Brief; Supplemental Appendix [ # 151 ], [ # 160 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 04/26/2022. Unless ordered otherwise, the deadline for any responsive filing runs from service of the original version. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [844104] [MMA] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:21 PM]
April 15, 2022 Filing 160 APPENDIX FILED by Appellees Apple Inc., Intel Corporation, NVIDIA Corporation, Google LLC, Lenovo Group Limited, Acer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Sprint Corporation, AT&T Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Best Buy Co., Inc., Scotiabank, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day and Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 04/15/2022 by email. [843643] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 161 ] [Benjamin Elacqua] [Entered: 04/15/2022 05:11 PM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 159 Official caption revised to correct Appellee The Travelers Companies, Inc.'s name (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [840465] [CAB] [Entered: 04/01/2022 01:19 PM]
March 29, 2022 Filing 158 MOTION of Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company to modify the official caption. Service: 03/29/2022 by email. [839783] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 03/29/2022 04:52 PM]
March 28, 2022 Filing 157 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee ARM Ltd.. Service: 03/28/2022 by clerk. [839334] [20-1757] [Kevin Anderson] [Entered: 03/28/2022 12:36 PM]
March 23, 2022 Filing 156 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company, Certificate of Interest [ # 145 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/30/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [838495] [ALK] [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:37 AM]
March 22, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees ARM Ltd. and Arm Holdings, PLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 149 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/29/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [838411] [ALK] [Entered: 03/22/2022 04:04 PM]
March 22, 2022 Filing 154 Certificate of Interest for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Service: 03/22/2022 by email. [838383] [20-1757] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 03/22/2022 03:17 PM]
March 22, 2022 Filing 153 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit a Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA). Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [838274] [MMA] [Entered: 03/22/2022 11:02 AM]
March 22, 2022 Filing 152 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 143 ], ERROR: Document was not text-searchable. CORRECTION: For future filings, please note all electronically filed documents must be text-searchable in their entirety. Fed. Cir. R. 25(a)(1)(A). THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [838246] [ALK] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:26 AM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 151 RESPONSE BRIEF FILED by Appellees Apple Inc., IBM, ARM Ltd., Intel Corporation, NVIDIA Corporation, Google LLC, Lenovo Group Limited, Acer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Sprint Corporation, AT&T Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., BlackBerry Limited, Best Buy Co., Inc., Scotiabank, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jones Day and Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [838133] [20-1757] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 03/21/2022 10:33 PM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 150 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellees Acer, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc. and Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. [838124] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 03/21/2022 08:45 PM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 149 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellees Arm Holdings, PLC and ARM Ltd.. Service: 03/21/2022 by clerk, email. [838101] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 155 ]. [Kevin Anderson] [Entered: 03/21/2022 05:07 PM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 148 RESPONSE BRIEF FILED by Appellees Branch Banking and Trust Company and Travelers Companies, Inc.. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [838085] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 03/21/2022 04:45 PM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 147 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Travelers Companies, Inc.. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. [837909] [20-1757] [Alan Becker] [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:00 PM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 146 Certificate of Interest for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. [837905] [20-1757] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 03/21/2022 12:47 PM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 145 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. [837858] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 156 ]. [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 03/21/2022 09:58 AM]
March 21, 2022 Filing 144 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee BlackBerry Limited. Service: 03/21/2022 by email. [837835] [20-1757] [Jason Cook] [Entered: 03/21/2022 09:07 AM]
March 20, 2022 Filing 143 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 03/20/2022 by email. [837812] [20-1757]--[Edited 03/22/2022 by ALK to replace document with searchable version.] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 03/20/2022 05:43 PM]
March 20, 2022 Filing 142 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellees Best Buy Co., Inc. and Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 03/20/2022 by email. [837810] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 03/20/2022 02:53 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 141 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Intel Corporation. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837793] [20-1757] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 03/18/2022 07:41 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 140 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 03/18/2022 by clerk, email. [837792] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 03/18/2022 06:49 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 139 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Branch Banking and Trust Company. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837788] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 03/18/2022 05:38 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 138 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837787] [20-1757] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 03/18/2022 05:27 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 137 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee NVIDIA Corporation. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837779] [20-1757] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:51 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 136 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837776] [20-1757] [Benjamin Elacqua] [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:47 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 135 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837760] [20-1757] [Aaron Fahrenkrog] [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:34 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 134 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellees IBM and Verizon Communications, Inc.. