Eloqui Voice Systems, LLC v. Nuance Communications, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ELOQUI VOICE SYSTEMS, LLC
Case Number: 20-1798
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 REMINDER : Attorney Lamkin is reminded that the information on the Entry of Appearance (EOA) and the information in the user account must match. Please promptly update the EOA or the account information on www.pacer.gov. [696467] [LMN] [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:24 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corrected Entry of appearance for Rachael D. Lamkin as principal counsel for Appellee Nuance Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/21/2020 by email. [696438] [20-1798] [Rachael Lamkin] [Entered: 05/21/2020 06:28 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Christian E. Mammen as of counsel for Appellee Nuance Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/21/2020 by email. [696437] [20-1798] [Christian Mammen] [Entered: 05/21/2020 06:20 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Nuance Communications, Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/28/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [695899] [LMN] [Entered: 05/20/2020 12:07 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Rachael D. Lamkin as principal counsel for Appellee Nuance Communications, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2020 by email. [695877] [20-1798] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 3 ] [Rachael Lamkin] [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:27 AM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/05/2020. [694761] Entry of Appearance is due 05/29/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/29/2020. Docketing Statement is due 05/29/2020. Appellant's brief is due 07/14/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 05/15/2020 09:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eloqui Voice Systems, LLC v. Nuance Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Christian E. Mammen
Represented By: Rachael D. Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELOQUI VOICE SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Curtis Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?