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837749] [20-1757] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:07 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 133 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Dell, Inc.. Service: 03/18/2022 by email. [837686] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:14 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 132 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellees Sprint Corporation and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Service: 03/15/2022 by email. [837091] [20-1757] [Martin Gilmore] [Entered: 03/15/2022 07:44 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 131 Corrected Entry of appearance for Martin E. Gilmore III as counsel for Appellees T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Sprint Corporation. Service: 03/15/2022 by email. [837090] [20-1757] [Martin Gilmore] [Entered: 03/15/2022 07:40 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Sprint Corporation and T-Mobile USA, Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 125 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/21/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [836728] [ALK] [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:31 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 129 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt. Service: 03/14/2022 by clerk. [836678] [VDW] [Entered: 03/14/2022 02:21 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 128 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Acer, Inc.. Service: 03/14/2022 by email, US mail. [836661] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 03/14/2022 01:37 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 127 Entry of appearance for Eric H. Findlay as Principal Counsel; Roger Brian Craft as Of Counsel as counsel for Appellee Acer, Inc.. Service: 03/14/2022 by email, US mail. [836657] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 03/14/2022 01:32 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 126 This entry was made in error and has been removed from the docket. NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Intel Corporation, Entry of Appearance [ # 124 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [836528] [ALK] [Entered: 03/14/2022 08:55 AM]
March 11, 2022 Filing 125 Amended Entry of appearance for Martin E. Gilmore III as counsel for Appellees T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Sprint Corporation. Service: 03/11/2022 by email. [836488] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 130 ]. [Martin Gilmore] [Entered: 03/11/2022 05:56 PM]
March 11, 2022 Filing 124 Entry of appearance for Dan L. Bagatell as counsel for Appellee Intel Corporation. Service: 03/11/2022 by email. [836455] [20-1757] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 03/11/2022 04:20 PM]
February 23, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt, Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance [ # 122 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/09/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [832984] [MMA] [Entered: 02/23/2022 11:11 AM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 122 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt. Service: 02/23/2022 by clerk. [832916] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 123 ] [VDW] [Entered: 02/23/2022 09:24 AM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 121 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt, Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance [ # 107 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/24/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [830411] [MMA] [Entered: 02/10/2022 01:36 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 120 INFORMAL BRIEF FILED by Appellant Mr. Mers Kutt. Service: 02/10/2022 by clerk. [830404] This document has been accepted. See Order [ # 119 ] [MMA] [Entered: 02/10/2022 01:25 PM]
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER filed Pursuant to the court's December 6, 2021 order, the September 1, 2020 dismissal order is vacated, the mandate is recalled, and the appeal is reinstated. ECF No. 116 is accepted as Mr. Kutt's informal opening brief, and ECF No. 117 is accepted as continuation pages to that brief. Appellees' response briefs are due no later than 40 days from the date of filing of this order. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [829965] [LMS] [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:51 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 118 Entry of appearance for Michael J. Ballanco as counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 01/24/2022 by email. [826345] [20-1757] [Michael Ballanco] [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:14 AM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 117 Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [824018] [JCP] [Entered: 01/12/2022 08:33 AM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 116 Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [822762] [JCP] [Entered: 01/05/2022 10:21 AM]
December 7, 2021 Filing 115 Amended Entry of appearance for Margaret I. Lyle as counsel for Appellee Jones Day Margaret I. Lyle. Service: 12/07/2021 by email. [816853] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 12/07/2021 02:09 PM]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER filed Mr. Kutt's motion [ # 112 ] will be granted to the extent that the mandate will be recalled, the court's September 1, 2020 dismissal order will be vacated, and the appeal will be reinstated if, within 21 days of the date of this order, Mr. Kutt files his opening brief on enclosed Form 12 and, if applicable, an appendix to that brief.; granting [ # 110 ] Jones Day's motion. Mr. Johnson is withdrawn as counsel, and Ms. Lyle is directed to file an amended entry of appearance within seven days from the date of filing of this order. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [816300] [LMS] [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:43 AM]
October 8, 2021 Filing 113 Paper document received from Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [804715] [JCP] [Entered: 10/08/2021 06:03 PM]
October 8, 2021 Filing 112 Paper document received from Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [804714] [JCP] [Entered: 10/08/2021 06:02 PM]
October 8, 2021 Filing 111 Clerk's closed case letter to Appellant Mers Kutt and Appellee Jones Day. Further filings in this closed case will receive no response. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [804566] [CAB] [Entered: 10/08/2021 12:57 PM]
August 24, 2021 Filing 110 MOTION of Appellee Jones Day to withdraw counsel Richard J. Johnson. Service: 08/24/2021 by email, US mail. [794979] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:51 PM]
August 24, 2021 Filing 109 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Jones Day. Service: 08/24/2021 by email, US mail. [794967] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:20 PM]
August 24, 2021 Filing 108 Entry of appearance for Margaret I. Lyle as counsel for Appellee Jones Day. Service: 08/24/2021 by email, US mail. [794963] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:08 PM]
August 17, 2021 Filing 107 MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance (Address Change) and Consent to Electronic Service for Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 08/20/2021 by clerk. [794308]--[Edited 08/23/2021 by CAB] [MJL] [Entered: 08/20/2021 01:47 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 106 Document No. [ # 100 ] mailed to Appellant Mers Kutt was returned as undeliverable. The document was not remailed. [745931] [CAB] [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:05 AM]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER The motion [ # 102 ] will be granted, the mandate will be recalled, the court's September 1, 2020 dismissal order will be vacated, and the appeal will be reinstated if, within 21 days of the date of this order, Mr. Kutt files his opening brief on enclosed Form 12 and, if applicable, an appendix to that brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [727566] [LMS] [Entered: 10/08/2020 09:34 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 104 Corrected Entry of appearance for Mia Lorick as counsel for Appellees Carol Clay, Pamela Mary Devins, Ellen Azevedo and Seasons Condominiums. Service: 09/16/2020 by email, US mail. [722178] [20-1757] [Mia Lorick] [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:53 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 103 MODIFIED ENTRY: Miscellaneous Document for Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 09/16/2020 by clerk. [721974]--[Edited 09/24/2020 by JAL] [JCP] [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:24 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 102 MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Appellant Mers Kutt to the order to terminate appeal [ # 101 ]. Service: 09/16/2020 by clerk. [721973]--[Edited 09/24/2020 by JAL] [JCP] [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:21 AM]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER The appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. Issued as a mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [718719] [NL] [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:28 AM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Mers Kutt, Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance [ # 99 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 09/01/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [715576] [JAL] [Entered: 08/18/2020 11:02 AM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 99 MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 08/17/2020 by clerk. [715320]--[Edited 08/18/2020 by JAL] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No.[ # 100 ] [JCP] [Entered: 08/17/2020 03:29 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Ellen Azevedo, Carol Clay, Pamela Mary Devins and Seasons Condominiums, Entry of Appearance for M. Lorick [ # 97 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 08/14/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [713284] [EKD] [Entered: 08/07/2020 10:28 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 97 Entry of appearance for Mia Lorick as counsel for Appellees Seasons Condominiums, Pamela Mary Devins, Carol Clay and Ellen Azevedo. Service: 08/05/2020 by email, US mail. [712861] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 98 ] [Mia Lorick] [Entered: 08/05/2020 06:08 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 96 Documents ([ # 8 ] Non-Compliance, [ # 14 ] Non-Compliance, [ # 32 ] Non-Compliance) mailed to Mers Kutt were returned as undeliverable [Moved (Unknown)]. The documents were not remailed. [710714] [JAL] [Entered: 07/28/2020 03:58 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 95 Document ([ # 87 ] clerk order) mailed to Mers Kutt was returned as undeliverable [Refused]. The document was not remailed. [707787] [JAL] [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:22 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 94 Document ([ # 1 ] caseopening document) mailed to Mers Kutt was returned as undeliverable [Moved/Unknown]. The document was not remailed. [702421] [JAL] [Entered: 06/19/2020 11:10 AM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 93 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [701241] [JAL] [Entered: 06/15/2020 03:50 PM]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER accepting ECF No. 90 as Mr. Kutt's docketing statement. The court will accept the attachment (ECF No. 90-2) as the continuation pages to Mr. Kutt's opening brief, if, within 21 days of the date of this order, Mr. Kutt files his opening brief on enclosed Form 12 and, if applicable, an appendix to that brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [700550] [LMS] [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:51 AM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 91 Entry of appearance for David Folsom as of counsel for Appellee Intel Corporation. Service: 05/27/2020 by email. [697203] [20-1757] [David Folsom] [Entered: 05/27/2020 01:13 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 90 MODIFIED ENTRY: Docketing Statement for the Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 05/27/2020 by clerk. [697045]--[Edited 06/11/2020 by JAL - Accepted pursuant to 06/11/2020 order [ # 92 ]] [JCP] [Entered: 05/27/2020 07:46 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 89 MODIFIED ENTRY: Copy of Docketing Statement [ # 90 ] for Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 05/22/2020 by clerk. [696754]--[Edited 06/11/2020 by JAL] [JCP] [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:28 AM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 88 Entry of appearance for Matthew W. Moran as of counsel for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/20/2020 by email. [696012] [20-1757] [Matthew Moran] [Entered: 05/20/2020 05:49 PM]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting [ # 86 ] the motion. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [695805] [LMS] [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:33 AM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION of Appellee Google Corporation to modify the official caption [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 05/14/2020 by email. [694711] [20-1757] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:15 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 85 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google Corporation. Service: 05/14/2020 by email. [694710] [20-1757] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:09 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 84 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellee Google Corporation. Service: 05/14/2020 by email. [694709] [20-1757] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:06 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 83 Corrected Entry of appearance for Michael S. Kwun as principal counsel for Appellee Google Corporation. Service: 05/14/2020 by email. [694708] [20-1757] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:01 PM]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting [ # 61 ] the motion. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [694453] [LMS] [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:16 AM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 81 MODIFIED ENTRY: Certificate of Interest for Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 05/14/2020 by clerk. [694395]--[Edited 05/14/2020 by JAL] [JCP] [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:09 AM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 80 MODIFIED ENTRY: Docketing Statement for the Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 05/14/2020 by clerk. [694394]--[Edited 05/14/2020 by JAL] [JCP] [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:08 AM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 79 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694380] [20-1757] [Aaron Fahrenkrog] [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:47 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 78 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694379] [20-1757] [Aaron Fahrenkrog] [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:45 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 77 Entry of appearance for Aaron R. Fahrenkrog as principal counsel for Appellee Advanced Micro Devices. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694378] [20-1757] [Aaron Fahrenkrog] [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:44 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 76 Entry of appearance for Richard J Johnson as principal counsel for Appellee Jones Day. Service: 05/13/2020 by email, US mail. [694338] [20-1757] [Richard Johnson] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:06 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 75 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Jones Day. Service: 05/13/2020 by email, US mail. [694336] [20-1757] [Richard Johnson] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:01 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 74 Entry of appearance for Joshua Lee Raskin as of counsel for Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694296] [20-1757] [Joshua Raskin] [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:54 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 73 Certificate of Interest for Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694291] [20-1757] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:45 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 72 Entry of appearance for Rose Cordero Prey as principal counsel for Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694288] [20-1757] [Rose Prey] [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:41 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 71 Certificate of Interest for Appellee T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694264] [20-1757] [Martin Gilmore] [Entered: 05/13/2020 01:19 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 70 Entry of appearance for Martin E. Gilmore as principal counsel for Appellee T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694263] [20-1757] [Martin Gilmore] [Entered: 05/13/2020 01:16 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 69 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Best Buy Co Inc and Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 05/13/2020 by email, US mail. [694257] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:50 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 68 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Travelers Companies, Inc.. Service: 05/12/2020 by email, US mail. [694034] [20-1757] [Alan Becker] [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:34 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 67 Entry of appearance for Alan I. Becker as principal counsel for Appellee Travelers Companies, Inc.. Service: 05/12/2020 by email, US mail. [694030] [20-1757] [Alan Becker] [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:28 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 66 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Intel Corporation. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693975] [20-1757] [Tiffany Cunningham] [Entered: 05/12/2020 02:03 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 65 Entry of appearance for Tiffany Patrice Cunningham as principal counsel for Appellee Intel Corporation. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693974] [20-1757] [Tiffany Cunningham] [Entered: 05/12/2020 02:00 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 64 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Banking & Trust Company. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693897] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:39 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 63 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Banking & Trust Company. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693894] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:37 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 62 Entry of appearance for Matias Ferrario as principal counsel for Appellee Banking & Trust Company. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693889] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:35 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION of Appellee Banking & Trust Company to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693883] [20-1757] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:30 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 60 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Blackberry LTD. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693881] [20-1757] [Shaun Hassett] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:26 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 59 Entry of appearance for Brian D. Schmalzbach as of counsel for Appellee Blackberry LTD. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693878] [20-1757] [Brian Schmalzbach] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:24 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 58 Entry of appearance for Jason W. Cook as of counsel for Appellee Blackberry LTD. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693874] [20-1757] [Jason Cook] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:18 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 57 Entry of appearance for Shaun W. Hassett as principal counsel for Appellee Blackberry LTD. Service: 05/12/2020 by email. [693865] [20-1757] [Shaun Hassett] [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:59 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Banking & Trust Company, Motion to Modify the Official Caption [ # 55 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/19/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [693758] [JAL] [Entered: 05/12/2020 08:53 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION of Appellee Banking & Trust Company to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/11/2020 by email. [693560] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 56 ] [Matias Ferrario] [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:45 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 54 Entry of appearance for Roger Brian Craft as of counsel for Appellees Best Buy Co Inc and Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693509] [20-1757] [Roger Craft] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:06 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 53 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Best Buy Co Inc and Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693504] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:03 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 52 Corrected Entry of appearance for Eric H. Findlay as principal counsel for Appellees Best Buy Co Inc and Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693503] [20-1757] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 05/11/2020 12:54 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 51 Entry of appearance for Melissa R. Smith as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 05/11/2020 by email. [693487] [20-1757] [Melissa Smith] [Entered: 05/11/2020 12:05 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 50 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees IBM and Verizon Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693479] [20-1757] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/11/2020 11:48 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 49 Corrected Entry of appearance for Michael E. Jones as principal counsel for Appellees IBM and Verizon Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693477] [20-1757] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/11/2020 11:45 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 48 Entry of appearance for Ashley A. Bolt as of counsel for Appellees Apple Inc. and NVIDIA Corporation. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693470] [20-1757] [Ashley Bolt] [Entered: 05/11/2020 11:34 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 47 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693467] [20-1757] [Benjamin Elacqua] [Entered: 05/11/2020 11:27 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 46 Entry of appearance for Benjamin C. Elacqua as principal counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693461] [20-1757] [Benjamin Elacqua] [Entered: 05/11/2020 11:24 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 45 Amended Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as principal counsel for Appellees Dell Inc. and Toshiba Corporation. Service: 05/11/2020 by email, US mail. [693384] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/11/2020 09:00 AM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 44 Corrected Entry of appearance for Jeffrey R. Swigart as of counsel for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693347] [20-1757] [Jeffrey Swigart] [Entered: 05/08/2020 08:21 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 43 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693346] [20-1757] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/08/2020 08:17 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 42 Corrected Entry of appearance for Eric J. Klein as principal counsel for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693345] [20-1757] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/08/2020 08:14 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 41 Entry of appearance for Jeffrey R. Swigart as of counsel for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693340] [20-1757] [Jeffrey Swigart] [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:57 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 40 Corrected Entry of appearance for Eric J. Klein as principal counsel for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693339] [20-1757] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:52 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 39 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693338] [20-1757] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:49 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 38 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/08/2020 by email, US mail. [693028] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:19 AM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 37 Corrected Entry of appearance for Roger Fulghum as of counsel for Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/08/2020 by email, US mail. [693022] [20-1757] [Roger Fulghum] [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:08 AM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 36 Corrected Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as principal counsel for Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/08/2020 by email, US mail. [693018] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:03 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 35 Corrected Entry of appearance for Andrew Thompson Gorham as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 05/07/2020 by email. [692969] [20-1757] [Andrew Gorham] [Entered: 05/07/2020 06:22 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 34 Certificate of Interest for Appellee NVIDIA Corporation. Service: 05/07/2020 by email. [692949] [20-1757] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 05/07/2020 05:10 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 33 Entry of appearance for David M. Hoffman as principal counsel for Appellee NVIDIA Corporation. Service: 05/07/2020 by email. [692948] [20-1757] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 05/07/2020 05:08 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Apple Inc., Best Buy Co Inc, Dell Inc., Google Corporation, IBM, Lenovo Group Limited, and Verizon Communications, Inc., Entries of Appearance, Certificates of Interest, and Docketing Statements [ # 15 ], [ # 16 ], [ # 17 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 20 ], [ # 21 ], [ # 22 ], [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 26 ], [ # 27 ], [ # 28 ], [ # 29 ], [ # 30 ], [ # 31 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 05/14/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [692752] [JAL] [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:29 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 31 Docketing Statement for the Appellee IBM. Service: 05/06/2020 by email. [692664] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:53 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 30 Certificate of Interest for Appellee IBM. Service: 05/06/2020 by email. [692663] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:51 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 29 Entry of appearance for Michael E. Jones as principal counsel for Appellee IBM. Service: 05/06/2020 by email. [692662] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:49 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 28 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Verizon Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email. [692660] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:47 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 27 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Verizon Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email. [692659] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:45 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 Entry of appearance for Michael E. Jones as principal counsel for Appellee Verizon Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692658] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Jones] [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:42 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google Corporation. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692605] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:34 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Google Corporation. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692604] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:30 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 Entry of appearance for Michael S. Kwun as principal counsel for Appellee Google Corporation. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692602] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Kwun] [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:23 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692598] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:12 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 Entry of appearance for Eric H. Findlay as of counsel for Appellee Best Buy Co Inc. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692597] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:08 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 20 Entry of appearance for Eric H. Findlay as principal counsel for Appellee Lenovo Group Limited. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692596] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Eric Findlay] [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:04 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 Entry of appearance for Andrew Thompson Gorham as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692506] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Andrew Gorham] [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:40 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692497] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:07 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692495] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:05 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for Roger Fulghum as of counsel for Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692491] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Roger Fulghum] [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:57 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as principal counsel for Appellee Dell Inc.. Service: 05/06/2020 by email, US mail. [692484] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 32 ] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:49 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of The Bank of Nova Scotia, Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 05/13/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [692461] [JAL] [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:04 AM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/05/2020 by email, US mail. [692385] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 14 ] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:20 PM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/05/2020 by email, US mail. [692383] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 14 ] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:14 PM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Eric J. Klein as principal counsel for Appellee Scotiabank. Service: 05/05/2020 by email, US mail. [692382] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 14 ] [Eric Klein] [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:09 PM]
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Minghui Yang as of counsel for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691495] [20-1757] [Minghui Yang] [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:50 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interest for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691421] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 04:17 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee AT&T Corp., Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/07/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [691355] [JAL] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:12 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Toshiba Corporation. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691332] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:29 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Toshiba Corporation. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691327] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:26 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as principal counsel for Appellee Toshiba Corporation. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691324] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:24 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691247] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:25 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Docketing Statement for the Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691246] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:21 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Scott W. Breedlove as principal counsel for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691245] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:19 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/23/2020. [690972] Entry of Appearance is due 05/13/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/13/2020. Appellant's informal brief is due 05/26/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 04/29/2020 02:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kutt v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NVIDIA CORPORATION
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: Ashley Bolt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOKIA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. STUART SMITH LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HTC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELL INC.
Represented By: David Folsom Esq.
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Melissa R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARM HOLDING PLC
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LENOVO GROUP LIMITED
Represented By: Eric H. Findlay
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES
Represented By: Aaron Robert Fahrenkrog Esq.
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AT&T CORP.
Represented By: Scott W. Breedlove Esq.
Represented By: Minghui Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPRINT CORPORATION
Represented By: Martin Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAMELA MARY DEVINS
Represented By: Mia Breaux Lorick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN AZEVEDO
Represented By: Mia Breaux Lorick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEWLET PACKARD COMPANY
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Melissa R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FUJITU LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD FRANCIS O'CONNOR, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EBAY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARM LIMITED
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Tiffany Patrice Cunningham
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Dan L. Bagatell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTIABANK, fka Bank of Nova Scotia
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Swigart
Represented By: Matthew Walter Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T-MOBILE USA, INC.
Represented By: Martin Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RHEA GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Walker
Represented By: Alan I. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACKBERRY LTD, fka Research In Motion Inc.
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONES DAY
Represented By: Richard J. Johnson
Represented By: Margaret Isabel Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANKING & TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Matias Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STORAGE POST INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEST BUY CO INC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Eric H. Findlay
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOOGLE CORPORATION
Represented By: David Folsom Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL CLAY
Represented By: Mia Breaux Lorick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Ashley Bolt Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin Elacqua
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: Melissa R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON.COM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATMEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEASONS CONDOMINIUMS
Represented By: Mia Breaux Lorick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA GOVERNMENTS
Represented By: Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACER INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By: Joshua Lee Raskin
Represented By: Rose Cordero Prey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANCH BANKING & TRUST CO.
Represented By: Matias Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: Michael Soonuk Kwun Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACER, INC.
Represented By: Eric H. Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By: Joshua Lee Raskin
Represented By: Rose Cordero Prey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARM HOLDINGS, PLC
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY
Represented By: Melissa R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASUSTEK COMPUTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELL, INC.
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FUJITSU LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EBAY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACKBERRY LIMITED, fka Research In Motion Inc.
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEST BUY CO., INC.
Represented By: Eric H. Findlay
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Matias Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARM LTD.
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Alan I. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, nka Truist Bank
Represented By: Matias Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MERS KUTT
Represented By: Mers Kutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?